Smith et al v. Carnes et al
Plaintiff: Tara Smith and Matthew Smith
Defendant: Bobby W. Carnes, Progressive Direct Insurance Company and Hills Trucking Company, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00044
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (RCB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Edwards, Blake)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Bobby W. Carnes, Hills Trucking Company, Inc. of Intial Rule 26 Disclosures (Edwards, Blake)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Matthew Smith, Tara Smith.(Ferrell, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: 1. NLT 30 days from date of this order, parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f). 2. At time of meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, supp when required by Rule 26(e). 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties shall file a written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan. This report shall conform to FRCP Appendix Form 52: a-h. (i) whether parties consent to jurisdiction of a mag. judge. Consent forms are attached. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (RCB)cc: COR
July 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Complaint (State Court) (RCB)
June 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hills Trucking Company, Inc. (RCB)
June 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bobby W. Carnes, Hills Trucking Company, Inc. (NOTE: State Court Pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document) (RCB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00185, filed by Hills Trucking Company, Inc., Bobby W. Carnes. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4375288) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Virginia Secretary of State Information re Hills Trucking, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs' Responses to Requests for Admissions re Damages, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Carnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby W. Carnes
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Blake Van Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey B. Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Trucking Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Blake Van Edwards
Represented By: Kelsey B. Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Smith
Represented By: Joshua S. Ferrell
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Smith
Represented By: Joshua S. Ferrell
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?