Adams et al vs 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Brian Adams, Alice Adams, Edward Adams, Andrea Adams, Phyllis Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Sheila Adkins, Edward Akers, Brenda Akers, Gary Anderson, Dinah Anderson, Luther Anderson, Kathy Anderson, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Gary Baker, Rodney Baker, Alice Baker, Tim Balthis, Francis Balthis, Chris Banks, Robert Banks, Peggy Banks, Billy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Nickey Bentley, Jacklyn Bentley, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Roy Biliter, Robin Biliter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Roger Blair, Patricia Blair, Joey Boyd, Patty Boyd, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Charles Bryant, Carol Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Thomas Cantrell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Elmer Castle, Stella Castle, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, William Chafin, Wanda Chafin, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, Barry Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Billy Collins, Mary Collins, Brian Collins, Tonya Collins, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Nikki Dotson, James Estep, Velvet Estep, Diane Fife, Brandon Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Henrietta Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Carol Good, Olen Good, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, Patricia Hall, Ronnie Hall, James Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Anona Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kenneth Little, Missy Little, Sharon Little, Kevin Little, Joshua Mahon, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, Van Mayhorn, Kayla Maynard, Timothy Maynard, Brenda Phillips, David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Andrea Meade, Danny Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Quillia Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Rita Moore, Charles Mullins, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, Donald Newsome, James Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Terry Norman, Cynthia Patton, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Eugena Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Connie Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Kathy Runyon, William Runyon, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Hershel Shepherd, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Harvey Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Earl Spurlock, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Mary Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Anna Thacker, Lora Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Denver Baker, Margaret Baker, Jody Baldwin, Sherry Baldwin, Chris Bartley, Judy Bartley, Darrell Bently, Clara Billiter, Reford Billiter, Michael Blackburn, Billy Boyd, Debra Boyd, Karen Boyd, Thomas Boyd, Doressa Branham, Eddie Branham, Adrian Carroll, Melissa Dotson, Steve Dotson, John Ellish, Glenda Fleming, Robert Fleming, Roscoe Holbrook, Sandra Holbrook, Darrell Hopkins, Patricia Hopkins, Deranda Johnson, Teddy Johnson, George David Justice, Michelle Dawn Justice, Craig Kidd, Linden Lemaster, Ruby Lemaster, Diana Little, Thomas Little, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Paul Maynard, Denver Meade, David Moore, Debbie Moore, David Newsome, Diana Newsome, George Newsome, Jennifer Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Alivia Perry, Benjamin Perry, Donna Scott, Harold Scott, Randy Scott, Sharon Scott, Beacher Shepherd, Glenda Shepherd, Glennis Smith, Gregory Smith, Lena Smith, Paul Smith, John Stewart, Ruthie Stewart, Lisa Tackett, A.J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Stacy Trotter, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, James Varney, Melissa Varney, Annette Ward, Steve Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, James Allen, Susan Allen, Chester Baker, Lucinda Baker, Gregory Bartley, Jeannetta Bartley, Chuckie Bentley, Theresa Bentley, Barbara Bradley, Robert Bradley, Charles Cantrell, Ancie Casey, Vanessa Casey, Stoney Caudill, Tammy Caudill, Cecil Chapman, Tammy Chapman, Clinton Coleman, Theresa Coleman, Lon Collier, Brenda Collins, Christy Collins, Oscar Collins, Sydney England, Tommy England, April Estepp, Ricky Estepp, April Fleming, Christopher Fleming, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, George Hall, Mary Hall, Rodney Hamilton, Joseph Horne, Linda Horne, Barbara Hunt, Troy Hunt, Albert Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Lona Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Paul