Lester, et al. v ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Houston Slate, Joseph Berry, Jeffrey Harmond, Andrew De Lotte, Chris Billiot, Melvin Brown, Darryl Elliott, Simon Elliser, Earl Hamilton, Detroit Roy, Evelyn Lirette, Stuart Lirette, Randy Luke, Joseph Batiste, Deborah Desereaux, Judy Perrin, Harris Lanette, Darryl Lirette, Isabella Tinson, Danny Blanchard, Leroy Valet, Glenn Coulon, Michelle Chauvin, Travis Lirette, Daisy Sylve, Darren McDonald, Thomas Willette, Jr., Cecil Breaux, Cory Paige, Valeria Paige, Vivian Paige, Joseph Page, Carlos Paige, Melanie McMullen, Betty Reed, Lloyd Folse, JoAnn Folse, Alvin Miller, Joseph Palmer, Sean Raymond, Lester Drennan, Gaylen Spencer, Jessie Johnson, Joycelyn Jasmine, Ronald Coleman, Jack Page, Ira Simoneaux, Jr., Richard Benoit, Giles Lanasa, Melanie Scioneaux, Onise Lirette, Janel Edwards, Albert Williams, Victor Bonilla, Henry Parsley, Wilbert Miller, Sidney Maise, Angela Pollard, Earleen Miller, Macey R. Aucoin, Sterling J. Aucoin, III, James Joseph Autin, Jr., Armand F. Bellanger, Sr., Jessica Billiot, Darryl Blanchard, Walter T. Bonnie, Jr., Cornelius Bottley, Leroy J. Bottley, Berkline Boudreaux, Sr., Bruce Campbell, Danielle R. Champine, Byron Davis, Wade J. Duplantis, Sherman Farr, Sr., Sherman R. Farr, Jr., Alfous G. Ferrier, Jr., John E. Fleming, Dennis A. Foret, Michael E. Grygo, Alan Williams, Sr., Clarence Hall, Jr., Robert Johnson, Christopher J. Johnson, Isaiah J. Kellup, Jr., Lawrence B. Knight, Herman LeBlanc, Sr., Herman LeBlanc, Jr., Stella C. Lirette, Deyond Lloyd, Mose Lloyd, Tony L. Louviere, Robert McCall, Stephen C. Niehaus, Garland R. Oldham, Gary I. Price, Joseph G. Solet, Jr., Michael J. Thomas, Rosalie Williams and Stephen Yancey
Defendant: BP America Production Company, Varco, L.P, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, ConocoPhillips Company, Marathon Oil Company, Freeport McMoran, Inc., IMC Global, Inc., Exchange Oil & Gas Company, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Corporation, Torch Energy Services, Inc., BP Exploration & Oil Inc., Amoco Oil Company, Amoco BP Oil, Torch Operating Company, Houma-Terrebonne Airport Commission, French Jordan, Inc., Placid Oil Company, McMoran-Stonex, Co., Rosewood Resources, Inc., Diamond Shamrock Offshore Exploration Company, Sphere Drake Insurance Limited, Dynamic Exploration, Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Certain London Market Insurance Companies, Hydril Company, Inc., Oilfield Testers, Inc., Patterson Truck Line, Inc., KBR, Inc., McDermott, Inc., H.C. Price Co., Bredero Price Company and Atlantic Richfield Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv01824
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER GRANTING #854 Motion to Dismiss Party as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/12/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
February 12, 2020 Filing 855 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #854 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Flowers Wilson, Francis W. Turner, Clyde Pike, Theodore Stamps, III, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, and Jane Paugh. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
February 11, 2020 Filing 854 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Flowers Wilson, Francis W. Turner, Clyde Pike, Theodore Stamps, III, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, and Jane Paugh by Varco, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (jeg).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER GRANTING #844 Motion to Dismiss Party by Manuel Marshall, Jr. and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 ORDER GRANTING #843 Motion to Dismiss Party by Warren Lester, Sr. and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER GRANTING #842 Motion to Dismiss Party by Herman LeBlanc, Sr. and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER GRANTING #841 Motion to Dismiss Partyby Mac Knupp and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER GRANTING #840 Motion to Dismiss Party by Barbara Hamilton and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER GRANTING #839 Motion to Dismiss Party Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Willie Chess, Jr. and Roy Chess and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER GRANTING #838 Motion to Dismiss Party by Donnie Beasley and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER GRANTING #837 Motion to Dismiss Party by Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen and Teon Allen and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER GRANTING #836 Motion to Dismiss Party and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., SWEPI, LP, are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/2020. (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
February 3, 2020 Filing 844 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Manuel Marshall, Jr. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 843 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Warren Lester, Sr. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 842 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Herman LeBlanc, Sr. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 841 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mac Knupp by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 840 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Hamilton by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 839 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Willie Chess, Jr. and Roy Chess by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 838 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Donnie Beasley by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 837 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen and Teon Allen by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 836 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Karen Rodrigue, Michele Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. and Kevin Alexie by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER GRANTING #833 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Willie Chess, Jr., and Roy Chess, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/27/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 834 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk ** Please note: Certain proposed orders contain the incorrect year. Please update proposed orders to reflect 2020.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 833 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of Plaintiffs Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Willie Chess, Jr., and Roy Chess with Prejudice against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER GRANTING #831 Motion to Dismiss and that all claims of Plaintiff, Barbara Hamilton, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/21/2020. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 831 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Hamilton claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER GRANTING #828 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Junior, II, Landa Boyd, and Kristin Johnson, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/10/2020. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER GRANTING #827 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Cynthia Simoneaux, Ira Simoneaux, III, Nancy Simoneaux and Michael Simoneaux, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/10/2020. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 828 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Jurnior, II, Landa Boyd, and Kristin Johnson claims with prejudice against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (mp).
January 9, 2020 Filing 827 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cynthia Simoneaux, Ira Simoneaux, III, Nancy Simoneaux and Michael Simoneaux claims with prejudice against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (mp).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER GRANTING #825 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of Plaintiffs, Anthony Dupont, John D. Dupont and Paul D. Dupont brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/8/2020. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 8, 2020 Filing 825 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Anthony Dupont, John D. Dupont, and Paul D. Dupont claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER re #822 Motion to Dismiss Party: Ordered that the claims brought by Plaintiffs, Mary Bradley Doris, Parnell M. Doris, Kevin A. Doris, Gerard Doris, Charell Doris Ellis and Daryl R. Doris, individually as the legal successors of and substituted party plaintiffs for deceased plaintiff, Andrew Doris, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc., be, and the same hereby are, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/2/2020. (Reference: 1/2/2020)(jeg)
December 31, 2019 Filing 823 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #822 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mary Bradley Doris, et al . **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(pp)
December 30, 2019 Filing 822 EXPARTE/ CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Oxy USA Inc. and Placid Oil Company by Oxy USA Inc., Placid Oil Company, and Mary Bradley Doris, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Gundlach, Virginia) Modified text on 12/31/2019 (pp).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER GRANTING #819 Motion to Substitute Party. Anthony C. Dupont, John D. Dupont and Paul D. Dupont added. John Dupont terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/23/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(am)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER: IT IS HERBY ORDERED that the Joint #816 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Edna Raymond, Marie Stevenson, Wanda Raymond, Frank Raymond, III and Reginald Raymond, is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/23/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(am)
December 20, 2019 Filing 819 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Anthony C. Dupont, John D. Dupont, and Paul D. Dupont to be substituted in place of John C. Dupont by John Dupont. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER granting #815 Motion to Dismiss. Claimants Diana Verret's, James Verret, II's, and Angele Verret Ridge's claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/19/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER granting #814 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff William Clarke's claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/19/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 20, 2019 Filing 816 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of Edna Raymond, Marie Stvenson, Wanda Raymond, Frank Raymond III and Reginald Raymond against by Edna Raymond, Marie Stvenson, Wanda Raymond, Frank Raymond III and Reginald Raymond, Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, and Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (pp).
December 19, 2019 Filing 815 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims against ExxonMobil and ITCO by Diana Verret, James Verret, II, Angele Verret Ridge, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. and Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (pp).
