Worldwide Equipment of TN, Inc. v. USA

Plaintiff: Worldwide Equipment of TN, Inc.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 7:2014cv00108
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Floyd
Presiding Judge: Amul R. Thapar
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) The United States renewed motion to dismiss, R. 147 , is GRANTED. (2) Worldwides complaints in the four consolidated cases are DISMISSED. (3) This action is STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. (4) All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all scheduled hearings are CANCELLED. (5) A separate judgment will issue. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 12/12/16.(MJY) cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2016: # 1 Main Document) (MJY).
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) The governments motion to dismiss and for summary judgment, R. 75 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Worldwide may not proceed on its claim for a tax refund on trucks equipped to haul water, fuel, lube , or fly ash. The governments motion is otherwise denied. (2) Worldwides motion for summary judgment, R. 72 , is DENIED. (3) Worldwides motion to exclude the testimony of the governments experts, R. 73 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 6/23/16.(MJY)cc: COR
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Worldwides motion in limine to exclude all post-sale use evidence, R. 71 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 6/15/2016.(MJY)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worldwide Equipment of TN, Inc. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldwide Equipment of TN, Inc.
Represented By: Lori G. Heilman
Represented By: Drew M. Hicks
Represented By: Michael J. Moeddel
Represented By: William A. Posey
Represented By: Mark E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?