Chaffins v. SSA
Plaintiff: Howard Anthony Chaffins
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2020cv00114
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER 20-17 re: Filing of Answers and Administrative Transcripts in Social Security Benefit Cases: 1. For cases challenging Final decisions of Commission of Social Security involving denial of benefits, the time for filing an Answer and administrative transcript is extended to 120 days following service of process. 2. This Order applies to pending cases in which Answers have not been filed and future cases through April 1, 2021. 3. Extensions given by this Order expire 4/1/2021. Expiration of Order does not prohibit Commissioner from seeking additional extensions in individual cases. Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on September 25, 2020. cc: COR, USA (SKV)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Anthony Chaffins via FedEx by USM to Commissioner of SSA served on 8/20/2020. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via FedEx by USM on 8/21/2020; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via FedEx by USM on 8/20/2020. (RCB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (RCB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Receipt) (RCB).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. The tendered Complaint #1 shall be made a permanent part of the record herein. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/18/2020. (RCB)cc: COR
August 17, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard Anthony Chaffins (RCB)
August 17, 2020 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard Anthony Chaffins (RCB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Anthony Chaffins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons SSA, #2 Proposed Summons USA, #3 Proposed Summons AG, #4 USM-285 SSA, #5 USM-285 USA, #6 USM-285 AG)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaffins v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Anthony Chaffins
Represented By: Henry David Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?