Kimble v. Valentine
Petitioner: Charles Kimble
Respondent: Anna Valentine
Case Number: 3:2019cv00802
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/30/2019 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent is granted an extension of time until March 6, 2020, in which to answer or respond to the substance of the claims pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 28 U.S.C. 2254 and this Court's previous Order filed April 27, 2017. cc: Counsel(MNM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Anna Valentine (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension to File Answer) (Van De Rostyne, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Attorney General Commonwealth of Kentucky. (JWM)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Van De Rostyne on behalf of Anna Valentine (Van De Rostyne, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/26/2019. Petitioner's motion to be relieved of the form requirement (DN #3 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall forward by certified mail, return receipt requested, one copy of the Petition (DN #1 ) and this Order to the Respondent and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Kentucky. Respondent shall file an answer within 40 days from date of entry of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lanny King for rulings on all non-dispositive motions, for appropriate hearings, and for findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendation on any dispositive matter. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro Se Prisoner Handbook.cc:Petitioner, pro se; Respondent; Attorney General; CM-Magistrate Judge King (JWM)
November 25, 2019 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Charles Kimble. (JWM)
November 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, Receipt number B33002100 (JWM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.Reason for Deficiency: Filing Fee or Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Due. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/5/2019. cc: Petitioner, pro se (JWM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Be Relieved of AO Form 241 Requirement by Petitioner Charles Kimble, pro se. (JWM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles Kimble, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Miscellaneous Attachments) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anna Valentine
Represented By: Thomas A. Van De Rostyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?