Cornett et al v. Dobson et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Cornett and Whitney Williams
Defendant: Jeffery Dobson and The Knott County Fiscal Court
Case Number: 7:2020cv00013
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service by Jeffery Dobson, Jeffery Dobson, The Knott County Fiscal Court Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Shaw, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (RCB).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: (A) DEADLINES AND CASE SCHEDULE (1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by April 9, 2020. (2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings by July 15, 2020. (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures Pla by August 14, 2020; Dft September 17, 2020. (4) Fact Discovery by November 13, 2020. (5) Expert Discovery by November 30, 2020 (6) Status Report by November 30, 2020. (7) Dispositive or Daubert Motions by December 15, 2020. (8) Copies of Memoranda Copy of briefs & memo be provided to Chambers w/in 48 hours; courtesy copy be emailed to chambers. (B) REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE & PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY PROCEDURE (1) case referred to Mag Judge Edward B. Atkins to supervise discovery & pretrial & status conferences, hold hearings, and rule non-dispositive motions, except motions in limine. (2) Discovery disputes be resolved in following manner: see items a-c. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/11/2020. (TDA) cc: COR
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shaw, Jonathan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, parties meet to discuss claims and defense, settlement, arrange for disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and develope discovery plan. (2) Within 10 days, parties file joint status report containing: see items (a)-(e). (3) Should parties find joint report not possible, parties file individual reports. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form) (TDA) cc: COR
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jeffery Dobson, Jeffery Dobson, The Knott County Fiscal Court.(Shaw, Jonathan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffery Dobson, Jeffery Dobson, The Knott County Fiscal Court. (Shaw, Jonathan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Cornett, Whitney Williams via Personal to The Knott County Fiscal Court served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Brown, Nathan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Cornett, Whitney Williams via Personal to Jeffery Dobson served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020; Jeffery Dobson served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Brown, Nathan)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #4 & #5 Affidavit of Service was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the complete summons issued by the Clerk within seven (7) calendar days, using the event SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. *CBD* cc: COR (TDA)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed 2/11/20. Modified text & restriction on 2/11/2020 (TDA).
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed 2/11/20. Modified text & restriction on 2/11/2020 (TDA).
January 23, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffery Dobson, The Knott County Fiscal Court; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (TDA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4574221), filed by Teresa Cornett, Whitney Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Incorrect Complaint, #3 Summons Jeffery Dobson, #4 Summons The Knott County Fiscal Court)(TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornett et al v. Dobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Knott County Fiscal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Cornett
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Williams
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?