Padgett v. Big Sandy Regional Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Padgett
Defendant: Deputy Kenneth Swaffer, Big Sandy Regional Detention Center, James Workman, Lt. Michael Copley, Johnson Co. Sheriffs Department, Kenny and Lt. Josh Cole
Case Number: 7:2019cv00033
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Josh Cole, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman.(Shaw, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Shaw on behalf of Josh Cole, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman (Shaw, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #27 Sealed Document. (MJY)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to LEAVE OF COURT re #26 Order,,, by Big Sandy Regional Detention Center, Josh Cole, Michael Copley, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman (Shaw, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: 1. Clerk shall send copy of this order to: Jail Administrator Big Sandy Regional Detention Center. 2. Within 21 days, counsel for BSRDC shall determine whether agency possesses valid forwarding address for Lieutenant Josh Cole, Deputy Kenneth Swaffer, and Lieutenant James Workman, former employees of BSRDC. 3. If BSRDC does not possess requested information, counsel shall so advise Court. 4. If BSRDC does possess relevant address(es), BSRDC or its counsel shall file addresses ex parte in order to permit USMS to effect personal service on former employees while maintaining their confidentiality. The addresses will be maintained ex parte, only used for purpose of service of process, and will not be provided to pla or general public. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/19/2019. (TDA) cc: COR, Padgett & BSRDC via US Mail
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: defense counsel's Motion to Amend/Correct (R. #24 ) is GRANTED. Court NOTICES Mr. Jonathan Shaw as Counsel of Record for Dft Lieutenant Michael Copely in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/10/2019. (TDA) cc: COR & Padgett via US Mail
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Notice of Appearance, #12 Notice of Appearance by Josh Cole, Michael Copley, Johnson Co. Sheriffs Department, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman Per Court's Deficiency Order [R. 18] Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED Subpoenas submitted by Michael Dewayne Padgett pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Postmarked 6/3/19)(TDA)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Padgett's Motion to Appoint Counsel #19 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/3/2019. (RCB)cc: COR, Padgett via U.S. mail
June 1, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Copley.(Shaw, Jonathan)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jonathan Shaw re #20 RESPONSE; Error: a link was not created to the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the response on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Copley. (Shaw, Jonathan) Modified to create link on 5/31/2019 (RCB).
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Dewayne Padgett, Pro Se. (MJY)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Dewayne Padgett, Pro Se. Motions referred to P O. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Postmarked 5-28-19)(MJY)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: 1. Defense counsel Shaw must either (a) file a notice clarifying that he wishes to remain counsel of record for all four defendants, or (b) if Shaw wishes to withdraw as counsel for some of the defendants, he must satisfactorily comply with Local Rule 83.6; 2. Shaw must take one of these two steps within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 5/28/2019. (TDA) cc: Padgett via US Mail
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Shaw on behalf of Big Sandy Regional Detention Center, Michael Copley, Johnson Co. Sheriffs Department (Shaw, Jonathan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Josh Cole; no longer works at BSDC. (TDA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Kenneth Swaffer; no longer works at BSDC. (TDA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to James Workman; no longer works at BSDC. (TDA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dewayne Padgett via US Marshal to Michael Copley served on 5/15/2019. (TDA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Jonathan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Josh Cole, Michael Copley, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (TDA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #1 USM Time Stamped) (TDA).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The allegations in Claims 1-4 against Dfts Lieutenant Michael Copley, Lieutenant Josh Cole, Deputy Kenneth Swaffer, and Lieutenant James Workman in their individual capacities survive Court's 28:1915(e)(2) screening and may PROCEED as set forth below; 2. The allegations in Claims 1-4 against Dfts in their official capacities are DISMISSED; 3. Claims 5 & 6 are DISMISSED; 4. Clerk shall prepare 4 "Service Packets" for Lieutenant Michael Copley, Lieutenant Josh Cole, Deputy Kenneth Swaffer, and Lieutenant James Workman. Each Packet shall include: a. completed summons form; b. complaint; c. order Grant IFP; d. this order; and e. completed USM Form 285. 5. Clerk shall send Service Packets to USMS in Lexington, KY and note date of delivery. 6. USMS personally serve dfts at Big Sandy Regional Detention Center through agreement with BSRDC. 7. Padgett must immediately advise Clerk of any change of mailing address. Failure may result in dismissal of case. 8. Every motion must include certification of mailing to dfts and state date. Court will disregard letters sent to chambers or lacking a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/6/2019. (TDA) cc: Padgett & USM
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Padgett's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (R. #3 ) is GRANTED. Section 1915(b)(1) requires inmate pay $350 filing fee for civil action; 2. Because of the lack of available assets currently in Padgett's account, payment of an initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED; 3. Clerk shall open account for receipt of filing fee. Clerk complete Form EDKY 525 containing: (1) Padgett's name, (2) inmate registration #, and (3) case number. Clerk serve copy of Order and Notice upon warden of institution currently confined; 4. Each month custodian shall send Clerk payment in amount equal to 20% of income, but only if exceeds $10, until entire $350 paid. 5. Immediately advise Clerk of change in address. Failure may result in dismissal; and 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form EDKY 525) (TDA) cc: Padgett & Warden via US Mail & Finance
April 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (TDA)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page) (TDA)
April 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00046. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Padgett w/ docket sheet
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/22/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at Pikeville, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should any filings in this action be filed in this Court in the future, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Clerk, ED/KY, Southern Division (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 4/22/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Dewayne Padgett, pro se (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Sandy Regional Detention Center, Josh Cole, Michael Copley, Johnson Co. Sheriffs Department, Kenneth Swaffer, James Workman, filed by Michael Dewayne Padgett, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Summons) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Big Sandy Regional Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kenneth Swaffer
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sandy Regional Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Workman
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Michael Copley
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Co. Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Josh Cole
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?