McKinstry v. Genser et al
Appellee: Larry Tate, Ira J. Genser and Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Appellant: Taft A. McKinstry
Case Number: 7:2013cv00125
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Floyd
Presiding Judge: Amul R. Thapar
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Trustee's objections to the bankruptcy court's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, R. 1 , are OVERRULED. While the reasons may be different, the conclusion is the same, A&M's attorneys' hourly rate is reasonable. The Court thus ADOPTS the ultimate conclusion of the Bankruptcy Court. R. 1 -2. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 8/6/2014. (TDA) cc: COR & Bankruptcy Court
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that the Trustees' Motions 23 and 89 are GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART. Court will discuss with the parties an appropriate adverse inference instruction at the final pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 7/22/2014.(RKT)cc: COR
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Trustee's renewed turnover motion pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 542(e), R. 25 , is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jones Day shall TURN OVER to Trustee all documents and records in any mediumpaper or electronicrelating to firm's representation of Black Diamond, including internal communications among Jones Day attorneys, save for purely administrative correspondence. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 3/19/2014. (TDA)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinstry v. Genser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry Tate
Represented By: Shevon L. Scarafile
Represented By: Mary Elisabeth Naumann
Represented By: Jay Edward Ingle
Represented By: John C. Goodchild, III
Represented By: Chacey R. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ira J. Genser
Represented By: Shevon L. Scarafile
Represented By: Mary Elisabeth Naumann
Represented By: Jay Edward Ingle
Represented By: John C. Goodchild, III
Represented By: Chacey R. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Represented By: John C. Goodchild, III
Represented By: Chacey R. Ford
Represented By: Jay Edward Ingle
Represented By: Mary Elisabeth Naumann
Represented By: Shevon L. Scarafile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Taft A. McKinstry
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: Ellen Arvin Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?