Barnett v. SSA

Plaintiff: Ricky Darryl Barnett
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00035
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: : 1. Pla move for summary judgment w/in 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 30 days of plas motion for SJ; 3. Motions governed by LR 7.1. 4. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. 5. Nothing shall preclude judge from hearing oral argument. 6. Clerk file this Order in all SSA actions. 7. This GO supersedes GO 09-13. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2013. (MJY)cc: COR
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Darryl Barnett via Certified Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 4/29/19; Service to U.S. Attorney executed via certified mail on 4/29/19; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via certified mail on 5/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service SSA, #2 Proof of Service USAG, #3 Proof of Service USA)(Moak, Jacob) Modified text & answer date on 5/8/2019 (TDA).
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MJY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4343600), filed by Ricky Darryl Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for SSA, #3 Summons for USAG, #4 Summons for USA)(MJY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Darryl Barnett
Represented By: John Earl Hunt
Represented By: Jacob Thomas Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?