Johnson, Rodick Johnson, Don Lynch, Margaret Lynch, Robert Mapes, Clifford Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Janet Miller, Orville Miller, Rodney Miller, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, Bobby Mullins, Larry Newsome, Billy Ratliff, Debbie Ratliff, Angie Reynolds, Ed Reynolds, Dearl Roberts, Rebecca Roberts, Debra Sellards, Gregory Sellards, William Short, Kenny Smallwood, Mildred Smallwood, Blanche Smith, Hoyt Smith, Bill Stancil, Patricia Stancil, Betty Staton, Roger Dale Staton, Clifton Charles Street, Peggy Street, Ernest Sullivan, Ida Sullivan, Cleve Thacker, Wanda Thacker, Rodney Ward, Tammy Ward, Jimmy Yates, Belinda Couch, Steven Couch, Donald Hall, Jr., Phillip Hall, Tammy Hall, Delbert Hamilton, Dottie Sue Hamilton, Kennith Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Bonita Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Debra Stevens, Terry Stevens, Audy Stewart, Rose Marie Stewart, Kelly Akers, Herbert Adams, Jeannie Adams, Bonnie Adkins, Tommy Adkins, James Adams, James R. Adams, Susie Adams, Joseph Akers, James Adkins and Jimmy Adkins
Defendant: Network Supply, 3M Company, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation, Carbon Mine Supply, LLC, Kentucky Mine Supply Company, M & M Mine Supply, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Service Company, Inc., Network Supply, Inc., Roswell, Inc., Regina Mine Supply, Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC and Aearo LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00082
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
2 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila Adkins, Tommy Adkins, Brenda Akers, Edward Akers, Joseph Akers, Kelly Akers, James Allen, Susan Allen, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Alice Baker, Chester Baker, Denver Baker, Gary Baker, Lucinda Baker, Margaret Baker, Rodney Baker, Jody Baldwin, Sherry Baldwin, Francis Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, Billy Bartley, Chris Bartley, Gregory Bartley, Jeannetta Bartley, Judy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Chuckie Bentley, Jacklyn Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Theresa Bentley, Darrell Bently, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Clara Billiter, Reford Billiter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Billy Boyd, Debra Boyd, Joey Boyd, Karen Boyd, Patty Boyd, Thomas Boyd, Barbara Bradley, Robert Bradley, Doressa Branham, Eddie Branham, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Charles Cantrell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Adrian Carroll, Ancie Casey, Vanessa Casey, Elmer Castle, Stella Castle, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Stoney Caudill, Tammy Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cecil Chapman, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Tammy Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, Barry Coleman, Clinton Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Theresa Coleman, Lon Collier, Billy Collins, Brenda Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, Mary Collins, Oscar Collins, Tonya Collins, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Belinda Couch, Steven Couch, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Melissa Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Steve Dotson, John Ellish, Sydney England, Tommy England, James Estep, Velvet Estep, April Estepp, Ricky Estepp, Diane Fife, April Fleming, Brandon Fleming, Christopher Fleming, Glenda Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Robert Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Henrietta Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Carol Good, Olen Good, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Donald Hall, Jr, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, George Hall, Mary Hall, Patricia Hall, Phillip Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tammy Hall, Delbert Hamilton, Dottie Sue Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Rodney Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Roscoe Holbrook, Sandra Holbrook, Darrell Hopkins, Patricia Hopkins, Joseph Horne, Linda Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Barbara Hunt, Troy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Kennith Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Albert Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Deranda Johnson, Lona Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Paul Johnson, Rodick Johnson, Teddy Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, George David Justice, Michelle Dawn Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Craig