December 19, 2019 Filing 814 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss William Clarke's claims against ExxonMobil and ITCO by William Clarke, and Exxon Mobil Corporation, and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:141824)(Sercovich, Valeria) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER granting #806 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Flowers Wilson's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting #805 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Francis Turner's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting #804 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Clyde Park's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER granting #803 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiffs Roseanne Washington, Roxanne Roussell, Roderick Roussell, and Henry Roussel's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER granting #802 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Jane Paugh's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER granting #801 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Donald Marshall's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER granting #800 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff Willie Mae Antoine's claims against Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and SWEPI LP are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 16, 2019 Filing 806 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Flowers Wilson, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 805 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Francis Turner, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 804 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil CompanyWith Prejudice by Clyde Pike, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 803 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Roseanne Washington, Roxanne Roussell, Roderick Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 802 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Jane Paugh, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 801 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Donald Marshall, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 16, 2019 Filing 800 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company With Prejudice by Willie Mae Antoine, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 12/17/2019 (pp).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER GRANTING #792 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff, Warren Lester, Sr. All claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER GRANTING #791 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingrams, Jovanna Thompson and Darryle Johnson. All claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER GRANTING #790 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Doris Young, Jennifer Hurst, and Doris Young in her capacity as Natural Tutrix for her minor child, Terrell Young. All claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER GRANTING #789 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C. Parsley, Natalie P. Brown and Angela R. Parsley. All claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/10/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER GRANTING #788 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Barbara Nason, Kandi Lynn Nason Ard and Kanya Lynn Nason. All claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/10/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER finding as moot #785 Motion to Reopen Case; granting #793 Motion to Withdraw Document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
December 10, 2019 Filing 793 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #785 MOTION to Reopen Case by Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 792 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Warren Lester Sr with prejudice, claims against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 10, 2019 Filing 791 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingrams, Jovanna Thompson and Darryle Johnson with prejudice, claims against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 10, 2019 Filing 790 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs Doris Young, Jennifer Hurst and Minor Terrell Young with prejudice claims against by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 789 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C. Parsely, Natalie P. Brown and Angela R Parsley claims against Chevron USA Inc, Texaco Inc, The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California and OFS by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 788 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs Barbara Nason, Kandi Lynn Nason Ard and Kanya Lynnn Nason claims against Chevron USA Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California and OFS by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER granting #786 Motion to Substitute Party. Leroy Bottley, III added. Leroy J. Bottley terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/4/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
December 3, 2019 Filing 786 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Leroy Bottley, III to be substituted in place of Leroy Bottley, Jr. by Leroy J. Bottley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 785 **WITHDRAWN AS PER REC. DOC. 794** MOTION to Reopen Case by Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (am).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER GRANTING #782 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff, Lester Drennan, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER GRANTING #781 Motion to Dismiss Party and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 782 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Lester Drennan Claims Against Chevron U.S.A., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Co of California, Union Exploration Partners Ltd and OFS, Inc. with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 781 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Alonzo Claims Against Chevron U.S.A., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Co of California, Union Exploration Partners Ltd and OFS, Inc. with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER GRANTING #779 Motion to Dismiss Party and that all claims of Plaintiff, Robert Johnson, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 30, 2019 Filing 779 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Robert Johnsons claims against Defendant Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without cost and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/16/19.(Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
September 16, 2019 Filing 777 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 9/16/2019. As a result of ongoing negotiations among the Court and the current trial flight Plaintiffs, a settlement agreement was reached in the matter. (NEF: Sect L, MAG-2) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 776 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Harold Bowie and Morris Bowie's Claims with Prejudice as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 775 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Shaun Comeaux and Rachel Comeaux Delcambre's Claims with Prejudice as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc. by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 774 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by All Plaintiffs. (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
September 16, 2019 Filing 773 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
September 16, 2019 Filing 772 Proposed Jury Instructions by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
September 16, 2019 Filing 771 Proposed Voir Dire by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
September 16, 2019 Filing 770 Response/Reply by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits (Tuboscope Trial Flight) (Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
September 13, 2019 Filing 769 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Submission of Jury Charges, Jury Interrogatories, and Exhibit Objection Memoranda by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 768 Proposed Pretrial Order by Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., SWEPI LP and by All Plaintiffs (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 767 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 9/11/2019. The parties discussed the status of the case and Defendants' request to conduct several depositions. Defendants claim they recently learned about three witnesses when they were included on Plaintiffs' July 2019 witness list and although they requested depositions be taken, they were not done before discovery deadlines closed. In addition, Defendants seek to take the deposition of Plaintiff Willie Mae Antoine. Accordingly; ORDERED that Defendants' request to conduct depositions of the three witnesses identified on Plaintiffs' July 2019 witness list is hereby GRANTED, as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' request to conduct a deposition of Plaintiff Willie Mae Antoine is hereby DENIED as set forth in document. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 766 Return of Service of 9/11/2019 served on Records Custodian, National Oilwell Varco, L.P. on 9/11/2019 by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company.(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
September 11, 2019 Filing 765 Return of Service of 9/11/2019 served on Records Custodian of National Oilwell Varco, L.P., through its registered agent, CT Corporation System on 9/11/2019 by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company.(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER: ORDERED that the parties will participate in telephone status conference with the Court on Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The parties will use the following information to dial-in to the Court's conference line: Phone number 877-336-1839 Access code 4227405 Security code 091119. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/2019.(Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER GRANTING #760 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims of on behalf of Plaintiffs Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and Juajuan Benoit in this litigation against BP are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs' claims against all other defendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/9/2019. (Reference: 14-1840)(jeg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER GRANTING #759 Motion to Dismiss and that all claims of Plaintiff KingPrince and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation (ExxonMobil) and IntracoastalTubular Services, Inc. (ITCO), are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, eachparty to bear its own costs. Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/9/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER GRANTING #758 Motion to Dismiss and that all claims of Claimants KarenRodrigue, Michele Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. and Kevin Alexie, individually and on behalf of deceased plaintiff Felix Alexie, Sr., and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation (ExxonMobil) and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (ITCO), are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. FURTHER ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/9/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 760 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and Juajuan Benoit against BP America Production Company and BP Corporation North America Inc. by BP America Production Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, Juajuan Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Bridges, Lauren) Modified text/filers on 9/9/2019 (clw).
September 6, 2019 Filing 759 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss King Prince claims against Exxon and ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, King Robinson, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified on 9/9/2019 (clw).
September 6, 2019 Filing 758 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party 14-1824 claims of Felix Alexie, Sr. against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Karen Rodrigue, Michelle Alexie, Kevin Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/filers on 9/9/2019 (clw).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER granting #756 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael P. Cash, Wade T. Howard, Mark L. McNamara for BP Corporation North America, Inc. Attorney Bettye Anne Barrios and Gavin H. Guillot terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/5/19. (Reference: 14-1840)(ko)
September 4, 2019 Filing 756 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael P. Cash, Wade T. Howard, Mark L. McNamara to be substituted in place of Gavin H. Guillot, Bettye A. Barrios by BP Corporation North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Bridges, Lauren)
September 3, 2019 Filing 755 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson re #691 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER GRANTING #736 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims of on behalf of Plaintiffs in this litigation against BP, are DISMISSED in their entirety, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs' claims against all other defendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER granting #738 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 752 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #676 MOTION in Limine to For Declaration of Settled Parties. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER granting #733 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 750 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #681 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Patricia Williams, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting #732 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 748 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #671 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of James Ellis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #731 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 746 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #683 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lee Lemond. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER granting #730 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 744 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #682 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bertha Daniels, M.D. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko) (Main Document 744 replaced on 9/11/2019) (ko).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting #729 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 742 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #672 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Shael Wolfson, Ph.D. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER granting #728 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 740 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #679 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Phillip Plato, Ph.D. and Joseph Miklos, Ph.D.. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER granting #727 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/3/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
August 30, 2019 Filing 738 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation Under Local Rules by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 737 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #727 MOTION for Leave to File, #728 MOTION for Leave to File, #729 MOTION for Leave to File, #730 MOTION for Leave to File, #731 MOTION for Leave to File, #732 MOTION for Leave to File, #733 MOTION for Leave to File. **Document contains correct Magistrate Judge, but incorrect Division. All Pleadings must reflect Magistrate 2 Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 736 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party all remaining Plaintiffs' claims against BP by BP America Production Company and all remaining Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824, 2:14-cv-01840)(Bridges, Lauren) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (clw).
