Greanex LLC et al v. Rainer Triem et al
Plaintiff: Greanex LLC, Uniper Global Commodities North America LLC and Uniper Global Commodities SE
Defendant: Rainer Triem, Sotaco LLC and Sotaco Inc. Limited
Case Number: 7:2020cv00036
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Sotaco LLC, Rainer Triem filed by Greanex LLC, Uniper Global Commodities North America LLC, Uniper Global Commodities SE. (Kelly, Donald)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER 20-03 - COURT OPERATIONS RELATED TO COVID-19: 1. General Order does not apply to ongoing trials; 2. Continuation of civil & criminal trials per General Order 20-03 extended to civil & criminal trials set to begin 5/1/2020. 3. hearings in criminal cases through 5/1/2020, motion hearings, change of plea, & sentencings CONTINUED GENERALLY, subject to further orders. 4. Initial appearances & detention hearings proceed via remote attendance to extent possible; appearances by summons cont. after 5/1/20. 5. Except TROs, prel. inj., & emergency matters, in-person hrgs in civil cases through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. Assigned judge may proceed by means not requiring personal appearance. 6. Absent exceptional circumstances, hrgs in emergency matters shall be conducted by means not requiring in-person attendance. 7. If a detention facility informs USM inmate is ill, inmate shall not be brought to Courthouse. 8. Naturalization ceremonies through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 9. Settlement conferences through 5/1/2020 are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 10. Misd. & petty offense dockets through 5/1/2020 CONTINUED GENERALLY. 11. For complaints filed per False Claims Act, which remain under seal, US granted add'l 60 days to intervene or notify Court that it declines. 12. Courts remain open. Eff. 3/24/2020-5/1/2020 Courthouse open Mon-Fri 10 AM-2 PM. 13. Visitor restrictions apply & will be screened. 14. Gen. Order 20-02 remains in effect. 15. Court may issue further directives. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/23/2020.(RCB)cc: COR and Rainer Triem by US Mail
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(RCB)cc: CORand Rainer Triem by US Mail
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(RCB)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Sotaco LLC, Rainer Triem, pro se (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter to Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs LLP dated 4/15/20, #2 Envelope pm 4/14/20)(RCB)
March 20, 2020 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rainer Triem, Sotaco Inc. Limited, Sotaco LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (RCB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniper Global Commodities North America LLC (RCB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniper Global Commodities SE (RCB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greanex LLC (RCB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Greanex LLC, Uniper Global Commodities SE, Uniper Global Commodities North America LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4623608) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Rainer, #3 Proposed Summons Sotaco LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Sotaco Inc.)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greanex LLC et al v. Rainer Triem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainer Triem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotaco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotaco Inc. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greanex LLC
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniper Global Commodities North America LLC
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniper Global Commodities SE
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?