Griffith v. SSA
Plaintiff: Carol Griffith
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2016cv00101
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that the plaintiffs' motions for attorney's fees under the EAJA R. 63 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10-15-19.(MJY)cc: COR
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Dft Carolyn Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security's, motions for summary judgment in part, 11 , are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/15/2016.(RCB)cc: COR
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff Carol Griffith' motion for a preliminary injunction (Record No. 15 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/6/2016. (TDA) cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Griffith
Represented By: Wolodymyr Cybriwsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: John S. Osborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?