Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Big Sandy Health Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Defendant: Big Sandy Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00040
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Sandy Health Care, Inc.. (Knappick, Justin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: re #5 Parties' Agreed Motion to Extend Dft's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead is GRANTED. Dft shall file an answer or otherwise plead on or before September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/20/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Justin Knappick. #5 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint has been filed by Big Sandy Health Care, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
June 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #5 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc., Big Sandy Health Care, Inc. (RCB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead re #1 Complaint by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc., Big Sandy Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knappick, Justin) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (RCB).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.. (Erena, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Michael Erena. #1 Complaint has been filed by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
May 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4358338) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Big Sandy Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gregory Erena
Represented By: Stephen S. Burchett
Represented By: Christopher Flynn Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sandy Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Justin L. Knappick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?