Bentley v. Highlands Hospital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Robyn Bentley |
Defendant: |
Highlands Hospital Corporation, Consolidated Health Systems, Inc., Terry D. Hall, Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Thomas B. Styer and Whitaker National Corporation |
Case Number: |
7:2015cv00097 |
Filed: |
October 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Pikeville Office |
County: |
Floyd |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward B. Atkins |
Presiding Judge: |
Amul R. Thapar |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
564
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) PBH, Dr. Styer, and Whitaker's motion to join in Highlands's Daubert challenge to Dr. Pardo's causation opinion, R. 478 , is GRANTED. (2) PBH, Dr. Styer, and Whitaker's motion to exclude Dr. Pardo's causation opinion, R. 444 , is DENIED. (3) PBH's motion to exclude Dr. DeLorenzo's causation opinion, R. 443 , is DENIED. (4) PBH's motion to exclude Dr. DeLorenzo and Dr. Betz's capacity opinions, R. 441 , is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The doctors may testify regarding the side effects of the three prescriptions medications as a general matter, but they may not testify that Bentley's medication regimen actually rendered her unfit to sign the release in February 2014. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 12/27/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
|
December 13, 2016 |
Filing
497
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Dr. Styer and Whitaker National Corporation's motion for summary judgment, R. 351 , is DENIED. (2) PBH's motion for summary judgment, R. 352 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 12/13/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
428
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Bentley's objections to Judge Atkins's Order of June 14, 2016, R. 340 , are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART. Bentley's objections are sustained as to the correction of a treating nurse 's name in Patricia Bartzak's expert report and as to Dr. Robert DeLorenzo's "Rebuttal Expert Report" dated May 9, 2016, R. 238 -3. Bentley's objections are overruled in all other respects. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 10/6/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
139
ORDER: Plas Motion to Compel (R. 82 ) shall be GRANTED IN PART, and DENIED IN PART. Requests for Production Nos. 37 and 41 shall be granted, while the remainder of the interrogatories and requests to which Defendant HRMC has objected shall be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 2/23/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?