Mosley v. Ezricare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Mosley and Alisa McMillan
Defendant: Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Delsam Pharma, LLC, Global Pharma Healthcare Private, LTD and ARU Pharma, INC.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00020
Filed: February 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: granting #95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 9/27/2023. (APR)cc: COR
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Clay M. Stevens re #95 MOTION for Sarah E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659686); Error: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (APR)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sarah E. Jones re #95 MOTION for Sarah E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659686). (APR)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Sarah E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5659686)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay). Modified Attachment #1 name on 9/27/2023 (APR).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: denying #92 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Jones. Movant has failed to consent to having Kentucky's Rules of Professional Conduct enforced against her by Kentucky's Supreme Court if she violates those rules. Movant is directed to LR 83.2(a)(3) for instructions on what is needed to bring a future motion into compliance w/ the local rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 9/26/2023. (APR)cc: COR
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 09/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram: The Court ORDERED Counsel for Plaintiff to file a status update with the Court on or before January 12, 2024 describing efforts to effectuate service on Defendant Global Pharma Healthcare Private, LTD. Defendants pending motion to stay was addressed and, based upon the position described in the reply memorandum (D.E. #80 ), the parties AGREED that motion should be denied without prejudice to Defendants having leave to re-file that motion following rulings on the pending motions to dismiss. In light of the parties agreement, the Court ORDERS that Defendant's motion to stay (D.E. #67 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-file after Judge Wier rules on the pending motions to dismiss. The Court asked counsel if any other pretrial issues required the Courts attention. Counsel informed the Court that no other issues require the Court's attention at this time. Signed by Hanly A. Ingram. (KJA)cc: COR
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Sarah E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5658500)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #66 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezricare, LLC , #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delsam Pharma, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Delsam Pharma, LLC , #65 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezrirx,LLC (KJA)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezrirx,LLC filed by Ezrirx,LLC. (Gault, Patrick)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezricare, LLC filed by Ezricare, LLC. (Gault, Patrick)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delsam Pharma, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Delsam Pharma, LLC filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CLARIFYING ORDER re #87 Order: There is NO teleconference or other court event scheduled in this case for August 29, 2023. The mid-discovery teleconference remains scheduled for September 25, 2023 at 11:00 A.M. To avoid confusion, the Court reiterates that the parties are DIRECTED to call 859-474-8484 and enter the meeting ID number 460 127 550 followed by the # sign to join the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 8/22/2023.(APR)cc: COR
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: The mid-discovery TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE is re-scheduled for 9/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. To join the conference, the parties are DIRECTED to call 859-474-8484 and enter the meeting ID number 460 127 550 followed by the # sign. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 08/22/2023.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #85 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Reply Memorandums in Support of Motions to Dismiss by Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley: Being sufficiently advised, the Court GRANTS DE #85 and EXTENDS Dfts' deadline to file reply memoranda to September 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/21/2023.(APR)cc: COR
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Reply Memorandums in Support of Motions to Dismiss by Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley. (McIntosh, Thomas) Modified text and added filers on 8/18/2023 (APR).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #85 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Reply Memorandums in Support of Motions to Dismiss by Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley (APR)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezrirx,LLC filed by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley. (Goldstein, Maury)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezricare, LLC filed by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley. (Goldstein, Maury)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delsam Pharma, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Delsam Pharma, LLC filed by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley. (Goldstein, Maury)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF to #67 filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC (APR)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Clay M. Stevens re #80 Reply to Response to Motion; Error: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit A." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (APR)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC filed by Ezricare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Middle District of Florida Order Staying Case)(Stevens, Clay) Modified attachment name on 7/10/2023 (APR).
