Forbes v. Kizziah

Petitioner: Dennis A. Forbes
Respondent: Gregory Kizziah
Case Number: 7:2018cv00108
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court previously dismissed this action, without prejudice, on September 26, 2018, due to Petitioners failure to file the applicable filing fee. DE #4 . Although the Court has now received Forbess filing fee, tendered on November 1, 2018 (DE #5 ), Forbes has not moved for reconsideration1 in this case or re-filed a new action. The Court will not reopen a case on its own motion, and the action stands dismissed. Forbes shall promptly file a motion if he seeks to reinstate the case. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11-7-2018.(MJY)cc: COR, Forbes via US Mail
November 1, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #5 Filing Fee Received (MJY)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Filing Fee Filing fee received - $ 5.00, receipt number 7005403 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope postmark 10-30-18) (MJY)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Dennis A. Forbes filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus However, Petitioner neither paid the filing fee, nor filed a motion to proceed IFP. The Court therefore denies the petition w/out prejudice. Forbes may file a new action in compliance with the rules stated above. The Clerk may provide appropriate forms. If Forbes is unable to pay the filing fee or move for pauper status simultaneously with the filing of any future petition, he must send with his petition copies of documents he filed with the prison, such as a Form BP-199, to request payment of the filing fee. For these reasons, the Court DENIES DE #1 WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRIKES this matter from the active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/26/18.(MJY) cc: COR, Dennis A. Forbes. Modified text on 9/26/2018 (MJY).
September 20, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. No Fees Paid. (MJY)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MJY)
September 20, 2018 Conflict Check run. (MJY)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dennis A. Forbes, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dennis Forbes, #2 Exhibit - Miscellaneous Immigration Documents, #3 Envelope Postmarked 9-17-18 Recieved from Martin Circuit Court) No Fees Paid(MJY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forbes v. Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis A. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?