Webb v. Blackjewel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Webb
Defendant: Blackjewel, LLC and Revelation Energy, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv00121
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Mark Heath re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion. Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (MJY)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Webb FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees by David Webb filed by Blackjewel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heath, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Dfts' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #10 is hereby GRANTED. Dfts shall be granted an additional 14 days, or until January 21, 2019, to file their Response in Opposition to Plaf's Motion for Remand. In support of this Order, the Court finds that granting the Dfts' Motion will cause no unfair prejudice to the Plaf, will assist the Court in addressing the matter on the merits, and has been filed with no intention to inflict unnecessary delay in this proceeding. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/8/19.(MJY) cc: COR
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Webb FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees by David Webb by Revelation Energy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand)(Heath, Mark)
December 21, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MJY)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Heath, Mark)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Webb , FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees by David Webb (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Costs Fees)(Conley, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blackjewel, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC. (Heath, Mark)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) within 21 days from date of service of this Order, parties shall meet. (2) within 10 days after the meeting parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2018. (RCB)cc: COR
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to plaintiff's complaint by Blackjewel, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC.(Frye, Eric)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackjewel, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC for Revelation Energy, LLC; Corporate Parent Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C. for Blackjewel, LLC.. (Frye, Eric)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Eric T. Frye. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Blackjewel, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
November 29, 2018 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knott Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-239, filed by Blackjewel, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4224646) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Knott Circuit Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Blackjewel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackjewel, LLC
Represented By: Eric Thomas Frye
Represented By: Mark Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revelation Energy, LLC
Represented By: Eric Thomas Frye
Represented By: Mark Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Webb
Represented By: Adam P. Collins
Represented By: Michael Patrick Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?