Starnes v. Central Intelligence Agency
Plaintiff: Howard R. Starnes, II
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 7:2020cv00119
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 20-6068 Case Manager Julie Anne Connor for #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Howard R. Starnes, II. (TDA)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. plf's "motion for settlement allocation & reallocation" #8 and any further requests for relief #9 are DENIED. 2. The plf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #11 is GRANTED and payment of the appellate filing fee is WAIVED. 3. Clerk forward a copy of this Order to Clerk of USCA for Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/11/2020.(RCB)cc: COR, 6CCA and Howard R. Starnes, II by US Mail
September 11, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Howard R. Starnes, II, #8 MOTION for Settlement by Howard R. Starnes, II (RCB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (RCB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order of Dismissal by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. (SHORT RECORD MAILED). cc: COR, 6CCA (RCB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency filed by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. (RCB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Settlement Allocation & Reallocation by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (RCB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: 1. Plf Howard R. Starnes, II's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED and this action is STRICKEN from Court's docket. 2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/28/2020. (RCB)cc: COR and Howard R. Starnes, II, by US Mail
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Starnes's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED and payment of filing and administrative fees in this case is WAIVED. 2. Starnes's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED as frivolous and this action is STRICKEN from Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/28/2020. (RCB)cc: COR and Howard R. Starnes, II, by US Mail
August 27, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard R. Starnes, II (RCB)
August 27, 2020 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016. (RCB)cc: COR and Howard R. Starnes, II, provided at counter
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer at counter (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(RCB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (RCB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) filed by Howard R. Starnes, II, pro se. (Motion of Breach and Null and Void a Federal Contract with the Central Intelligence Agency. Request for an hour long hearing) (RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starnes v. Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard R. Starnes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?