St. Bernard Parish v. Lafarge North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: St. Bernard Parish
Defendant: Lafarge North America, Inc., Dennis Millon, Edward L. Busch, Jennifer Miller Arnold, New York Marine & General Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company and Northern Assurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv02350
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Bernard
Presiding Judge: Stanwood R. Duval
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 407 , 409 motions to intervene are DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/5/2017. (jls)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER & REASONS denying 239 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/27/2016. (mmm)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 229 Motion to Bifurcate Trial is DENIED. However, a single trial shall occur before the same jury with the liability phase proceeding first, and, if necessary, the damages phase immediately thereafter. Dis covery shall proceed on all issues. Parties shall meet and jointly submit their respective list of witnesses and exhibits for each phase of the trial in accordance with all existing deadlines set forth in court orders. See Rec. Doc. 136 . Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/10/2016. (mmv)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 207 Motion to Compel. In summary and to be clear, this is not a ruling that determines whether any former adjudication doctrine or judicial notice applies to this case based upon Judge Duval's findings and conclusion s. Instead, this ruling is that (1) defendant's responses to plaintiff's voluminous requests for admissions are sufficient under Rule 36, and (2) a "motion to compel admissions" is a procedurally improper mechanism to obtain the o rder plaintiff seeks. If defendant seeks to recover particular expenses, it must file a separate motion, no later than May 10, 2016, citing any other legal basis on which it relies; specifying the kinds and amounts sought, supported by all necessary proof and in the manner required by Local Rule 54.2; and noticed for hearing so that plaintiff may have an opportunity to oppose it.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/27/2016. (my)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER AND REASONS granting 139 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment and judgment shall be entered in favor of Lafarge North America Inc. and against the Parish of St. Bernard dismissing its claims with prejudice with plaintiff to bear all costs; FURTHER ORDERED that the 74 Motion to Continue or Stay is denied; FURTHER ORDERED that the 98 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record is denied. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/6/2012. (gbw, )
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AND REASONS denying 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Lafarge North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 4/25/2012.(blg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Bernard Parish v. Lafarge North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafarge North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Burns Fisher, Jr.
Represented By: Derek Anthony Walker
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Millon
Represented By: Eric R. Miller
Represented By: Sam Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L. Busch
Represented By: Eric R. Miller
Represented By: Sam Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Miller Arnold
Represented By: Eric R. Miller
Represented By: Sam Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Bernard Parish
Represented By: Brian Arthur Gilbert
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Sanders
Represented By: Lawrence D. Wiedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?