McKinstry et al v. Richard Holmes Enterprises, LLC
Appellant: Taft A. McKinstry and Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
Appellee: Richard Holmes Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 7:2015cv00096
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Amul R. Thapar
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) RHE's motion to unseal the record, R. 106 , is GRANTED. Consistent with this opinion, Clerk shall wait for further orders before unsealing records. (2) Parties SHALL NOTIFY Court of any document tha t contains the A&M settlement amount by Thursday, August 25, 2016. (3) Parties SHALL FILE redacted versions of any document longer than two pages that contains A&M settlement amount by Thursday, September 1, 2016. (4) McKinstry a nd Dinsmore & Shohl SHALL RESPOND to RHE's motion for reconsideration, R. 104 , by Thursday, September 1, 2016. RHE will have until Thursday, September 8, 2016, to reply. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 8/18/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) The bankruptcy court's reconsideration order conditioning reopening on repayment of funds, Underlying Bankruptcy, D.E. 2348 (filed Oct. 10, 2015), is AFFIRMED. (2) The bankruptcy court's contempt o rder, Underlying Bankruptcy, D.E. 2391, is AFFIRMED. (3) The bankruptcy court's order dismissing adversary proceeding, In re Black Diamond Mining Co., LLC, et al., Case No. 15-07007-THF (Bankr. E.D. Ky. 2015), D.E. 7 , is AFFIRMED. (4) McKinstry's appeal of order reopening case, R. 1 , is DISMISSED AS MOOT. (5) The parties' motions to seal, R. 72 ; R. 75 ; R. 84 ; R. 87 ; R. 90 ; R. 95 , are GRANTED. To protect public's interest, parties have filed public, redacted versions of their briefs on the record. See R. 74 ; R. 77 ; R. 85 ; R. 88 ; R. 93 ; R. 97 . Clerk of Court shall keep parties' briefs and other filings, R. 73 ; R. 76 ; R. 86 ; R. 89 ; R. 91 ; R. [98 ], UNDER SEAL. (6) Holmes Enterprises' motion for leave to appeal bankruptcy court's order denying the stay, R. 80 , is DENIED AS MOOT. McKinstry's motion to dismiss Holmes Enterprises' appeal of bankruptcy court's denial of stay, R. 81 , is also DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 6/16/2016. (RCB)cc: COR
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Holmes Enterprises's motion for stay pending appeal of the bankruptcy court's revised order dated October 2, 2015, R. 21 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 2/5/2016. (RCB)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinstry et al v. Richard Holmes Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Taft A. McKinstry
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Goodman
Represented By: David B. Goroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
Represented By: Michael R. Limrick
Represented By: David James Treacy
Represented By: Wayne C. Turner
Represented By: Patrick A. Ziepolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard Holmes Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: C. Thomas Ezzell
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Timothy F. Lee
Represented By: Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?