Kidd, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Linden Lemaster, Ruby Lemaster, Anona Little, Diana Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kenneth Little, Missy Little, Sharon Little, Thomas Little, Kevin Little, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Don Lynch, Margaret Lynch, Joshua Mahon, Robert Mapes, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Paul Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Andrea Meade, Danny Meade, Denver Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Janet Miller, Orville Miller, Quillia Miller, Rodney Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, David Moore, Debbie Moore, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Rita Moore, Bobby Mullins, Bonita Mullins, Charles Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, David Newsome, Diana Newsome, Donald Newsome, George Newsome, James Newsome, Jennifer Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Terry Norman, Cynthia Patton, Alivia Perry, Benjamin Perry, Brenda Phillips, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Billy Ratliff, Debbie Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Angie Reynolds, Ed Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Connie Roberts, Dearl Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rebecca Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Kathy Runyon, William Runyon, Donna Scott, Harold Scott, Randy Scott, Sharon Scott, Debra Sellards, Gregory Sellards, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Beacher Shepherd, Glenda Shepherd, Hershel Shepherd, William Short, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Kenny Smallwood, Mildred Smallwood, Blanche Smith, Glennis Smith, Gregory Smith, Harvey Smith, Hoyt Smith, Lena Smith, Paul Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Earl Spurlock, Bill Stancil, Patricia Stancil, Betty Staton, Roger Dale Staton, Debra Stevens, Terry Stevens, Audy Stewart, John Stewart, Rose Marie Stewart, Ruthie Stewart, Clifton Charles Street, Peggy Street, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Ernest Sullivan, Ida Sullivan, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Lisa Tackett, Mary Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Anna Thacker, Cleve Thacker, Lora Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Wanda Thacker, A.J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Stacy Trotter, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, James Varney, Melissa Varney, Annette Ward, Rodney Ward, Steve Ward, Tammy Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Jimmy Yates. (Givens, Johnny)
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #22 Joinder in 3M's Response filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Jones, Alice)
December 15, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila Joinder in 3M's Response filed by Aearo LLC, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation. (Watt, Whitney) Modified text, filer per attorney on 12/15/2021 (RCB).
December 15, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila filed by 3M Company. (Miller, Byron)
December 7, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company (RCB)
December 6, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company filed by 3M Company. (Miller, Byron)
November 24, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila filed by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila Adkins, Tommy Adkins, Brenda Akers, Edward Akers, Joseph Akers, Kelly Akers, James Allen, Susan Allen, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Alice Baker, Chester Baker, Denver Baker, Gary Baker, Lucinda Baker, Margaret Baker, Rodney Baker, Jody Baldwin, Sherry Baldwin, Francis Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, Billy Bartley, Chris Bartley, Gregory Bartley, Jeannetta Bartley, Judy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Chuckie Bentley, Jacklyn Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Theresa Bentley, Darrell Bently, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Clara Billiter, Reford Billiter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Billy Boyd, Debra Boyd, Joey Boyd, Karen Boyd, Patty Boyd, Thomas Boyd, Barbara Bradley, Robert Bradley, Doressa Branham, Eddie Branham, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Charles Cantrell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Adrian Carroll, Ancie Casey, Vanessa Casey, Elmer Castle, Stella Castle, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Stoney Caudill, Tammy Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cecil Chapman, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Tammy Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, Barry