August 29, 2019 Filing 735 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #677 MOTION in Limine to Exclude NORM MSDS Documents (SHELL00003572-3578). (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting #706 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/28/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
August 29, 2019 Filing 733 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine for Declaration of Settled Parties by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 732 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Patricia Williams, PH.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 731 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of James Ellis, M.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 730 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lee Lemond by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 729 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bertha Daniels, M.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 728 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Shael Wolfson, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 727 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Phillip Plato, Ph.D. and Joseph Miklos, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Filing 726 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson re #681 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Patricia Williams, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3.1, #4 Exhibit 3.2, #5 Exhibit 3.3, #6 Exhibit 3.4, #7 Exhibit 3.5, #8 Exhibit 3.6, #9 Exhibit 3.7, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6)(Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting #720 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/28/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(ko)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER GRANTING #697 Motion to Designate Trial Attorney. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on August 27, 2019. (Reference: all cases)(mp)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER GRANTING #669 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the #675 Motion in Limine to Exclude Material Safety Data Sheets of Non-Parties and the "Stein Memo" is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on August 28, 2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(mp)
August 27, 2019 Filing 722 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #687 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Paul H. Templet, Ph.D. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 721 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #670 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Tuboscope Trial Flight) . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 720 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Patricia C. Williams, Ph.D. in Excess of Page Limitation Under Local Rules by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3.1, #6 Exhibit 3.2, #7 Exhibit 3.3, #8 Exhibit 3.4, #9 Exhibit 3.5, #10 Exhibit 3.6, #11 Exhibit 3.7, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy) Modified text/referral on 8/28/2019 (sa).
August 27, 2019 Filing 719 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #678 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Illnesses or Cause of Death of Any Person Other Than the Seven Former Tuboscope Workers in this Tuboscope Flight . (Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Jarrett)
August 27, 2019 Filing 718 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #676 MOTION in Limine to For Declaration of Settled Parties . (Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Jarrett)
August 27, 2019 Filing 717 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #669 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims of Tuboscope Trial Flight Plaintiffs Alleging Exposure Prior to 1981 (Tuboscope Trial Flight). (Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (clw).
August 27, 2019 Filing 716 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #668 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claims (Tuboscope Trial Flight) . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts Statement of Contested Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 715 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #685 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence and Testimony from Trial . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Jarrett)
August 27, 2019 Filing 714 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #671 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of James Ellis, M.D. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 713 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #680 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Depending Upon Theories of "Group" Liability . (Reference: 141824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 712 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #682 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bertha Daniels, M.D. . (Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 711 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #675 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Material Safety Data Sheets of Non-Parties and the "Stein Memo" Plaintiffs' Statement of No Opposition to Motion In Limine to Exclude Material Safety Data Sheets of Non-Parties and the "Stein Memo" Filed By Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., and Swepi LP. (Reference: 141824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 710 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #679 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Phillip Plato, Ph.D. and Joseph Miklos, Ph.D. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 709 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #683 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lee Lemond . (Reference: 141824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 708 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #667 MOTION to Bifurcate . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 707 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson re #672 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Shael Wolfson, Ph.D. . (Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Jarrett)
August 27, 2019 Filing 706 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude NORM MSDS Documents (SHELL 00003572-3578) by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 705 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #684 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of John Amoss, M.D. regarding Causation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 704 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #686 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Emanuel Rubin, M.D. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 703 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #688 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Holly Sharp, CPA, CFE, CFF . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 702 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #691 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 701 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Willie Mae Antoine re #673 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Survival Action and Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Regarding Oliver Antoine, Sr. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6)(Reference: 141824)(Falcon, Jarrett)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #689 Motion to Quash Notice of Video Deposition. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants be allowed to arrange for Dr. Natelson to testify via live video link to the courtroom during trial. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/26/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 699 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson re #677 MOTION in Limine to Exclude NORM MSDS Documents (SHELL00003572-3578) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 698 Supplemental Exhibit List by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 697 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Designate Trial Attorney for Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc. and SWEPI LP by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 696 Supplemental Exhibit List by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 22, 2019 Filing 695 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #689 MOTION to Quash Notice of Video Deposition . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER GRANTING #690 MOTION to Expedite. ORDERED that #689 Motion to Quash Notice of Video Deposition will be set for submission on the 29th day of August, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants file their opposition to the Motion, if any, by August 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/21/2019.(Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER GRANTING #674 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C to #673 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Exhibit "C" shall be filed under seal and remain sealed until 60 days after trial ends, at which time the parties will have an opportunity to discuss whether the seal should be extended. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/20/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 692 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #690 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Notice of Video Deposition. (1) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and removed submission date. (2) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (Reference: 14-1824)(clw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 691 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 690 EX PARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Notice of Video Deposition by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text/referral/submission on 8/21/2019 (clw).
August 20, 2019 Filing 689 MOTION to Quash Notice of Video Deposition by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 688 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Holly Sharp, CPA, CFE, CFF by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 687 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Paul H. Templet, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 686 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Emanuel Rubin, M.D. by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 685 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence and Testimony from Trial by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6-A, #8 Exhibit 6-B, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 684 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of John Amoss, M.D. regarding Causation by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 683 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lee Lemond by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 20, 2019 Filing 682 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bertha Daniels, M.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 20, 2019 Filing 681 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Patricia Williams, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 4), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 4), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 4), #5 Exhibit 1 (Part 4 of 4), #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 20, 2019 Filing 680 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Depending Upon Theories of "Group" Liability by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 679 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Phillip Plato, Ph.D. and Joseph Miklos, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 20, 2019 Filing 678 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Illnesses or Cause of Death of Any Person Other Than the Seven Former Tuboscope Workers in this Tuboscope Flight by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 677 MOTION in Limine to Exclude NORM MSDS Documents (SHELL00003572-3578) by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 676 MOTION in Limine to For Declaration of Settled Parties by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 675 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Material Safety Data Sheets of Non-Parties and the "Stein Memo" by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 674 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Notice of Request to Seal, #5 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 673 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Survival Action and Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Regarding Oliver Antoine, Sr. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #8 Exhibit C per order, rec doc 693) (jeg).
August 20, 2019 Filing 672 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Shael Wolfson, Ph.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 20, 2019 Filing 671 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of James Ellis, M.D. by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 670 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Tuboscope Trial Flight) by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 669 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims of Tuboscope Trial Flight Plaintiffs Alleging Exposure Prior to 1981 by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 668 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claims (Tuboscope Trial Flight) by Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 667 MOTION to Bifurcate by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER GRANTING #664 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff, Manuel Marshall, Jr., in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/19/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER GRANTING #663 Motion to Dismiss.ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Juajuan Benoit, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/19/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 664 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Manuel Marshall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824 and 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (jeg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 663 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and Juajuan Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824 and 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (jeg).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER Granting #658 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims brought by Plaintiff, Jerry Daniels, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA, Inc., be, and the same hereby are, dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his, her, or its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all existing claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/12/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(ajn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 661 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #658 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Document was inadvertently marked deficient by Clerk. Virginia (Ginger) Gundlach properly enrolled as counsel for Oxy, Inc., Oxy USA Inc. and Placid Oil Company in June of 2018, Rec. Doc. 384. Deficiency has been removed and order has been forward to Judge Fallon for signature. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING #659 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff, Wilbert Miller, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., aredismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/9/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 659 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Wilbert Miller, Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text/filers on 8/9/2019 (clw).
