Granite State Insurance Company v. Midway Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Company
Defendant: Midway Resources, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00042
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Midway Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maclin, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days parties shall meet to consider topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of meeting, parties shall file a joint status report containing: a-d, e. whether they consent to jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(RCB)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Midway Resources, LLC.(Maclin, Robert)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO James Tyler Ward, II: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #8 Agreed Order. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, James Tyler Ward, II, by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (RCB)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER: re #7 the deadline for Dft, Midway Resources, LLC, to file its Answer, is EXTENDED, and Dft, Midway Resources, LLC, shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint on or before JUNE 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/11/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
June 10, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #7 Proposed Agreed Order (RCB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Midway Resources, LLC, Granite State Insurance Company Notice of Filing of Proposed Agreed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Barrera, Elizabeth) Modified text, event on 6/10/2019 (RCB).
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midway Resources, LLC. (Barrera, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Midway Resources, LLC. (Barrera, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Midway Resources, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (RCB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite State Insurance Company. (RCB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4364585) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Audit, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite State Insurance Company v. Midway Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Resources, LLC
Represented By: James Tyler Ward, II
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?