Coleman, Clinton Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Theresa Coleman, Lon Collier, Billy Collins, Brenda Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, Mary Collins, Oscar Collins, Tonya Collins, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Belinda Couch, Steven Couch, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Melissa Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Steve Dotson, John Ellish, Sydney England, Tommy England, James Estep, Velvet Estep, April Estepp, Ricky Estepp, Diane Fife, April Fleming, Brandon Fleming, Christopher Fleming, Glenda Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Robert Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Henrietta Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Carol Good, Olen Good, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Donald Hall, Jr, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, George Hall, Mary Hall, Patricia Hall, Phillip Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tammy Hall, Delbert Hamilton, Dottie Sue Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Rodney Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Roscoe Holbrook, Sandra Holbrook, Darrell Hopkins, Patricia Hopkins, Joseph Horne, Linda Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Barbara Hunt, Troy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Kennith Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Albert Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Deranda Johnson, Lona Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Paul Johnson, Rodick Johnson, Teddy Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, George David Justice, Michelle Dawn Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Craig Kidd, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Linden Lemaster, Ruby Lemaster, Anona Little, Diana Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kenneth Little, Missy Little, Sharon Little, Thomas Little, Kevin Little, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Don Lynch, Margaret Lynch, Joshua Mahon, Robert Mapes, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Paul Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Andrea Meade, Danny Meade, Denver Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Janet Miller, Orville Miller, Quillia Miller, Rodney Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, David Moore, Debbie Moore, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Rita Moore, Bobby Mullins, Bonita Mullins, Charles Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, David Newsome, Diana Newsome, Donald Newsome, George Newsome, James Newsome, Jennifer Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Terry Norman, Cynthia Patton, Alivia Perry, Benjamin Perry, Brenda Phillips, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Billy Ratliff, Debbie Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Angie Reynolds, Ed Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Connie Roberts, Dearl Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rebecca Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Kathy Runyon, William Runyon, Donna Scott, Harold Scott, Randy Scott, Sharon Scott, Debra Sellards, Gregory Sellards, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Beacher Shepherd, Glenda Shepherd, Hershel Shepherd, William Short, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Kenny Smallwood, Mildred Smallwood, Blanche Smith, Glennis Smith, Gregory Smith, Harvey Smith, Hoyt Smith, Lena Smith, Paul Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Earl Spurlock, Bill Stancil, Patricia Stancil, Betty Staton, Roger Dale Staton, Debra Stevens, Terry Stevens, Audy Stewart, John Stewart, Rose Marie Stewart, Ruthie Stewart, Clifton Charles Street, Peggy Street, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Ernest Sullivan, Ida Sullivan, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Lisa Tackett, Mary Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Anna Thacker, Cleve Thacker, Lora Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Wanda Thacker, A.J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Stacy Trotter, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, James Varney, Melissa Varney, Annette Ward, Rodney Ward, Steve Ward, Tammy Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Jimmy Yates. (Hammond, Glenn)
