Allen et al v. Equitrans, Limited et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Allen and Anthony Allen
Defendant: Equitrans, Limited and Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv00083
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Floyd
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #22 Reply to Response to Motion (MJY)
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Allen MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Anthony Allen, Lisa Allen. (Note: Filed Per Order DE #21 ). (MJY)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply R. #20 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/24/18. (MJY) cc: COR
September 20, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Allen MOTION for Attorney Fees (MJY)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Reply to Response to Motion, #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Allen MOTION for Attorney Fees by Anthony Allen Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Conley, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Allen MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Anthony Allen. (Conley, Michael)
September 19, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Anthony Allen (TDA)
September 7, 2018 Filing 18 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC.(Hollabaugh, Lela)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 FRCP 26(A)(2) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Anthony Allen, Lisa Allen.(Conley, Michael) Modified text on 9/7/2018 (TDA).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY 1. (a) parties stipulate preliminary disclosures exchanged by September 7, 2018. (b) All fact discovery completed by July 1, 2019. 2. Parties observe directives re filing discovery material unless Court specifically so orders: see items a-e. 3. Discovery disputes shall be resolved as required by Rule 37(a)(2)(A) and Local Rule 37.1, see items a-c. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (a) By December 3, 2018 parties file motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings. (b) By August 1, 2019 parties file dispositive motions, Daubert motion, and/or motions in limine. PRETRIAL 1. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for Wednesday, October 30, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Frankfort, KY. 2. By October 1, 2019, counsel file items a-c. 3. NLT 7 days prior to FPTC, counsel shall comply items a-e. Counsel comply with items 4 & 5. 6. Court Copies be submitted to chambers electronically: see items (a)-(e). TRIAL Jury Trial set for November 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Pikeville, KY, w/ counsel @ 9:30 a.m. Trial expected to last 4 days. EXTENSIONS OF TIME Requests to modify dates or deadlines be submitted upon motion showing good cause. REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE matter referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for: 1. Supervising discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2. Conducting all pretrial and status conferences, establishing & extending discovery deadlines, and all other deadlines, holding such hearings required, and ruling on non-dispositive motions, except motions in limine. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/5/2018. (TDA) cc: COR & FktCD
September 4, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anthony Allen MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Connie J. Hancock, #2 Exhibit Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Hollabaugh, Lela)
August 31, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #14 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TDA)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Candace)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equitrans, Limited identifying Corporate Parent EQT Corporation, Other Affiliate EQT GP Holdings, LP, Other Affiliate EQT Midstream Partners, LP for Equitrans, Limited.. (West, John)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Under FED. R. CIV. P. 26 (a)(1) by Equitrans, Limited.(Smith, Candace)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Equitrans Limited Crossclaimim by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (Hollabaugh, Lela) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (TDA).
August 14, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO MICHAEL CONLEY re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court; Error: This motion requests 2 forms of relief and only one form of relief was selected; Entry by attorney; Clerk added the motion relief requested. In the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, select a motion relief for each relief requested, so all motions will appear on the Judge's motion report. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (TDA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (Hollabaugh, Lela)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Anthony Allen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding, #2 Proposed Order Costs Fees)(Conley, Michael). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 8/14/2018 (TDA).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: 1. NLT 30 days from date of this order, parties shall conduct meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures. 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties shall file a written joint report. This report shall conform to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Appendix Form 52, and include the following info: (i) whether parties consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Consent forms are attached and forms signed by all parties' filed NLT than date counsels' joint status report is due. If parties consent, Clerk shall re-assign this matter to appropriate Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge form)(RCB)cc: COR
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Pla's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 is GRANTED; and 2. Lela M. Hollabaugh is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dft Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/8/2018.(RCB)cc: COR, Hollabaugh w/ECF Notice & Registration Form via U.S. mail
August 8, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Lela M. Hollabaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4138480). (TDA)
August 8, 2018 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Lela M. Hollabaugh re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4138480). (TDA)
August 7, 2018 ANSWER AND CROSSCLAIM against Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, filed by Equitrans, Limited. State Court Pleading(TDA)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Equitrans, Limited Notice of Filing of Answer and Cross Claim filed in Floyd Circuit Court on August 6, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer and Cross Claim)(West, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Equitrans, Limited. (West, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Lela M. Hollabaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4138480) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Admission Status)(Epling, Brian)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge, Inc. for Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC.. (Epling, Brian)
August 7, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Floyd Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-459. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4137613), filed by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record) (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Equitrans, Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitrans, Limited
Represented By: John Kevin West
Represented By: Candace Beth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Lela M. Hollabaugh
Represented By: Brian R. Epling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Allen
Represented By: Adam P. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Allen
Represented By: Adam P. Collins
Represented By: Michael Patrick Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?