Manns v. Varney et al

Plaintiff: Tony Manns
Defendant: Margaret W. Varney and Rita K. Thacker
Case Number: 7:2019cv00012
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: (1) DENIES DE #13 , but without prejudice to resubmission with the certified inmate account statement; (2) Clerk SHALL send Manns a EDKY Form 523. Manns must have prison staff sign Certificate of Inmate Account and file with Court. Sixth Circuit MAY dismiss the appeal for lack of prosecution if Manns fails to file document within 30 days; and, (3) Clerk SHALL send a copy of this Order to Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKY Form 523)(RCB)cc: COR, 6CCA, Manns w/EDKy 523 via U.S. mail
March 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Manns (TDA)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Manns. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Postmarked 3/12/19)(TDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-5177, Case Manager Robin L. Johnson, for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Tony Manns. (RCB)
February 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #11 Notice of Appeal (RCB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order, #10 Order, by Tony Manns pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm 2/22/19) cc: COR, 6CCA, Manns w/attest copy & docket sheet(RCB)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plf Tony Manns moved "for reconsideration or... to amend under Rule 15(c)(2)." DE #9 (Motion). The Court wholly denies the effort. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 2/12/2019. (RCB)cc: COR, Manns via U.S. mail
February 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Judgment, #6 Order by Tony Manns MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint (Referred) by Tony Manns (RCB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration or MOTION to Amend under Civil Rule 15(c)(2) by Tony Manns pro se, re #7 Judgment, #6 Order #1 Complaint. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm 2/8/19)(RCB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court (re certificate of inmate account, application to proceed In forma pauperis) by Tony Manns pro se (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm 2/1/19)(RCB)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: 1. Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts; 2. Court enters JUDGMENT against Plf; 3. Court DISMISSES Plf's complaint with prejudice; 4. This is a final Judgment as to rights and liabilities of all claims and parties; and 5. Court STRIKES this matter from active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/28/2019. (RCB)cc: COR, Mann via U.S. mail
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Court DISMISSES this case, with prejudice, and STRIKES it from active docket. Court will enter a separate judgment. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/28/2019. (RCB)cc: COR, Mann via U.S. mail
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Court GRANTS Manns's construed motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Because Court grants Manns pauper status, the $50.00 administrative fee is waived. 1. Clerk shall open an account in Manns's name for receipt of filing fee. Clerk shall complete Form EDKY 525 and send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden. 2. In light of de minimis balance in Manns's inmate account, payment of initial partial filing fee is deferred. 3. Each month his custodian shall deduct from the account an amount equal to 20% of his income for preceding month and remit to Clerk until entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525 form)(RCB)cc: COR, Finance, Warden w/EDKy 525, Mann via U.S. mail
January 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #3 Prisoner Inmate Account Statement (RCB)
January 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(RCB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Inmate Account Statement by Tony Manns pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm 1/22/19)(RCB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tony Manns pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm 1/22/19)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manns v. Varney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Manns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret W. Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita K. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?