November 24, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila Adkins, Tommy Adkins, Brenda Akers, Edward Akers, Joseph Akers, Kelly Akers, James Allen, Susan Allen, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Alice Baker, Chester Baker, Denver Baker, Gary Baker, Lucinda Baker, Margaret Baker, Rodney Baker, Jody Baldwin, Sherry Baldwin, Francis Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, Billy Bartley, Chris Bartley, Gregory Bartley, Jeannetta Bartley, Judy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Chuckie Bentley, Jacklyn Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Theresa Bentley, Darrell Bently, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Clara Billiter, Reford Billiter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Billy Boyd, Debra Boyd, Joey Boyd, Karen Boyd, Patty Boyd, Thomas Boyd, Barbara Bradley, Robert Bradley, Doressa Branham, Eddie Branham, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Charles Cantrell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Adrian Carroll, Ancie Casey, Vanessa Casey, Elmer Castle, Stella Castle, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Stoney Caudill, Tammy Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cecil Chapman, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Tammy Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, Barry Coleman, Clinton Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Theresa Coleman, Lon Collier, Billy Collins, Brenda Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, Mary Collins, Oscar Collins, Tonya Collins, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Belinda Couch, Steven Couch, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Melissa Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Steve Dotson, John Ellish, Sydney England, Tommy England, James Estep, Velvet Estep, April Estepp, Ricky Estepp, Diane Fife, April Fleming, Brandon Fleming, Christopher Fleming, Glenda Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Robert Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Henrietta Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Carol Good, Olen Good, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Donald Hall, Jr, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, George Hall, Mary Hall, Patricia Hall, Phillip Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tammy Hall, Delbert Hamilton, Dottie Sue Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Rodney Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Roscoe Holbrook, Sandra Holbrook, Darrell Hopkins, Patricia Hopkins, Joseph Horne, Linda Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Barbara Hunt, Troy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Kennith Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Albert Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Deranda Johnson, Lona Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Paul Johnson, Rodick Johnson, Teddy Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, George David Justice, Michelle Dawn Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Craig Kidd, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Linden Lemaster, Ruby Lemaster, Anona Little, Diana Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kenneth Little, Missy Little, Sharon Little, Thomas Little, Kevin Little, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Don Lynch, Margaret Lynch, Joshua Mahon, Robert Mapes, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Paul Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Andrea Meade, Danny Meade, Denver Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Janet Miller, Orville Miller, Quillia Miller, Rodney Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, David Moore, Debbie Moore, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Rita Moore, Bobby Mullins, Bonita Mullins, Charles Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, David Newsome, Diana Newsome, Donald Newsome, George Newsome, James Newsome, Jennifer Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Terry Norman, Cynthia Patton, Alivia Perry, Benjamin Perry, Brenda Phillips, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Billy Ratliff, Debbie Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Angie Reynolds, Ed Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Connie Roberts, Dearl Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rebecca Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Kathy Runyon, William Runyon, Donna Scott, Harold Scott, Randy Scott, Sharon Scott, Debra Sellards, Gregory Sellards, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Beacher Shepherd, Glenda Shepherd, Hershel Shepherd, William Short, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Kenny Smallwood, Mildred Smallwood, Blanche Smith, Glennis Smith, Gregory Smith, Harvey Smith, Hoyt Smith, Lena Smith, Paul Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Earl Spurlock, Bill