AWP, Inc. v. Safe Zone Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AWP, Inc.
Defendant: Samantha Bartley, Brian Skaggs, Tikesha McLean, United Electric Company, Inc., Mark Hatcher, Tony Whited, David Miller, Georgy Kirby, Jamaizz Baker, Virginia Glidewell, Mary Decruz, Amber Cheeks, John Does 1 through 10, Daniel Walsh, Safe Zone Services, LLC and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv00734
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendants Jamaizz Baker, Samantha Bartley, Amber Cheeks, Mary Decruz, Virginia Glidewell, Georgy Kirby, Tikesha McLean, David Miller, Brian Skaggs, Tony Whited (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reisz, Katherine)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark Hatcher, Safe Zone Services, LLC, United Electric Company, Inc., Daniel Walsh (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit) (Azzara, Lori)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Mark Hatcher, Safe Zone Services, LLC, United Electric Company, Inc., Daniel Walsh (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Azzara, Lori)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 11/12/2019, GRANTING #10 and #11 Motions for Jack M. Strauch and R. Austin Oyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #11 MOTION for R. Austin Oyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2968466. ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Denbow, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #10 MOTION for Jack M. Strauch to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2968448. ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Denbow, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for R. Austin Oyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2968466. by Plaintiff AWP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Denbow, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (ALS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #3 Certificate - NC Supreme Court) (ALS).
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Jack M. Strauch to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2968448. by Plaintiff AWP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Denbow, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (ALS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #3 Certificate - NC Supreme Court) (ALS).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to R. Austin Oyler re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/7/2019. (KJA)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Jack M. Strauch re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/7/2019. (KJA)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AWP, Inc.. Safe Zone Services, LLC served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Denbow, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AWP, Inc.. United Electric Company, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Denbow, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AWP, Inc.. AWP, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Denbow, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS to Plaintiff's counsel re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Safe Zone Services, LLC and United Electric Company, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamaizz Baker, Samantha Bartley, Amber Cheeks, Mary Decruz, Virginia Glidewell, Mark Hatcher, John Does 1 through 10, Georgy Kirby, Tikesha McLean, David Miller, Safe Zone Services, LLC, Brian Skaggs, United Electric Company, Inc., Daniel Walsh, and Tony Whited. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2961135, filed by AWP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Virginia Glidewell Contract, #2 Exhibit B - David Miller Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Amber Cheeks Contract, #4 Exhibit D - Tony Whited Contract, #5 Exhibit E - Brian Skaggs Contract, #6 Exhibit F - Jamaizz Baker Contract, #7 Exhibit G - Mary Decruz Contract, #8 Exhibit H - George Kirby Contract, #9 Exhibit I - Tikesha McLean Contract, #10 Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AWP, Inc. v. Safe Zone Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Bartley
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Skaggs
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tikesha McLean
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lori W. Azzara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hatcher
Represented By: Lori W. Azzara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Whited
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgy Kirby
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaizz Baker
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Glidewell
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Decruz
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Cheeks
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Walsh
Represented By: Lori W. Azzara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Zone Services, LLC
Represented By: Lori W. Azzara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AWP, Inc.
Represented By: R. Austin Oyler
Represented By: Michael M. Denbow
Represented By: Jack M. Strauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?