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion to file a supplemental brief (D.E. #78 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Delsam SHALL REPLY in support of the motion to stay on or before Thursday, July 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 7/6/2023. (APR)cc: COR
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave by Delsam Pharma, LLC to File Supplemental Brief on Motion to Stay Proceedings Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Thomas)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The Court GRANTS DE #72 and EXTENDS Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Rule 12(b) motions to August 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/30/2023.(APR)cc: COR
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #72 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley Joint Response by All Defendants filed by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC. (Stevens, Clay)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re #72 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley: The Court ORDERS Defendants to jointly respond by June 30, 2023, stating their position on the extension request. Further, the Court DENIES DE #70 as moot in light of Plaintiffs' notice stating that DE #70 includes terms different than those agreed upon by the parties. See DE #71 . Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/27/2023.(APR)cc: COR
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC: To ensure a complete record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Ezricare, LLC, SHALL REPLY on its motion to stay (D.E. #67 ) on or before Friday, July 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/27/2023.(APR)cc: COR. Modified text to correct reply date on 6/27/2023 (APR).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #70 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley , #72 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley (APR)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #74 Order; Error: Incorrect reply deadline listed in docket text; Entry by Docket Clerk; Correction: Corrected reply deadline in docket text; no action needed from counsel. cc: COR (APR)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC filed by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Order dated June 21, 2023, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Aru Pharmacy Bankruptcy Petition, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - CDC: Outbreak of Extensively Drug-resistant Pseudomonas aeruginosa Associated with Artificial Tears)(Goldstein, Maury)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Maury)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley re #70 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley (Bryant, David)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE in Support re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Defendants Delsam Pharma, LLC, and EzriRx, LLC, SHALL RESPOND to the motion on or before June 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/13/2023.(APR)cc: COR
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Clay M. Stevens re #65 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezrirx,LLC , #67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (APR)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Stay by Ezricare, LLC Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Aru Pharma, Inc. Bankruptcy Petition, #3 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay) Modified Attachment #2 name on 6/13/2023 (APR).
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezricare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss by Ezrirx,LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Ezriel Green, #3 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay) Modified Attachment #2 name on 6/13/2023 (APR).
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delsam Pharma, LLC , MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Delsam Pharma, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Declaration of Kuppusamy Arumugam), #3 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Thomas)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DISCLOSURES Rule 26 by Alisa McMillan, Richard Mosley.(Bryant, David)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DISCLOSURES Rule 26 by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC.(Stevens, Clay)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re #60 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that all parties shall have a 10-Day Extension of Time to Exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure in this matter through and until June 5, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/30/2023. (APR)cc: COR
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Clay)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delsam Pharma, LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Parties exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 5/26/2023. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. 2. Parties file any motion to amend pleadings by 7/31/2023. 3. Parties complete class-certification fact discovery by 3/4/2024. Parties complete class-certification expert discovery by 6/7/2024. 4. NLT 4/4/2024, Plaintiffs disclose expert witnesses pertaining to class certification issues. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. NLT 5/13/2024, Defendant provide same. 5. NLT 6/17/2024, Plaintiffs file any motion for class certification. NLT 7/29/2024, Defendants file any response in opposition to class certification. NLT 8/16/2024, Plaintiffs file reply in support of class certification. 6. The Court declines to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings at this time. 7. Modification of this schedule is disfavored and will only occur under Rule 16 and/or Rule 6. 8. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. 9. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 9/29/2023 at 11:30 AM. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. To join the teleconference, parties are DIRECTED to call 1-606-371-5577 and enter Meeting ID 241 345 852#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/8/2023.(APR)cc: COR,CD
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bryant, David)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: #57 Supplemental Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (APR)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion (D.E. #45 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to effectuate service upon Defendant Global Pharma is EXTENDED to November 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 05/01/2023. (KJA)cc: COR
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Thomas McIntosh. #27 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant Delsam Pharma LLC's Time Within Which to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Delsam Pharma, LLC has been filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (APR)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Lirit A. King: re #51 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Lirit A. King (KJA)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Global Pharma Healthcare Private, LTD, filed by Richard Mosley, Alisa McMillan. Amended Complaint filed pursuant to Order at D.E. #53 . (KJA)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's motion (D.E. #43 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint (D.E. #43 -1) in the record. Defendants SHALL file their respective answers or other responses to the Amended Complaint on or before Monday, June 12, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/28/2023. (KJA)cc: COR
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The motion to extend the Rule 26(f) meeting and report deadlines (D.E. #38 ) is DENIED. The Court will enter a scheduling order. However, the parties dispute whether discovery should be bifurcated. See D.E. #37 at 4-5. The Court perceives this to be a significant decision and requires further input from the parties concerning their positions. Thus, on or before May 5, 2023, the parties SHALL file supplemental memoranda to the Rule 26(f) Status Report describing their positions on bifurcation of discovery. Any objection shall be made within 14 days to the District Judge. Failure to object waives a party's right to review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/28/2023. (KJA)cc: COR
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Plaintiff Richard Mosley is currently represented by multiple counsel, one of whom, Lirit King, has filed a motion to withdraw. The motion being compliant with Joint Local Civil Rule 83.6(a), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs motion (D.E. #49 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/28/2023. (KJA)cc: COR - Lirit King by US Mail
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT RESPONSE to #45 filed by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Delsam Pharma, LLC. (Gault, Patrick) Modified text and added filer on 4/28/2023 (APR).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED MOTION for Lirit King to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Mosley, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Lirit King, #3 Exhibit Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #4 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David) Modified text to add attorney's name on 4/27/2023 (APR).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #49 AMENDED MOTION for Lirit King to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Mosley (APR)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Richard Mosley filed by Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #43 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Richard Mosley , #38 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC (APR)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Defendants SHALL RESPOND to the motion (D.E. #45 ) on or before Friday, April 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/19/2023.(JCP)cc: COR
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons on Defendant Global Pharma Healthcare Private Ltd. by Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David) Modified text to further describe motion on 4/21/2023 (APR).
