Justice v. Lowes Home Improvement, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Justice
Defendant: Lowes Home Improvement, LLC, Lowes Home Centers, LLC, James Little and John Doe(s)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00051
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Kim Justice filed by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Gayheart v. Wal-mart)(Mays, Laura)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER by Kim Justice re #4 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Kim Justice (Hamilton, James) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (TDA).
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY & NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO JAMES HAMILTON re #4 FIRST MOTION to Remand; Entry by Attorney; Error #1: the memorandum was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY when you cannot electronically prepare your documents with word processing software and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. Error #2: Exhibit was filed together with the motion instead of as separate attachment. Clerk added the exhibit as separate attachment. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another and separate from the main document. No further action required by counsel. Error #3: attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing," file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (TDA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Kim Justice (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hamilton, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #2 CORRECT Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Store Manager Description) (TDA). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #4 Proposed Order) (TDA).
July 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (TDA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-613. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4415795), filed by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, #2 State Court Record Affidavit of James Little, #3 State Court Record Answers & Order Dismissing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. Lowes Home Improvement, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Improvement, LLC
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Represented By: Gene Smallwood, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Kissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Little
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Justice
Represented By: Destiny S. Hamilton
Represented By: James L. Hamilton
Represented By: Destiny Shae Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?