Coleman v. Arrington et al

Plaintiff: Fredrick Coleman
Defendant: Nurse Taylor, Nurse Burchett, Nurse Billiter, Nurse Whitson and Nurse Arrington
Case Number: 7:2019cv00028
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: the five defendants must file an answer or otherwise respond to the Plas complaint by no later than Friday, August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/24/2019. (TDA) cc: COR & Coleman via US Mail
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Regarding Acceptance of Service by Arrington, Whitson. (Fleming, Tiffany)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrick Coleman via Certified Mail by USM to U.S. Attorney General's office served04/29/19, re #9 Order. (MJY)
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to US Attorney's Office; re #17 Order received 4/29/19. (MJY)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrick Coleman via certified mail by USM to U.S. Attorney's office served on 4/25/19re #9 Order. (MJY)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1. Clerk shall send a copy of this Order via certified mail to the USA's Office for EDKY. 2. USAs Office shall promptly determine whether the Bureau of Prisons possesses valid forwarding addresses for Nurses Arrington and Whitson. 3. If the Bureau of Prisons does not possess these addresses, the United States Attorneys Office shall so advise the Court w/in 30 days from the entry of this Order. 4. Alternatively, if the Bureau of Prisons does possess these addresses, the USAs Office shall determine whether Nurses Arrington and Whitson will permit it to accept service of process on their behalf. The USAs Office shall then provide the Court with a status update w/in 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/25/19.(MJY) cc: COR, Coleman via US Mail; USA via Certified Mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (MJY).
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted via USM 285 by Fredrick Coleman as to Nurse Whitson. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrick Coleman via USM to Billiter served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrick Coleman via USM to Burchett served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrick Coleman via USM to Nurse Taylor served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted via USM 285 by Fredrick Coleman as to Nurse Arrington. (MJY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Arrington, Billiter, Burchett, Taylor, Whitson. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (TDA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2019: #1 USM Receipt) (RCB).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Clerk shall prepare 7 "Service Packets" for Nurse Arrington, Nurse Taylor, Nurse Burchett, Nurse Billiter, and Nurse Whitson, as well as USA. Each Packet shall include: a. completed summons form; b. complaint (R. #1 ); c. this Order; and d. completed USM Form 285. 2. Clerk shall send Service Packets to USMS in Lexington, KY and note date of delivery. 3. USMS personally serve dfts Arrington, Taylor, Burchett, Billiter & Whitson at USP-Big Sandy through BOP. 4. USMS serve USA by sending packet by certified or registered mail to USA and USAG. 5. Coleman advise Clerk of any change of mailing address. Failure may result in dismissal of case. 6. Every motion must include certification of mailing to dfts and state date. Court will disregard letters sent to chambers or lacking a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2019. (TDA) cc: Coleman via US Mail & USM (TDA).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Coleman's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (R. #3 ) is GRANTED. 2. Court WAIVES payment of $50.00 administrative fee. Ultimately, since Coleman has already paid the $350 filing fee, he has fully satisfied his financial obligations in case. 3. This matter now stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/16/2019. (TDA) cc: Coleman via US Mail
April 11, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Fredrick Coleman re #7 Letter : The Clerk of Court cannot provide legal advice. You may prepare a motion requesting the relief sought to be filed in your case.In response to a request for the status of your case, a courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. The docket sheet provides a timeline of the activity in your case with a list of filings in the case to date. cc: Fredrick Coleman by US Mail. (MJY)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Fredrick Coleman, Pro Se. re docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 4-9-19) (MJY)
March 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 $350 Filing Fee Received. (TDA)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 FILING FEE received - $350 paid w/out $50 administrative fee, receipt number 7005570. (TDA)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page) (TDA)
March 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrick Coleman. (TDA)
March 20, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Inmate Account by Fredrick Coleman pro se. (TDA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrick Coleman pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (TDA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge, filed by Fredrick Coleman pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts, #2 BP 8 Request for Administrative Remedy, #3 BP 9 Request for Administrative Remedy, #4 BP 10 Administrative Remedy Appeal, #5 BP 11 Response, #6 Cover Letter re Filing Fee, #7 Envelope Postmark Not Legible)(TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Arrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Billiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Whitson
Represented By: Tiffany Konwiczka Fleming, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Arrington
Represented By: Tiffany Konwiczka Fleming, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?