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Defendants SHALL RESPOND to the motion to amend the Complaint #43 and shall REPLY on their motion to extend/stay #38 on or before WEDNESDAY, APRIL 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/19/2023.(JCP)cc: COR
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC filed by Richard Mosley. (Bryant, David)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Hoekstra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/18/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney Update. Attorney Jennifer Hoekstra for Richard Mosley added. (JCP)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Jennifer Hoekstra: re #41 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Jennifer Hoekstra (JCP)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jennifer M. Hoekstra re #40 MOTION for Jennifer Hoekstra to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5532004). (APR)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Jennifer Hoekstra to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5532004)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND to the motion #38 on or before APRIL 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/12/2023.(JCP)cc: COR
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #38 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC (APR)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Delsam Pharma, LLC. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting)(Gault, Patrick) Modified text and added filer on 4/12/2023 (APR).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: #29 Order, (JCP)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bryant, David)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Motion to withdraw at D.E. #33 is DENIED without prejudice to the submission of a motion that complies with Local Rule 83.6.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/06/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marcus J. Bradley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/06/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Marcus J. Bradley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley and Response to Show Cause Order ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5524299)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Mosley for Lirit A. King , #34 MOTION for Marcus J. Bradley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley and Response to Show Cause Order ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5524299) (APR)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Marcus J. Bradley re #34 MOTION for Marcus J. Bradley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley and Response to Show Cause Order ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5524299). (APR)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Marcus J. Bradley: re #35 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Marcus J. Bradley (JCP)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Mosley for Lirit A. King. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David) Modified text to include name of attorney requesting to withdraw on 4/6/2023 (APR).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Note re #15 Summons Issued: Office staff for Plaintiff's counsel Bryan Aylstock called the Clerk's Office and requested a certified copy of the issued summons for India-based Global Pharma Healthcare Private Ltd. for service. Clerk took payment of certification and copy fees and certified the summons as requested. Clerk sent certified copy of issued summons to requesting counsel on this date using UPS label provided by counsel. (APR)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Court GRANTS DE #31 and DISMISSES this action as to Defendant Aru Pharma, Inc., without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 03/28/2023.(JCP)cc: COR
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Mosley (Bryant, David)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Marcus J. Bradley to promptly COMPLY with the dictates of Local Rule 83 and apply for admission to practice before this Court and to SHOW CAUSE for his failure to comply with Local Rule 83 within the allotted 30-day period by April 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 03/27/2023.(JCP)cc: COR and Marcus J. Bradley via US Mail
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Lirit A. King to promptly COMPLY with the dictates of Local Rule 83 and apply for admission to practice before this Court and to SHOW CAUSE for his failure to comply with Local Rule 83 within the allotted 30-day period by April 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 03/27/2023.(JCP)cc: COR and Lirit A. King via US Mail
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff Richard Mosley and defendant Delsam Pharma LLC hereby stipulate and agree that Delsam Pharma LLC has an extension of time, until April 28, 2023, in which to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to plaintiffs Class Action Complaint. No prior extension has been granted by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 03/24/2023. (JCP)cc: COR. Modified text on 3/24/2023 (APR).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: #8 Notice to Attorney, #9 Notice to Attorney (No Action) (JCP)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant Delsam Pharma LLC's Time Within Which to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Delsam Pharma, LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kiley L. Grombacher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 03/21/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David G. Bryant re #25 MOTION to Amend/Correct; Error: the incorrect motion relief "Amend/Correct" was selected. Entry by Attorney; Clerk re-defined the document as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (APR)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kiley L. Grombacher re #25 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley. (APR)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Kiley L. Grombacher: re #26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Kiley L. Grombacher (JCP)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #25 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley (APR)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David) Modified text and event type on 3/21/2023 (APR).