Stancil, Patricia Stancil, Betty Staton, Roger Dale Staton, Debra Stevens, Terry Stevens, Audy Stewart, John Stewart, Rose Marie Stewart, Ruthie Stewart, Clifton Charles Street, Peggy Street, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Ernest Sullivan, Ida Sullivan, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Lisa Tackett, Mary Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Anna Thacker, Cleve Thacker, Lora Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Wanda Thacker, A.J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Stacy Trotter, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, James Varney, Melissa Varney, Annette Ward, Rodney Ward, Steve Ward, Tammy Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Jimmy Yates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Martin Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Conference Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Case Management Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - 3M's Opposition to Trial Setting, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Status Report and Proposed CMO, #6 Exhibit 6 - Randy Adams, et al. Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Brian Adams, et al. Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Parker Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 9 - Remand Orders from Baker and Hoskins, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order from Mealer, #11 Exhibit 11 - Hoskins Opinion, #12 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Hammond, Glenn)
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company filed by Alice Adams, Andrea Adams, Brian Adams, Edward Adams, Herbert Adams, James R. Adams, James Adams, Jeannie Adams, Phyllis Adams, Susie Adams, Gregory Addington, Stephanie Addington, Bonnie Adkins, James Adkins, Jimmy Adkins, Sheila Adkins, Tommy Adkins, Brenda Akers, Edward Akers, Joseph Akers, Kelly Akers, James Allen, Susan Allen, Dinah Anderson, Gary Anderson, Kathy Anderson, Luther Anderson, David Ashley, Vickey Ashley, Alice Baker, Chester Baker, Denver Baker, Gary Baker, Lucinda Baker, Margaret Baker, Rodney Baker, Jody Baldwin, Sherry Baldwin, Francis Balthis, Tim Balthis, Chris Banks, Peggy Banks, Robert Banks, Billy Bartley, Chris Bartley, Gregory Bartley, Jeannetta Bartley, Judy Bartley, Rita Bartley, Gary Bennett, Chuckie Bentley, Jacklyn Bentley, Nickey Bentley, Theresa Bentley, Darrell Bently, James Bently, Teresa Lynn Bently, Robin Biliter, Roy Biliter, Clara Billiter, Reford Billiter, Brandon Blackburn, Jennifer Blackburn, Michael Blackburn, Patricia Blair, Roger Blair, Billy Boyd, Debra Boyd, Joey Boyd, Karen Boyd, Patty Boyd, Thomas Boyd, Barbara Bradley, Robert Bradley, Doressa Branham, Eddie Branham, Raymond Branham, Tracey Branham, Richard Brashear, Tomeka Brashear, Carol Bryant, Charles Bryant, Artemus Campbell, Sandra Campbell, Charles Cantrell, Cheyenne Cantrell, Thomas Cantrell, Adrian Carroll, Ancie Casey, Vanessa Casey, Elmer Castle, Stella Castle, Randy Caudill, Retho Caudill, Stoney Caudill, Tammy Caudill, Wanda Chafin, William Chafin, Cecil Chapman, Cleo Chapman, Gary Chapman, Margaret Chapman, Rodney Chapman, Tammy Chapman, Teresa Chapman, David Charles, Barry Coleman, Clinton Coleman, Ervin Coleman, Lola Ann Coleman, Paula Marie Coleman, Theresa Coleman, Lon Collier, Billy Collins, Brenda Collins, Brian Collins, Christy Collins, Mary Collins, Oscar Collins, Tonya Collins, Amarine Conn, Faye Conn, Gabriel Conn, James Conn, Virgil Conn, Colin Cook, Jamie Cook, Anthony Cornett, Sheila Cornett, Belinda Couch, Steven Couch, Kevin Daniels, Rita Daniels, Donald Davis, Teresa Davis, Michael Dingus, Brian Dotson, Kevin Dotson, Melissa Dotson, Nikki Dotson, Steve Dotson, John Ellish, Sydney England, Tommy England, James Estep, Velvet Estep, April Estepp, Ricky Estepp, Diane Fife, April Fleming, Brandon Fleming, Christopher Fleming, Glenda Fleming, Joshua Fleming, Rebecca Fleming, Robert Fleming, Burnis Fouts, Gomer Fouts, Patricia Fouts, Randy Fouts, Sara Fouts, Jackie Francis, Joann Francis, Henrietta Gibson, Jimmy Gibson, Carlos Gilley, Norma Gilley, Carol Good, Olen Good, Clara Griffey, Kevin Griffey, Donald Hall, Jr, Donnie Hall, Dorothy Hall, George Hall, Mary Hall, Patricia Hall, Phillip Hall, Ronnie Hall, Tammy Hall, Delbert Hamilton, Dottie Sue Hamilton, James Hamilton, Jeanene Hamilton, Rodney Hamilton, Ellen Hampton, Tommy Hampton, Angela Hardin, David Hardin, Debra Hatfield, Gregory Hatfield, John Hayes, Dana Hilton, Kenneth Hilton, Roscoe Holbrook, Sandra Holbrook, Darrell Hopkins, Patricia Hopkins, Joseph Horne, Linda Horne, Donny Howard, Franklin Howell, Barbara Hunt, Troy Hunt, Kevin Hutchinson, Danny