Wilson v. Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Wilson
Defendant: Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Doc Cottingham, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr., Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Dale Tucker, Rachael Vonderhaar, Dane Coomer, Gary Sitzer and Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00061
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Dane Coomer, Doc Cottingham, Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr, Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Gary Sitzer, Dale Tucker, Rachael Vonderhaar (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Davis, Lane)
March 25, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - 12/26/2023 censure letter to Wilson, #3 Exhibit B - excerpts from FCA Statutes, #4 Exhibit C - current and former FCMA Bylaws, #5 Proposed Order) (Davis, Lane)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 02/15/2024 granting #26 Motion for David Curry Dill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 02/15/2024 granting #27 Motion for Lane W. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC)
February 13, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Lane W. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3975922. by Defendants David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Dane Coomer, Doc Cottingham, Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr, Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Gary Sitzer, Dale Tucker, Rachael Vonderhaar (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jakubowicz, Janet)
February 9, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for David Curry Dill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3973857. by Defendants David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Dane Coomer, Doc Cottingham, Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr, Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Gary Sitzer, Dale Tucker, Rachael Vonderhaar (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jakubowicz, Janet)
February 9, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet P. Jakubowicz on behalf of David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Dane Coomer, Doc Cottingham, Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr, Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Gary Sitzer, Dale Tucker, Rachael Vonderhaar (Jakubowicz, Janet)
February 6, 2024 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. John Kuegel, Jr waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Dale Tucker waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Gary Sitzer waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Rachael Vonderhaar waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Brandon Robbins waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Jason Moore waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Dale Koester waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Laura Knoth waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Steph Hopper waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Lowell Hill waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Doc Cottingham waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Todd Clark waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Dane Coomer waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. Steve Bush waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 6, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Wilson. David Bates waiver sent on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Foisy, Kenneth)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 02/01/2024 granting #5 Motion for Janica Pierce Tucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC)
February 1, 2024 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Coomer, #2 Summons - Bates, #3 Summons - Robbins, #4 Summons - Koester, #5 Summons - Tucker, #6 Summons - Cottingham, #7 Summons - Fogleman, #8 Summons - Sitzer, #9 Summons - Moore, #10 Summons - Kuegel, #11 Summons - Knoth, #12 Summons - Hill, #13 Summons - Vonderhaar, #14 Summons - Hopper, #15 Summons - Bush, #16 Summons - Clark) (SMJ)
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Janica Pierce Tucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3967123. by Plaintiff Andrew Wilson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Foisy, Kenneth)
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Summons by Andrew Wilson re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Summons Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, and Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, #2 Summons Dane Coomer, #3 Summons David Bates, #4 Summons Brandon Robbins, #5 Summons Dale Koester, #6 Summons Dale Tucker, #7 Summons Doc Cottingham, #8 Summons Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr., #9 Summons Gary Sitzer, #10 Summons Jason Moore, #11 Summons John Kuegel, Jr., #12 Summons Laura Knoth, #13 Summons Lowell Hill, #14 Summons Rachel Vonderhaar, #15 Summons Steph Hopper, #16 Summons Steve Bush, #17 Summons Todd Clark) (Foisy, Kenneth)
January 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (KDY)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (KDY)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Andrew Wilson against David Bates, Steve Bush, Todd Clark, Dane Coomer, Doc Cottingham, Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA, Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA, Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA, Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr, Lowell Hill, Steph Hopper, Laura Knoth, Dale Koester, John Kuegel, Jr, Jason Moore, Brandon Robbins, Gary Sitzer, Dale Tucker and Rachael Vonderhaar. Filing fee $405, receipt number BKYWDC-3966392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet) (KDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wilson
Represented By: Janica Pierce Tucker
Represented By: Kenneth A. Foisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Mid-America, ACA
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Mid-America, PCA
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bates
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bush
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Clark
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Cottingham
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Hill
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steph Hopper
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Knoth
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Koester
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kuegel, Jr.
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Moore
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Robbins
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Tucker
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Vonderhaar
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Coomer
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sitzer
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin A. Fogleman, Jr.
Represented By: David Dill
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Lane Whittaker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?