Polly et al v. National Trust Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Travis Brown, Whitney Brown and Gregory Polly
Defendant: Erie Insurance Exchange, Shaylee Boyd, B & B Distributors, Inc. and National Trust Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Roy Conn
Intervenor Plaintiff: Dallas R. Garrett, Sally M. Garrett and Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Company
Cross Defendant: Dillard S. Boyd
3Rd Party Defendant: Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00009
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly, #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly (RCB)
February 27, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #12 SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL (RCB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Trust Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Agreed Dismissal Order for Erie Ins., #2 Exhibit Executed Agreed Dismissal Order Erie Ins.)(Orberson, William) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (RCB).
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly filed by National Trust Insurance Company. (Orberson, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly filed by National Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gambrel v American National, #2 Exhibit Fenton v. Speedway, LLC)(Orberson, William)
February 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #9 Joint Status Report (RCB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by National Trust Insurance Company, Gregory Polly, Travis Brown, Whitney Brown. (Orberson, William) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (RCB).
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 INCORRECTLY FILED JOINT STATUS REPORT by National Trust Insurance Company. (Orberson, William) Modified text, restriction on 2/7/2019 (RCB). See DE #9 for correct document.
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Attorney's Fees)(Salyer, Kyle)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Travis Brown, Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Remanding)(Salyer, Kyle)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) that 21 days from date of this Order, parties shall meet to discuss their claims and possibilities for settlement. (2) that within 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/28/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
January 25, 2019 Clerk's Note: Darrin Banks terminated as COR for Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Dismissed in State Court) pursuant to his request. (RCB)
January 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by National Trust Insurance Company. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against B & B Distributors, Inc., Shaylee Boyd, Roy Conn, Erie Insurance Exchange, National Trust Insurance Company filed by Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly, Travis Brown. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Roy Conn's Crossclaim as Set Forth in Roy Conn's Answer to First Amended Complaint by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to B & B Distributors, Inc., and Roy Conn's Crossclaim Set Forth in Defendants' Answer to Intervening Complaint by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to B & B Distributors, Inc.'s, Crossclaim Set Forth in Answer to First Amended Complaint by Dillard S. Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to B & B Distributors, Inc., and Roy Conn's Crossclaim Set Forth in Defendants' Answer to Intervening Complaint by Dillard S. Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Roy Conn's Crossclaim as Set Forth in Answer to Amended Complaint by Dillard S. Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to B & B Distributors, Inc.'s, Answer to First Amended Complaint Crossclaim by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document)(RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Dillard S. Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Dillard S. Boyd, Shaylee Boyd by Roy Conn, B & B Distributors, Inc. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against B & B Distributors, Inc., Shaylee Boyd, Roy Conn filed by Whitney Brown, Gregory Polly, Travis Brown. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document)(RCB)
January 23, 2019 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Dallas R. Garrett, Sally M. Garrett. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Crossclaim B & B Distributors, Inc., by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Company by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Answer to Third Party National Trust Insurance Company's Crossclaim by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 CROSSCLAIM against Shaylee Boyd filed by B & B Distributors, Inc. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 AMENDED ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Shaylee Boyd by National Trust Insurance Company. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by National Trust Insurance Company. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against National Trust Insurance Company, Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company filed by Roy Conn. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Roy Conn's Crossclaim by Shaylee Boyd. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Erie Insurance Exchange. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Shaylee Boyd. (RCB) (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document)
January 23, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Shaylee Boyd by Roy Conn. (RCB) (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Trust Insurance Company. (RCB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Phillips, William B. Orberson, James C. Wade on behalf of National Trust Insurance Company. (RCB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Floyd Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-44, filed by National Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit - Dismissal Orders (State Court), #3 Exhibit - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions (State Court), #4 Exhibit - Case Law, #5 Exhibit - Kentucky Trial Court Review, #6 State Court Record - Part 1, #7 State Court Record - Part 2, #8 State Court Record - Part 3, #9 State Court Record - Part 4, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court))(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polly et al v. National Trust Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Roy Conn
Represented By: Dustin Robert Williams
Represented By: Gary C. Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Wendy J. Elswick
Represented By: William J. Baird, IV
Represented By: Cassondra D. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaylee Boyd
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: Laci B. Browning
Represented By: L. R. Sammons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Wade
Represented By: John W. Phillips
Represented By: William B. Orberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Brown
Represented By: Kyle R. Salyer
Represented By: Michael Shane Hall
Represented By: Kolbe Aaron Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Brown
Represented By: Kyle R. Salyer
Represented By: Michael Shane Hall
Represented By: Kolbe Aaron Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Polly
Represented By: Kyle R. Salyer
Represented By: Michael Shane Hall
Represented By: Kolbe Aaron Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dallas R. Garrett
Represented By: Randy G. Slone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sally M. Garrett
Represented By: Randy G. Slone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine M. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dillard S. Boyd
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Represented By: L. R. Sammons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Darrin Winn Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?