Isaac, Shirley Isaac, Kennith Jackson, Sharon Jackson, Albert Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Deranda Johnson, Lona Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Paul Johnson, Rodick Johnson, Teddy Johnson, Amanda Jones, Robert Jones, Claude Jude, Jennifer Jude, George David Justice, Michelle Dawn Justice, Gary Keene, Shirley Keene, Craig Kidd, Harold Kidd, Lisa Kidd, Farris Lawson, Juanita Lawson, Norval Lawson, Sara Elizabeth Lawson, Linden Lemaster, Ruby Lemaster, Anona Little, Diana Little, Herman Little, Jerry Little, Kenneth Little, Missy Little, Sharon Little, Thomas Little, Kevin Little, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Don Lynch, Margaret Lynch, Joshua Mahon, Robert Mapes, Clinnon Martin, Douglas Martin, Roger Matney, Ruby Matney, Van Mayhorn, Clifford Maynard, Kayla Maynard, Paul Maynard, Sarah Maynard, Timothy Maynard, David McGuire, Julie McGuire, Andrea Meade, Danny Meade, Denver Meade, Kenneth Meade, Lisa Meade, Janet Miller, Orville Miller, Quillia Miller, Rodney Miller, Ronald Miller, Teresa Miller, Foster Mitchell, Gladys Mitchell, Sylena Moon, Troy Moon, David Moore, Debbie Moore, Edward Moore, Elvie Moore, Ernie Moore, Rita Moore, Bobby Mullins, Bonita Mullins, Charles Mullins, Ronnie Mullins, Allard Newsome, Anita Newsome, Dale Newsome, Darlene Newsome, David Newsome, Diana Newsome, Donald Newsome, George Newsome, James Newsome, Jennifer Newsome, Jimmy Newsome, Larry Newsome, Leroy Newsome, Tabitha Newsome, Teddy Newsome, Terry Newsome, Terry Norman, Cynthia Patton, Alivia Perry, Benjamin Perry, Brenda Phillips, Johnny Pittman, Peggy Pittman, Charlene Potter, Jeffrey Potter, Ransom Prater, Celeste Pugh, Dennie Pugh, Mary Pugh, Robert Pugh, Billy Ratliff, Debbie Ratliff, Glenda Ray, Jimmy Ray, Larry Ray, David Reed, Susan Reed, Sherrell Reid, Angie Reynolds, Ed Reynolds, Eugena Reynolds, Stelfon Reynolds, James Rich, Valerie Rich, Chendla Richardson, Markus Richardson, Connie Roberts, Dearl Roberts, Fredrick Roberts, Rebecca Roberts, Rodney Rose, Stephanie Rose, Kathy Runyon, William Runyon, Donna Scott, Harold Scott, Randy Scott, Sharon Scott, Debra Sellards, Gregory Sellards, Denny Sexton, Ellen Sexton, Beacher Shepherd, Glenda Shepherd, Hershel Shepherd, William Short, Ginger Simmons, James Simmons, Kenny Smallwood, Mildred Smallwood, Blanche Smith, Glennis Smith, Gregory Smith, Harvey Smith, Hoyt Smith, Lena Smith, Paul Smith, Sara Smith, Verlin Smith, William Smith, Earl Spurlock, Bill Stancil, Patricia Stancil, Betty Staton, Roger Dale Staton, Debra Stevens, Terry Stevens, Audy Stewart, John Stewart, Rose Marie Stewart, Ruthie Stewart, Clifton Charles Street, Peggy Street, German Stumbo, Darla Sturgill, Ellis Sturgill, Madge Sturgill, Melony Sturgill, Paul Sturgill, Randy Sturgill, Richard Sturgill, Ernest Sullivan, Ida Sullivan, Douglas Tackett, James Tackett, Lisa Tackett, Mary Tackett, Garrett Taylor, Melana Taylor, Anna Thacker, Cleve Thacker, Lora Thacker, Ronald Thacker, Roy Thacker, Wanda Thacker, A.J. Thornsberry, Myra Thornsberry, Stacy Trotter, Mary Tyree, Thomas Tyree, James Varney, Melissa Varney, Annette Ward, Rodney Ward, Steve Ward, Tammy Ward, Connie Joyce White, Keithal White, Donald Williams, Eugenia Williams, Loretta Williams, Mary Ann Williams, Mason Williams, Ricky Williams, Tommy Wright, Verdie Wright, Jimmy Yates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wilson Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wilson CMO)(Hammond, Glenn)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mine Service Company, Inc.. (Gault, Patrick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Mine Supply Company. (Gault, Patrick)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING by 3M Company re #13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Sever)(Miller, Byron)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Candace Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 11/2/2021. (RCB)cc: COR
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Optical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings Incorporated for American Optical Corporation.. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holding LLC, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety, Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo LLC; Corporate Parent Aearo Holding LLC, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety, Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo Technologies, LLC.. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company and Require Repleading Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from 6/9/2020 Deposition of Ollie McGinnis)(Miller, Byron) Modified text on 11/1/2021 (RCB).
