Forbes v. United States of America
Petitioner: Dennis A. Forbes
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 7:2020cv00130
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(RCB)
October 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. (TDA)
October 16, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:20-cv-00822. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Forbes w/ copy of docket sheet
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), 1.The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, due to this Courts lack of jurisdiction over the matter. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); 28 U.S.C. 1406(a).2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE.ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/16/20. (bs) [Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/16/20. (bs) [Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Receipt of payment from DENNIS A. FORBES in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 6/25/2020. Receipt number 333071836 processed by gangeli. (jjs) [Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 05/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)[Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) [Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Dennis A. Forbes. (Attachments: #1 Court of Appeals Order, #2 Court of Appeals Case Caption 20-2026)(lp) [Transferred from pamd on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forbes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis A. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?