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Plaintiffs motion (D.E. #23 ) is DENIED without prejudice to the resubmission of a corrected motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 03/20/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #23 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5508709) (APR)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kiley L. Grombacher re #23 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5508709). (APR)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Kiley L. Grombacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5508709)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ezrirx,LLC. (Stevens, Clay)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ezricare, LLC. (Stevens, Clay)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review: #8 Notice to Attorney, #9 Notice to Attorney, #7 Notice to Attorney (No PHV Motions filed as of 3/13/2023) (JCP)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f) (2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: see items a-e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 03/10/2023.(JCP)cc: COR
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Mosley via Personal Service to Delsam Pharma, LLC served on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. (Aylstock, Bryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ezrirx,LLC.(Stevens, Clay)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ezricare, LLC.(Stevens, Clay)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Mosley via Personal Service to Ezrirx,LLC served on 2/23/2023, answer due 3/16/2023. (Aylstock, Bryan)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to ARU Pharma, INC., Delsam Pharma, LLC, Ezricare, LLC, Ezrirx,LLC, Global Pharma Healthcare Private, LTD; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons - ARU Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons - Delsam Pharma, LLC, #3 Summons - EZRICARE, LLC, #4 Summons - EZRIRX, LLC)(APR)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING by Richard Mosley AND REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons directed to Global, #2 Summons Summons directed to ARU Pharma, Inc., #3 Summons Summons directed to Delsam Pharma, LLC, #4 Summons Summons directed to EZRICARE, LLC, #5 Summons Summons directed to EZRIRX, LLC)(Aylstock, Bryan)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Court HEREBY GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hace vice (D.E. #10 #11 #12 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 02/07/2023. (JCP)cc: COR
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Hannah Pfeifler re #12 MOTION for Hannah Pfeifler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471604). (APR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Maury Goldstein re #10 MOTION for Maury S. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471565). (APR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Bryan F. Aylstock re #11 MOTION for Bryan F. Aylstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471595). (APR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Maury S. Goldstein: re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Maury S. Goldstein (JCP)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Bryan F. Aylstock: re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Bryan F. Aylstock (JCP)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Hannah Pfeifler: re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Hannah Pfeifler (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Hannah Pfeifler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471604)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Bryan F. Aylstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471595)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Maury S. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Mosley ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5471565)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, David)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Lirit King by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Marcus Bradley by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Kiley Grombacher by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Maury Goldstein by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Hannah Pfeifler by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Bryan Aylstock by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs).. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019.(JCP)cc: COR
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Mark P. Bryant: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #3 REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order,,,,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, Mark P. Bryant by US Mail with Notice for Attorney to Request E-filing Privileges. (JCP)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Mark P. Bryant: re #3 REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order,,,,. An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Mark P. Bryant (JCP)
February 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $402; receipt number CKYEDC-5470245), filed by Richard Mosley.(JCP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Ezricare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mosley
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kiley L. Grombacher
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Hannah Pfeifler
Represented By: Lirit A. King
Represented By: Marcus J. Bradley
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Maury Goldstein
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hoekstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa McMillan
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Kiley L. Grombacher
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Maury Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezricare, LLC
Represented By: Kristen Hannah Fowler
Represented By: Clay M. Stevens
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezrirx,LLC
Represented By: Clay M. Stevens
Represented By: Kristen Hannah Fowler
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delsam Pharma, LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Pharma Healthcare Private, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARU Pharma, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?