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY and DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Byron Miller re #13 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company; Error #1: attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. Error #2: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit A." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel as to error #2. cc: COR (RCB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY John T. Givens by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (RCB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Whitney Frazier Watt. #5 Notice has been filed by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC, LLC (formerly known as Cabot CSC Corporation), Aearo Technologies, LLC and Aearo LLC, without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Spurlock, M.)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Michael B. Martin by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (RCB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney John T. Givens for Plaintiffs added. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (RCB)cc: COR
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by 3M Company. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-322, filed by 3M Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5107985) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - 8710 Approval, #3 Exhibit 3 - 8715 Approval, #4 Exhibit 4 - 8210 Approval, #5 Exhibit 5 - 3M Science of Safety, #6 Exhibit 6 - Complaint Strunk v 3M, #7 Exhibit 7 - Scientific Literature, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sample Dockets, #9 Exhibit 9 - Transcript Williams v 3M, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY SOS Network Supply, #11 Exhibit 11 - KY SOS Regina Mine Supply, #12 Exhibit 12 - KY SOS Carbon Mine Supply, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cox Judgement, #14 Exhibit 14 - 3M Notice of Filing NOR, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)
October 25, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Mine Service Company, Inc. (State Court pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document.) (RCB)
October 25, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Cabot CSC Corporation. (State Court pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document.) (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by American Optical Corporation. (State Court pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document.) (RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al vs 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Robert H. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot CSC Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Mine Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Mine Supply Company
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & M Mine Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Alice A. Jones
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Mine Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Robert H. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo LLC
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Adams
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Adams
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Adams
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Adams
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Adams
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Addington
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Addington
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Adkins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Anderson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinah Anderson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Anderson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Anderson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ashley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickey Ashley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Baker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Baker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Baker
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Balthis
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Balthis
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Banks
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Banks
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Banks
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Bartley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bartley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bennett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickey Bentley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacklyn Bentley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bently
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lynn Bently
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Biliter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Biliter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Blackburn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Blackburn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Blair
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Blair
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Branham
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Branham
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brashear
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Brashear
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bryant
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bryant
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemus Campbell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Campbell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cantrell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Cantrell
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Castle
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Castle
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Caudill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retho Caudill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chafin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Chafin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Chapman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Chapman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Chapman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Chapman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Chapman
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Charles
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Coleman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Marie Coleman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Coleman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Ann Coleman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Collins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Collins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Collins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Collins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarine Conn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Conn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Conn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Conn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Conn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Cook
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Cook
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cornett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Cornett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Daniels
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Daniels
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Davis
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Davis
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dingus
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dotson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Dotson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Dotson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Estep
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Estep
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Fife
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Fleming
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Fleming
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Fleming
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnis Fouts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gomer Fouts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fouts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Fouts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Fouts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Gibson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Gibson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gilley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Gilley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Good
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olen Good
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Griffey
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Griffey
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hamilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanene Hamilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Hampton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Hampton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hardin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hardin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hatfield
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hatfield
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hayes
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Hilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Howard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Howell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hutchinson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Isaac
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Isaac
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Jones
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Jude
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jude
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Keene
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Keene
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Kidd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kidd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farris Lawson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Lawson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norval Lawson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Elizabeth Lawson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anona Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missy Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Little
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Little
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mahon
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinnon Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Mayhorn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Maynard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Maynard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Phillips
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGuire
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie McGuire
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Meade
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Meade
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Meade
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Meade
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quillia Miller
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Miller
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Miller
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Mitchell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Mitchell
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Moore
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvie Moore
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Moore
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Moore
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mullins
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allard Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Norman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Patton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Pittman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Pittman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Potter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Potter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ransom Prater
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Pugh
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennie Pugh
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pugh
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pugh
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Ray
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ray
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ray
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reed
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Reed
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrell Reid
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugena Reynolds
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stelfon Reynolds
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rich
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Rich
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chendla Richardson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Richardson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Roberts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Roberts
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Rose
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rose
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Runyon
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Runyon
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny Sexton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Sexton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hershel Shepherd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Simmons
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simmons
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Smith
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Smith
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlin Smith
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Spurlock
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Stumbo
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madge Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melony Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sturgill
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Tackett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tackett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tackett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Taylor
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melana Taylor
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Thacker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Thacker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Thacker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Thacker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Baker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Baker
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Baldwin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Baldwin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Bartley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bartley
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bently
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Billiter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reford Billiter
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blackburn
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Boyd
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doressa Branham
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Branham
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Carroll
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dotson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Represented By: