Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. N.F.C. Mining, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: N.F.C. Mining, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00068
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. By October 20, 2021, parties shall meet to consider topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of meeting, parties shall file joint status report containing: see items a & b. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/1/2021. (TDA)cc: COR
September 30, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Atkins for review: #7 Answer to Complaint. (TDA)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N.F.C. Mining, Inc.. (Shelton, Billy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by N.F.C. Mining, Inc..(Shelton, Billy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation via Floyd County Sheriff to N.F.C. Mining, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Pavey, Gregory)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019. (TDA) cc: COR
August 31, 2021 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to N.F.C. Mining, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (TDA)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar, Inc. for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (TDA)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5054532), filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - UCC Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Continuation Statement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Cross-Default Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deficiency Balance, #7 Exhibit 7 - Installment Sale Contract, #8 Exhibit 8 - Assignment of Installment Sale Contract, #9 Exhibit 9 - Deficiency Balance, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons) (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. N.F.C. Mining, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Amelia Martin Adams
Represented By: Gregory D. Pavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.F.C. Mining, Inc.
Represented By: Billy R. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?