August 7, 2019 Filing 658 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Placid Oil Company and Oxy USA, Inc. With Prejudice by Oxy USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824) Attorney Virginia Weichert Gundlach added to party Oxy USA Inc(pty:3pd).(Gundlach, Virginia) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jeg). Modified on 8/9/2019 (dno).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER granting #654 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael Thomas Neuner for Hydril Company, Inc. Attorney Adam P. Sanderson terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/6/19. (Reference: ALL CASES)(ko)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #653 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kristyn Lambert terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/5/19. (Reference: ALL CASES)(ko)
August 6, 2019 Filing 655 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #654 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael T. Neuner to be substituted in place of Adam P. Sanderson.**In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 654 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael T. Neuner to be substituted in place of Adam P. Sanderson by Hydril Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Legrand, Georges)
August 2, 2019 Filing 653 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Kristyn L. Lambert as Attorney by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824 2:14-cv-01840)Attorney Katherine Barry Wells added to party Shell Offshore Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Barry Wells added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft).(Wells, Katherine)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER GRANTING #651 Motion to Substitute Party. Shaun Comeaux and Rachel Comeaux Delcambre added. Alvin Comeaux terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/1/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 651 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Shaun Comeaux and Rachel Comeaux Delcambre to be substituted in place of Alvin Comeaux by Alvin Comeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 650 Supplemental Witness List by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Theodore Stamps, III, Francis Turner, Flowers Wilson. (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 649 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 7/22/2019. Negotiations were productive but unfortunately no resolution of Plaintiffs' claims could be achieved at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (Reference: All Cases)(clc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 648 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #645 Witness List, #646 Exhibit List, #647 Exhibit List. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 647 Supplemental Exhibit List by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Theodore Stamps, III, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. (Reference: All Cases)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (jeg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 646 Exhibit List by Oliver Antoine, Sr, Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Clyde Pike, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Theodore Stamps, III, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reference: All Cases)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (jeg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 645 Witness List by Willie Mae Antoine, Donald Marshall, Marvin Paugh, Henry Roussell, Henry Roussell, III, Roderick Roussell, Roxanne Roussell, Theodore Stamps, III, Francis Turner, Roseanne Washington, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (jeg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 644 Witness List by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 643 Exhibit List by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER: IT IS HERBY ORDERED that the #641 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 07/17/2019. (Reference: 14-1824,14-1840)(am)
July 16, 2019 Filing 641 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mac Knupp Claims Against Chevron U.S.A., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Co of California, Union Exploration Partners Ltd and OFS, Inc. by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, and Mac Knupp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text/filers on 7/16/2019 (clw).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER GRANTING #638 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff Joseph Semien, Sr. and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs.. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/11/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER GRANTING #637 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff Lowell Goodman and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/11/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 638 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Joseph Semien, Sr. by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (jeg).
July 9, 2019 Filing 637 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Lowell Goodman by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (jeg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 636 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 7/3/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadlines #633 is GRANTED. #634 The scheduled pre-trial conference date and trial date are not continued. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scheduling Order #565 be and is modified to read: "All pretrial motions, including motions in limine regarding the admissibility of expert testimony (Daubert), shall be filed no later than August 20, 2019, and served in sufficient time to permit submission on September 4, 2019." (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER: ORDERED that the parties will participate in telephone status conference with the Court on Wednesday, July 3, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties will use the following information to call-in to the Courts conference line: Phone number 877-336-1839; Access code 4227405; Security code 070319. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/1/2019.(Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 634 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Extend Deadlines, or Alternatively, Continue Trial by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 633 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines or Alternatively, Continue Trial by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 6/27/2019.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 631 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #630 Answer to Amended Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 630 ANSWER to #611 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Reference: All Cases)(Balhoff, Thomas) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (jeg).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER GRANTING #626 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, Karen Rodrigue, Michele Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. and Kevin Alexie, in the above captioned matter is GRANTED and all claims asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, eachparty to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/12/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER GRANTING #622 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims asserted inthe captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/11/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 627 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #626 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filers Karen Rodrigue, Michele Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. and Kevin Alexie in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary. 2. The case reference in the docket text must match the case reference listed on the document. Please follow this requirement on all future filings. Clerk modified the docket text. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 626 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Karen Rodrigue, Michele Alexie, Felix Alexie, Jr. and Kevin Alexie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (jeg).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER GRANTING #621 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of Plaintiffs, James Mead and Richard Mead, on behalf of decedent, Leslie Mead, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/6/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER GRANTING #620 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of Plaintiff, Marc Arcement, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/6/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER GRANTING #619 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims of Plaintiff, Earl Sevin, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/6/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 622 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Jackie Hebert's Claims Against Chevron U.S.A., Texaco Inc., Union Oil Co of California, Union Exploration Partners Ltd and OFS, Inc. by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824 and 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 621 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs, James Mead and Richard Mead, on behalf of decedent, Leslie Mead, claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 620 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Marc Arcement's claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 619 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Earl Sevin's claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 618 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #616 Notice of Change of Address, #617 Answer to Amended Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 617 ANSWER to #611 Amended Complaint. (Reference: All Case)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (jeg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 616 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Austin Schwartz on behalf of Hydril Company, Inc. (Reference: All Cases)(Schwartz, Richard) Modified on 5/30/2019 (jeg).
May 24, 2019 Filing 615 ANSWER to #611 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company.(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Best, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER GRANTING #607 Motion to Dismiss Party and all claims assertedin the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/23/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER GRANTING #602 Motion to Dismiss Party and that all claims of Claimants Christi Allen, Natasha Allen-Burns, Jessica Allen, Ronda Allen, Tiffany Allen and Teon Allen, individually and on behalf of deceased plaintiff Ronald Allen, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation (ExxonMobil) and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (ITCO), are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/23/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER GRANTING #601 Motion to Dismiss Party and that all claims of Plaintiff, Clinton Mikel, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation (ExxonMobil) and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (ITCO), are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/23/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 611 NINTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER re #605 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Ninth Supplemental and Amending Complaint. GRANTED. Defendants have advised the court, Record Doc. No. #608 , that they have no opposition to the motion. In addition, it appears that the proposed amendment is appropriate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a)(1). Accordingly, the amendment is permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/14/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
May 14, 2019 Filing 609 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #608 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is RESPONSE to Motion. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 608 Notice of No Opposition re #605 MOTION for Leave to File 9th Supplemental and Amending Complaint by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Doguet, Joshua) Modified text/event on 5/14/2019 (jeg). Modified text on 5/14/2019 (mmv).
May 9, 2019 Filing 607 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, and Kenneth Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (jeg).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER GRANTING #592 Motion to Dismiss Party claims of Willie Bolden, Sr. against Marathon Oil Company are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/1/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg) .
May 1, 2019 Filing 605 MOTION for Leave to File 9th Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Henry Roussell. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Rule 7.6 Certificate, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (jeg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 604 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #602 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Ronald Allen claims against Exxon & ITCO . ****Filing attorney did not enter Intercoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and Ronald Allen as additional filers in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 603 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #601 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Exxon & ITCO . **Filing attorney did not enter Intercoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and Clinton Mikel as additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 602 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Ronald Allen claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc, and Ronald Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (jeg).
April 30, 2019 Filing 601 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intercoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and Clinton Mikel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (jeg).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER GRANTING #596 Motion to Dismiss Party. The claims of Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen and Teon Allen asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/26/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
April 26, 2019 Filing 599 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #598 MOTION for Leave to File Ninth Supplemental and Amending Petition. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 598 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Leave to File Ninth Supplemental and Amending Petition by Henry Roussell. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Rule 7.6 Certificate, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Pleading Ninth Supplemental and Amending Petition)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text/referral on 4/26/2019 (jeg). Modified on 4/26/2019 (mmv).
April 16, 2019 Filing 597 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #596 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. **Filing attorney did not enter additional Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen, and Teon Allen as filers in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 596 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen, and Teon Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824 and 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (jeg).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING #569 Motion to Dismiss; and DENYING #572 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/5/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 594 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing was held on 4/3/2019 re #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice filed by Donnie Beasley and #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Herman LeBlanc, Sr. After argument was heard, both motions were DENIED with the Court's written reasons to follow. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
March 28, 2019 Filing 593 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 3/28/2019. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
March 28, 2019 Filing 592 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Willie Bolden, Sr's claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company and Willie Bolden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (jeg).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting #586 Motion to Substitute Party. James Mead and Richard Mead added. Leslie Mead terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/21/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(sbs)
March 21, 2019 Filing 590 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Donnie Beasley, Herman LeBlanc, Sr re #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice, #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice. (Reference: 14-1824)(sbs)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting #584 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/21/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(sbs)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #582 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Predjudice. All claims asserted against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., by Plaintiff Dennis Jones are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/21/19. (Reference: 14-1840)(sbs)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #581 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. All claims asserted against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., by Plaintiff Keith Harvey are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/21/19.(Reference: 14-1840)(sbs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 586 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party James Mead, Richard Mead to be substituted in place of Leslie Mead by Leslie Mead. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 585 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #583 Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion. **Document incorrectly filed as a separate entry. Document is correctly attached to rec doc 584 as proposed pleading. For future filings, the proposed pleading should only be filed as an attachment to the motion and not a separate entry. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 584 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memo by Donnie Beasley, Herman LeBlanc, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2019: #2 Proposed Pleading) (jeg).
March 18, 2019 Filing 583 **ERROR- See Correct Document Rec Doc 584** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Donnie Beasley, Herman LeBlanc, Sr re #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice, #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice . (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/19/2019 (jeg).
March 15, 2019 Filing 582 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Predjudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1840)(Silbert, Julie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 581 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1840)Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Chevron USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Chevron USA Inc(pty:condft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Texaco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Texas Company(pty:condft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Union Oil Company of California(pty:dft).(Silbert, Julie)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER dismissing as moot #571 Motion to Compel Production of Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc. and SWEPI LP Well Files for Inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/12/2019. (Reference: 14-1824)(caa)
March 12, 2019 Filing 579 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice, #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
March 12, 2019 Filing 578 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. from Jeremiah A. Sprague dated 3/12/2019 (Reference: 14-1824)(caa)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting #567 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen and Teon Allen in place of Ronald Allen, deceased. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/8/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER Setting Plaintiff Herman LeBlanc's #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice and also setting Plaintiff Donnie Beasley's #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice, for Oral Argument on 4/3/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/8/19.(Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting #535 Varco, L.P.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; any and all claims and causes of action of all 59 Tuboscope Employee Plaintiffs, as identified in R. Doc. 535, which arise out of their exposure to radioactive substances in the course and scope of their employment while these Plaintiffs were employed by Tuboscope Vetco International, Inc., f/k/a Tuboscope, Inc., f/k/a AMF Tuboscope, Inc., for whom Varco is the successor-in-interest, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own cost. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/8/19. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
March 6, 2019 Filing 574 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice. **Attachments have duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 573 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Donnie Beasley regarding #572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
March 5, 2019 Filing 572 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Donnie Beasley. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (jeg).
March 4, 2019 Filing 571 MOTION to Compel Shell Well Files for Inspection by All Plaintiffs. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2019. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824) Attorney Jeremiah A. Sprague added to party James Verret(pty:pla).(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mmv).
March 4, 2019 Filing 570 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Herman LeBlanc, Sr regarding #569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
March 4, 2019 Filing 569 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Herman LeBlanc, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 568 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Norman Abreo, Kenneth Alonzo, John Barrios, Donnie Beasley, Victor Bonilla, Earl Boullion, Jr, Bruce Campbell, Charles Carter, Sr, Jerry Chaisson, Thomas Clarke, Rickey Crochet, Andrew De Lotte, Curtis Dixon, Mike Falcon, Eddie Fitzgerald, Lloyd Folse, George Fradieu, Clarence Gamble, Sherman Gaston, Clarence George, Stanley Harris, Sr, David Hervey, Willie Hills, Raymond Hoffmann, Gillbert Hoffpauir, James Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Russell Jasmine, Christopher J. Johnson, Denise Jones, Lionel Junior, Sr, Billy King, Mac Knupp, Hector Martinez, Noble Morton, Jr, Stephen C. Niehaus, Ronald ODonley, Frank Raymond, Jr, Reginald Raymond, Aubrey Smalls, Joseph G. Solet, Jr, Mae Spears, Leroy Valet, Kenneth Walker, Winston Whitten, Thomas Willette, Jr, Robert Williams, Gregory Wilson, Sr, Herbert Young, Jr, Terry Young. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Consent Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/4/2019 (sbs).
February 27, 2019 Filing 567 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs. Party Christi Allen, Natasha Allen Burns, Ronda Allen, Jessica Allen, Tiffiny Allen, Teon Allen to be substituted in place of Ronald Allen by Ronald Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER & REASONS that defendants Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., and SWEPI LP's #547 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/21/19. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 565 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 3/28/2019 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER - Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the telephone status conference for the Tuboscope Trial Flight, currently set for Wednesday, March 27, 2019 at 3:30 p.m., is hereby CONTINUED to Thursday, March 28, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/20/19. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Filing 563 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2019 re #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shell Oil Company, SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc. After argument, motion was taken under submission. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Filing 561 SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs re #547 Shell defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER granting #557 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Shell defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/20/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Filing 559 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support filed by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company re #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting #556 Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., and SWEPI LP's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/19/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 19, 2019 Filing 557 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Shell's Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified texton 2/20/2019 (jeg).
February 18, 2019 Filing 556 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A and B)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
February 15, 2019 Filing 555 Amended Witness List by All Tuboscope Flight Plaintiffs. (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (jeg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 562 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 2/14/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for oral argument, R. Doc. 553, be and hereby is GRANTED. The Court will hear oral argument on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, R. Doc. #547 , on Wednesday, February 20, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in the chambers of the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of this matter be and hereby is CONTINUED to September 23, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pre-trial conference of this matter be and hereby is CONTINUED to Tuesday, September 17, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs and the Shell Defendants participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on Wednesday, March 27, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any other interested party wishing to participate in the telephone conference shall notify the Court in advance of the conference. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (Reference: Both Cases) (dno)
February 13, 2019 Filing 554 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Tuboscope Flight Plaintiffs re #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, part 1, #6 Exhibit 4, part 2, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (jeg).
February 13, 2019 Filing 553 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Tuboscope Flight Plaintiffs regarding #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting #546 Motion for Attorneys Michael G. Stag, Kevin David Micale and Stuart Housel Smith to withdraw as counsel of record for all plaintiffs in this litigation. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Timothy J. Falcon, Jeremiah A. Sprague, and Jarrett S. Falcon of the Falcon Law Firm. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/19. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDERED that the #544 MOTION to Continue filed by Varco, L.P., as to #535 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted and the submission date for defendant's motion for summary judgment is continued from 2/6/19 to 3/6/19. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/19.(Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER granting #542 the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice all claims of Plaintiffs, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and JuaJuan Benoit, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/19. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
February 1, 2019 Filing 549 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment. **Filing attorney uploaded incorrect document as exhibit 4. Attorney subsequently provided correct document. Clerk swapped images. No further action necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 548 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #547 MOTION for Summary Judgment. **1. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge Division. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge 2, Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary. 2. In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 547 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #7 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Best, Mark) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (jeg). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/1/2019) (jeg).
January 31, 2019 Filing 546 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Stuart H. Smith, Michael G. Stagg and Kevin G. Micale and the law firm of Stag Liuzza, L.L.C. as Attorney for Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (jeg).
January 29, 2019 Filing 545 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #543 MOTION to Continue. **This is a duplicate filing of document 544 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 544 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Varco, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 543 **ERROR- See Correct document rec doc 544** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Varco, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jeg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 542 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and JuaJuan Benoit's claims Against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and JuaJuan Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824 and 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (jeg).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting #534 Motion to Substitute Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Juajuan Benoit as party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Cornelius Bottley. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/23/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER granting #533 the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, all claims of claims of Plaintiff, Roger Laviolette, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Claimants' rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/23/19. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER granting #532 the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, all claims of Claimants Sharon Hill and Arlene Dalasinski, individually and on behalf of deceased named Plaintiff Arlen Whelan, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Claimants' rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants.Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/23/19. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #531 the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Edna Raymond, Marie Stevenson, Wanda Raymond, Reginald Raymond, Frank Raymond, III, Aje Edwards and Ja'don Charles, brought against defendant, Marathon Oil Company. Plaintiffs reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/23/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 24, 2019 Filing 541 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 1/24/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs and the Shell Defendants participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on Thursday, February 14, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any other interested party wishing to participate in the telephone conference shall notify the Court in advance of the conference. (Court Reporter Sandy Minutillo.) (Reference: All Cases) (dno) (Main Document 541 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dno).
January 24, 2019 Filing 536 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #535 MOTION for Summary Judgment . **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 535 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Varco, L.P. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A-1, #6 Exhibit A-2, #7 Exhibit B1 - Part 1, #8 Exhibit B1- Part 2, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D)(Reference: 14-1824)(Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (jeg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 534 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and JuaJuan Benoit to be substituted in place of Cornelius Bottley by Cornelius Bottley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (jeg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 533 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Roger Laviolette claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 532 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Arlen Whelan against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 531 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Edna Raymond, Marie Stevenson, Wanda Raymond, Reginald Raymond, Frank Raymond, III, Aje Edwards and Jadon Charles claims as to Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-CV-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting #528 Motion to Substitute Edna Raymond, Marie Stevenson, Wanda Raymond, Reginald Raymond, Frank Raymond, III, Aje Edwards and Ja'don Charles as party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Frank Raymond, Jr. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/9/19. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 9, 2019 Filing 529 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #528 MOTION to Substitute Party. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 528 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Edna Raymond, Marie Stevenson, Wanda Raymond, Reginald Raymond, Frank Raymond, III, Aje Edwards and Ja'don Charles to be substituted in place of Frank Raymond, Jr. by Frank Raymond, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Falcon, Timothy) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (jeg).
December 21, 2018 Filing 527 Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 526 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #525 Witness List. **Exhibit was omitted from initial filing but was subsequently provided to the Clerk by the filing attorney. Clerk attached omitted exhibit to the Witness List. See attached.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 525 Witness List by All Plaintiffs. (Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2018: #1 Exhibit) (sbs).
December 21, 2018 Filing 524 Exhibit List by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 523 Witness List by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Reference: 14-01824)(Best, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 522 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 12/12/2018. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs and the Shell Defendants shall participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on January 24, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, starting Thursday, February 14, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., Plaintiffs and the Shell Defendants shall participate in a telephone status conference with the Court every other Thursday at 1:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any other interested party wishing to participate in the telephone conference(s) shall notify the Court in advance of the conference. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
December 12, 2018 Filing 519 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #518 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint). **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting #517 the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, all claims of Plaintiff, Steven Ricard, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/6/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting #516 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with Prejudice all claims of Plaintiff, Roland Perrilliat, Jr., brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/6/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 11, 2018 Filing 518 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Return of Service of Service of Process served on 11/29/2018 on 11/29/2018 by Warren Lester.(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified on 12/12/2018 (jeg).
December 5, 2018 Filing 517 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Steven Ricard's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company and Steven Ricard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (jeg).
December 5, 2018 Filing 516 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Roland Perrilliat, Jr.'s claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company and Roland Perrilliat Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (jeg).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #510 Plaintiff Milton Thompson's Motion to Dismiss his claims against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation (Exxon) and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (ITCO), with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/3/18. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 514 IT IS ORDERED that the in-person status conference currently set for Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. be hereby CONTINUED to Wednesday, December 12, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(Poucher, Stephanie)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #437 the Joint Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/30/18. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting #468 Motion to Dismiss any and all claims brought by Plaintiffs, identified in Exhibit "A" against Defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all remaining parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/30/18. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #469 Motion for Attorney Walter W. Christy to withdraw as counsel for VARCO, L.P. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/30/18. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
November 30, 2018 Filing 510 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Milton Thompson's claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. by Milton ThompsonExxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (jeg).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 509 TEXT ORDER re #500 It is ORDERED that the telephone status conference currently set for Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. be converted to an in person status conference. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(Poucher, Stephanie)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #497 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims filed by plaintiff Donnie Beasley, asserted in the captioned matter against defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves the right to proceed against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #493 Motion to Lift Stay for limited purpose of resolving instant motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of plaintiff, Elliot Hubert, and defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED as listed. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #492 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingram, Jovanna Thompson and Darryle Johnson, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in thislitigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting #491 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Sheri Dunlavy, Jerry Lynn Dunlavy, and Casey Dunlavy, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER granting #490 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claim s of Plaintiffs, Diana Verret, James Verret,II, and Angele Verret Ridge, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting #489 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C. Parsley, Natalie P. Brown and Angela R. Parsley o/b/o decedent Henry Parsley, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting #488 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Junior, II, Landa Boyd, and Kristin Johnson, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in thislitigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting #487 Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Doris Young, Jennifer Hurst, and Doris Young in her capacity as Natural Tutrix for her minor child, Terrell Young, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/19/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 20, 2018 Filing 500 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Telephone Status Conference was held on 11/20/2018. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs and the Shell Defendants shall participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on December 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 16, 2018 Filing 499 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #497 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 498 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #496 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. **This is a duplicate filing of document 497 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 497 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Donnie Beasley's claims against Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., with Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14cv1824; 14cv1840)(Fenasci, Brett) Modified text on 11/16/2018 (jeg).
November 15, 2018 Filing 496 **ERROR- See Correct Rec doc 497** EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824; 2:14cv1840)(Fenasci, Brett) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jeg).
November 14, 2018 Filing 495 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1824; 2:14cv1840)Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Chevron USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Texaco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Parelman Silbert added to party Union Oil Company of California(pty:dft).(Silbert, Julie) Modified on 11/15/2018 (jeg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 494 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #493 Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Elliot Hubert against Exxon & ITCO. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All cases)(jeg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 493 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Elliot Hubert against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Pilie, Glen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 492 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingram, Jovanna Thompson and Darryle Johnson's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Filing 491 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sheri Dunlavy, Jerry Lynn Dunlavy, and Casey Dunlavy's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Filing 490 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Diana Verret, James Verret, II, and Angele Verret Ridge's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Filing 489 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C. Parsley, Natalie P. Brown and Angela R. Parsley's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Filing 488 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Junior, II, Landa Boyd, and Kristin Johnson's claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Filing 487 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Doris Young, Jennifer Hurst, and Doris Young claims against Marathon Oil Company with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (jeg).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting #456 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Doris Young and Jennifer Hurst for decedent, Herbert Young, Jr. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting #465 Motion to Substitute Attorney Ryan B. Brown, in place of Attorney Carlton Jones, III, as to defendant Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Thomas E. Balhoff will continue to represent the defendant, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting #461 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingram, Jovanna Thompson and Darryle Johnson in place of decedent, Jessie Johnson, Jr. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting #460 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Sheri Dunlavy, Jerry Lynn Dunlavy and Casey Dunlavy in place of decedent, Jerry Dunlavy. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #459 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs, Diana Verret, James Verret, II and Angele Verret Ridge in place of decedent, James Verret. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #458 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C Parsley, Natalie P. Brown and Angela R. Parsley in place of decedent, Henry Parsley. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #457 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs, Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Junior, II, Landa Boyd and Kristin Johnson in place of decedent, Lionel Junior, Sr. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #449 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Barbara Nason, Kandi Lynn Nason and Kanya Lynn Nason, successors of deceased Plaintiff, Edward Nason, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER granting #452 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Mary Bradley Doris, Parnell M. Doris, Kevin A. Doris, Gerard Doris, Charell Doris Condoll and Daryl R. Doris, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting #446 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Kawana Valet, Kerry Valet, and Kenneth Valet, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting #448 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Karen Alexie Rodrigue, Michelle Alexie, Kevin Alexie, and Felix Alexie, Jr., brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #450 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Harold Bowie and Morris Bowie, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting #451 the Joint Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice, all claims of Plaintiffs, Cora Chess, Brenda Washington, Dianne Lawrence, Willis Chess, Jr., and Roy Chess, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting the Joint #453 Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiffs, Charlene B. Boquet and Nedra B. Detiveaux, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/18. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Filing 472 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #468 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice . **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER - Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the pre-trial conference for the Tuboscope Trial Flight, currently set for Thursday, May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, May 7, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/5/18.(Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 8, 2018 Filing 470 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #469 MOTION to Withdraw Walter W. Christy as Attorney . **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. No further action necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 7, 2018 Filing 469 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Walter W. Christy as Attorney by Varco L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Christy, Walter) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (jeg).
November 7, 2018 Filing 468 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, and Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Fenasci, Brett) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (jeg).
November 7, 2018 Filing 467 ANSWER to #422 Eighth Amended Complaint, by Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc.(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Brown, Ryan) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (jeg).
November 7, 2018 Filing 466 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #465 MOTION to Withdraw Carlton Jones, III as Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ryan R. Brown to be substituted in place of Carlton Jones, III . **1. Proposed order filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. 2. Filing attorney selected unnecessary additional event - Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk took corrective action by removing the event. 3. In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. No further action necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 465 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ryan R. Brown to be substituted in place of Carlton Jones, III by Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)Attorney Ryan R. Brown added to party Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan R. Brown added to party Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc.(pty:condft).(Brown, Ryan) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/7/2018) (jeg).
November 6, 2018 Filing 464 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #463 Answer to Amended Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All cases)(jeg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 463 ANSWER to #422 Amended Complaint, by Alpha Technical Services, Inc.(Reference: All)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (jeg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 462 ANSWER to #422 Amended Complaint, by Varco, L.P.(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 461 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Jessie Johnson, III, Adrienne J. Ingram, Jovanna Thompson, and Darryle Johnson to be substituted in place of Jessie Johnson, Jr. Decedent by Jessie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 460 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Sheri Dunlavy, Jerry Lynn Dunlavy, and Casey Dunlavy to be substituted in place of Jerry Lee Dunlavy Decedent by Jerry Dunlavy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 459 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Diana Verret, James Verret, II, and Angele Verret Ridge to be substituted in place of James Verret Decedent by James Verret. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party James Verret(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 458 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Lezia M. Parsley, Charles C. Parsley, Natalie P. Brown, and Angela R. Parsley to be substituted in place of Henry Parsley Decedent by Henry Parsley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 457 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Alice Junior, Randy Junior, Lionel Junior, II, Landa Boyd, and Kristin Johnson to be substituted in place of Lionel Junior, Sr. Decedent by Lionel Junior, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 456 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Doris Young, Jennifer Hurst and Doris Young as tutris of the minor child, Terrell Young, to be substituted in place of Herbert Young, Jr. Decedent by Herbert Young, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting #428 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that the stay be LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Joint Motion with prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of plaintiff, Merlin Williams, Sr., brought against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting #427 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that the Stay be LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Willie Hills, Sr., brought against defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 453 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Charlene B. Boquet and Nedra B. Detiveaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 452 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Mary Bradley Doris, Parnell M. Doris, Kevin A. Doris, Gerard Doris, Charell Doris Ellis and Daryl R. Doris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 451 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Roy Chess and Willie Chess, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 450 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Morris Bowie and Harold Bowie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 449 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Barbara Nason, Kandi Lynn Nason Ard and Kanya Lynn Nason. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 448 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Karen Alexie Rodrigue, Felix Alexie, Jr, Kevin Alexie and Michelle Alexie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 447 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #444 Answer to Amended Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 446 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, Kawana Valet, Kerry Valet, and Kenneth Valet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (jeg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 445 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #437 Joint MOTION Lift Stay . **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. Also, In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 444 ANSWER to #422 Amended Complaint, by BP America Production Company.(Reference: 2:14-01824)(Bridges, Lauren)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #436 Motion to Substitute Charlene B. Boquet and Nedra B. Detiveaux as party plaintiffs for decedent, Darryl Blanchard, in the captioned litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #435 Motion to Substitute Mary Bradley Doris, Parnell M. Doris, Kevin A. Doris, Gerard Doris, Charell Doris Ellis and Daryl R. Doris added party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Andrew Doris. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #434 Motion to Substitute Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Roy Chess and Willie Chess, Jr. as party plaintiffs for decedent, Willie Chess, in the captioned litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #433 Motion to Substitute Morris Bowie and Harold Bowie as party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Clarence Bowie. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting #432 Motion to Substitute Barbara Nason, Kandi Lynn Nason Ard and Kanya Lynn Nason as party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Edward Nason. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting #431 Motion to Substitute Karen Alexie Rodrigue, Felix Alexie, Jr, Kevin Alexie and Michelle Alexie as party plaintiffs in the place of decedent, Felix Alexie. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/18. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 1, 2018 Filing 437 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION Lift Stay by Plaintiffs and Varco L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Reference: All)(Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/2/2018 (jeg). Modified on 11/2/2018 (jeg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 436 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Charlene B. Boquet and Nedra B. Detiveaux to be substituted in place of Darry Blanchard Decedent by Darryl Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 435 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Mary Bradley Doris, Parnell M. Doris, Kevin A. Doris, Gerard Doris, Charell Doris Ellis and Daryl R. Doris to be substituted in place of Andrew Doris Decedent by Andrew Doris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 434 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Cora M. Chess, Brenda Washington, Diane Lawrence, Willie Chess, Jr., and Roy Chess to be substituted in place of Willie Chess Decedent by Willie Chess. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 433 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Harold Bowie and Morris Bowie to be substituted in place of Clarence Bowie Decedent by Clarence Bowie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 432 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Barbara H. Nason, Kanya Lynn Nason and Kandi Lynn Nason Ard to be substituted in place of Edward Nason Decedent by edward nason. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14:1824, 14:1840)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party edward nason(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 431 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Karen Alexie Rodrigue, Felix Alexie, Jr., Kevin Alexie, Michelle Alexie to be substituted in place of Felix Alexie decedent by Felix Alexie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824; 14-1840)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 430 ANSWER to #422 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Eighth Supplemental and Amending Complaint by SWEPI, LP, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company.(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party SWEPI, LP(pty:dft).(Best, Mark)
October 25, 2018 Filing 429 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice, #427 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 428 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company, and Merlin Williams, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (jeg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 427 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice by Marathon Oil Company and Willie Hills, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (jeg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 425 Summons Issued as to SWEPI, LP. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 18, 2018 Filing 424 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #418 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not submit page 2 of summons form. Please submit complete form on future filings. Clerk added page 2 on issued summons. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 423 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #419 MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Kawana Valet, Kerry Valet, and Kenneth Valet to be substituted in place of Leroy Valet decedent. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING #419 Motion to Substitute Party. IT IS ORDERED that Kawana Valet, Kerry Valet, and Kenneth Valet, be substituted as party plaintiffs for decedent, Leroy Valet, in the captioned litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/17/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 17, 2018 Filing 422 EIGHTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8)(Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER GRANTING #415 Motion for Leave to File Eighth Supplemental and Amending Complaint. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/17/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Stay be Lifted for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain Stayed and Administratively Closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Merlin Williams, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/17/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 17, 2018 Filing 419 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Kawana Valet, Kerry Valet, and Kenneth Valet to be substituted in place of Leroy Valet decedent by Leroy Valet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824)(Falcon, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 418 Request of Summons Issued as to Shell Oil Company filed by All Plaintiffs re #83 Notice (Other). (Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 417 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #415 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Eighth Supplemental and Amending Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. Additionally, Images in attachments 4, and 6-9 were filed sideways. Clerk has corrected images. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary. ** (Reference: 18-1824)(jeg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 416 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #414 Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Merlin Williams against Exxon and ITCO. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filers, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and Merlin Williams in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 14-1824)(jeg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 415 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Eighth Supplemental and Amending Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.6 Certificate of No Objection, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5, #9 Exhibit A-6, #10 Exhibit A-7, #11 Exhibit A-8)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Sprague, Jeremiah) (Attachments 4, and 6-9 replaced on 10/17/2018) (jeg). Modified text and attachments on 10/17/2018 (jeg).
October 16, 2018 Filing 414 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Merlin Williams against Exxon and ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and Merlin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (jeg).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (TUBOSCOPE TRIAL FLIGHT): Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
October 3, 2018 Filing 412 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #411 Joint MOTION Motion for Entry of Case Management Order (Tuboscope Trial Flight). **Filing attorney did not enter additional filers, Oliver Antoine, Sr.; Donald Marshall; Jane Paugh; Clyde Pike; Henry Roussell, Jr.; Theodore Stamps, III; Francis William Turner;and, Flowers Wilson in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary. Also, in Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 14-cv-1840)(jeg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 411 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION Motion for Entry of Case Management Order (Tuboscope Trial Flight) by Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company, Oliver Antoine, Sr.; Donald Marshall; Jane Paugh; Clyde Pike; Henry Roussell, Jr.; Theodore Stamps, III; Francis William Turner; and, Flowers Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-v-01840)(Best, Mark) Modified filers on 10/3/2018 (jeg).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER GRANTING #406 Joint Motion to Dismiss Alvin Comeaux's claims against Marathon Oil Company. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Alvin Comeaux, and Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants names in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/24/18. (Reference: Both Cases) (dno)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER GRANTING #405 Joint Motion to Dismiss Ronald Allen's claims against Marathon Oil Company. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Ronald Allen, and Defendants, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants names in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/24/18. (Reference: Both Cases) (dno)
September 19, 2018 Filing 408 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 9/19/2018. IT IS ORDERED that another Telephone Status Conference is set for 11/20/2018 at 8:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the #403 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Michael S. Babineaux, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/18/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
September 19, 2018 Filing 406 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Alvin Comeaux's Claims as to Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
September 19, 2018 Filing 405 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Ronald Allen's Claims as to Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
September 18, 2018 Filing 404 Memorandum by Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company Memorandum in Advance of September 19, 2018 Status Conference (Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Best, Mark)
September 17, 2018 Filing 403 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Michael S. Babineauxs claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER GRANTING #399 Joint Motion to Dismiss Jeffrey Guidry's claims against Exxon & ITCO. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Jeffrey Guidry, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiffs rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/13/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER GRANTING #398 Joint Motion to Dismiss James Perry's claims against Exxon & ITCO. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED,and that all claims of Plaintiff, James Perry, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/13/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER GRANTING #397 Joint Motion to Dismiss Bryon Mansion's claims against Exxon and ITCO. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Byron Mansion, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/13/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
September 12, 2018 Filing 399 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Jeffrey Guidry's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 398 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss James Perry's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 397 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Bryon Mansion's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice #395 . IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Byron Mansion, Sr. against Defendants, Marathon Oil Company, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/27/18. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
August 24, 2018 Filing 395 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Byron Mansion, Sr's Claims as to Marathon Oil Company and Byron Mansion, Sr. by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (jeg).
August 17, 2018 Filing 394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 8/17/2018. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Shell Defendants shall participate in a Status Conference on 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM in chambers before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #392 Joint Motion to Dismiss any and all claims brought by Plaintiffs in the captioned matter against Defendants, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc., The Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, Union Exploration Partners, Ltd., and OFS, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve the right to proceed against all remaining parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/6/18. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
August 3, 2018 Filing 392 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Company, Union Oil Company of California, and All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv1840)Attorney Shannon A Shelton added to party Texas Company(pty:condft).(Shelton, Shannon) Modified text on 8/6/2018 (jeg).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GRANTING #388 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice: IT IS ORDERED that the ST A Y BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED ANDADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Russell Jasmine, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff'srights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/30/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER GRANTING #387 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Billie King, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/30/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER GRANTING #386 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice: IT IS ORDERED that the ST A Y BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Thomas Robinson, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/30/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
July 27, 2018 Filing 388 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Russell Jasmine's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 7/30/2018 (mmv).
July 27, 2018 Filing 387 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Billie King's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified on 7/30/2018 (mmv).
July 27, 2018 Filing 386 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomas Robinson's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 7/30/2018 (mmv).
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the telephone conference previously set for August 7, 2018 is hereby reset. The parties will participate in telephone status conference with the Court on Friday, August 17, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. The parties will use the following information to call-in to the Court's conference line: Phone number 877-336-1839; Access code 4227405; Security code 081718. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/5/2018.(Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER GRANTING #382 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/22/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
June 22, 2018 Filing 383 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 6/15/2018 USCA judge name: James E. Graves, Jr. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Opinion, #2 USCA Transmittal Letter)(Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
June 21, 2018 Filing 382 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Chris Friend, Meghan Smith, Ginger Gundlach to be substituted in place of Guy Curry, Laura Caviness by Oxy USA Inc, Oxy, Inc., and Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Smith, Meghan) Modified filers on 6/22/2018 (jeg).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER - Considering the Fifth Circuit's decision on appeal, IT IS ORDERED that the parties will participate in telephone status conference with the Court on Tuesday, August 7, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/20/18.(Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
June 12, 2018 Filing 380 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christoffer Friend, Meghan E Smith, Virginia W. Gundlach to be substituted in place of Guy C. Curry and Laura R. Caviness , Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Oxy USA Inc, Oxy, Inc., Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Friend, Christoffer) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jeg).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #378 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Oliver Antoine, Sr. and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/1/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 30, 2018 Filing 378 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Oliver Antoine, Sr.'s claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #369 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Richard Fritz, Sr., and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #368 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Leon Lemon, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #367 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Freddie Wilson, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #366 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Francis William Turner, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #365 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, H.B. Gautro against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #364 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, George Fradieu, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #363 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Corbin Brown, Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #362 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Timothy Rivet, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracostal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/24/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 24, 2018 Filing 369 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Richard Fritz claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 368 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Leon Lemon claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 367 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Freddie Wilson claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 366 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Francis William Turner claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 365 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss H.B. Gautro claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 364 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss George Fradieu claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 363 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Corbin Brown, Sr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 24, 2018 Filing 362 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Timothy Rivet claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the #360 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Gerald Hunter, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/26/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
March 26, 2018 Filing 360 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gerald Hunter's claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the #358 instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Flowers Wilson, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs' rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Courtretains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/23/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(jls)
March 23, 2018 Filing 358 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Flowers Wilson's claims against Exxon & ITCO, by Flowers Wilson, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., and by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text on 3/26/2018 (jls).
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled on March 22, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby CANCELLED pending the Fifth Circuit's decision on whether to grant Planitff's en banc review. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/20/2018. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #354 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Richard Grear, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/2/2018. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #353 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Charles Cross, Sr., against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/2/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
March 1, 2018 Filing 354 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Richard Grear's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
March 1, 2018 Filing 353 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Charles Cross, Sr.'s claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #351 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Joseph Semien, Sr. brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/22/2018. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840) (cms)
February 22, 2018 Filing 351 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Joseph Semien, Sr. claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict with lead plaintiff counsel, the status conference currently scheduled on March 7, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby CONTINUED to March 22, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/2018.(Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #348 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Warren Lester, Sr. brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Plaintiff reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/25/2018. (Reference: 14-1824)(mmv)
January 24, 2018 Filing 348 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company, All Plaintiffs by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text on 1/25/2018 (clc).
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER: The Fifth Circuit recently affirmed a decision by this Court in the above-captioned case. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that a status conference is hereby SCHEDULED in Chambers on 3/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the next steps of this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/22/2018.(Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Joseph I. Giarrusso III be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Collin R. Melancon of Liskow & Lewis law firm be enrolled as counsel of record for Defendant; and, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Michael P. Cash, Wade T. Howard, Mark L. McNamara, and Lauren R. Bridges of Liskow & Lewis law firm continue to represent Defendant in the above captioned matter Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/22/2018. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(jls)
January 17, 2018 Filing 345 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Collin R. Melancon to be substituted in place of Joseph I. Giarrusso, III by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824)(Bridges, Lauren)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #343 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Dennis Jones brought this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/5/2018. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840) (cms)
January 3, 2018 Filing 343 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Dennis Jones claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #341 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED and all claims of Plaintiff, Keith Harvey, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/20/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
December 20, 2017 Filing 341 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Keith Harvey claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #339 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Kenneth Alonzo, brought in this matter against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/18/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
December 18, 2017 Filing 339 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Alonzo's Claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #337 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel F. Shank. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/14/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840) (cms)
December 12, 2017 Filing 337 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel F. Shank (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Varco L.P., Varco, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #334 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Juajuan Benoit against Defendant, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1840) (cms)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #333 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff, Darrell Eli Wilson, Sr. against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/5/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
October 5, 2017 Filing 334 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Devon Energy Production Company, LP by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie)
October 3, 2017 Filing 333 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Darrell Eli Wilson, Sr.'s claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #329 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED the Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiff, Rene Garcia, against OXY USA Inc and Placid Oil Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/6/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #328 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED the Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiff, Earl Battle, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/6/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #327 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff, Ronald Coleman, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/6/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(caa)
September 5, 2017 Filing 329 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff, Rene Garcia's, claims against OXY USA Inc. and Placid Oil Company by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Caviness, Laura)
September 5, 2017 Filing 328 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff, Earl Battle's, claims against OXY USA Inc. and Placid Oil Company by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Caviness, Laura)
September 1, 2017 Filing 327 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ronald Coleman's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Ronald Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified filer on 9/5/2017 (cms).
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant #325 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff, Brian Matthews, Sr., and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/22/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(jls)
August 21, 2017 Filing 325 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Brian Matthews, Sr.'s claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., by Exxon Mobil Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/filer on 8/22/2017 (ss).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #323 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff, Clyde Pike, against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/8/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
August 7, 2017 Filing 323 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Clyde Pike claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation & Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., CO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/filer on 8/8/2017 (ss).
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDERED hat the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #319 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff Mac Knupp, against Defendant, Marathon Oil Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/28/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840) (cms)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting #320 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Guy Christopher Curry, Laura Caviness for Oxy, Inc., Placid Oil Company. Attorney Mary Margaret Steele; Christoffer C. Friend and Meghan Elizabeth Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/28/2017. (Reference: 14-1840)(cms)
July 24, 2017 Filing 320 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Laura R. Caviness; Guy C. Curry to be substituted in place of Christoffer C. Friend, Meghan E. Smith, Mary Margaret Steele by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824; 2:14-cv-1840)(Cocus, Laura)
July 19, 2017 Filing 319 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Mac Knupp's claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text/filer on 7/20/2017 (ss).
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #316 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, nd that all claims of Plaintiff, Kim Robinson, against against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDERED hat the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #315 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff James Austin, Sr. against against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
July 5, 2017 Filing 316 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Kim Robinson claims against Exxon, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (ITCO) by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/filer on 7/6/2017 (ss).
July 5, 2017 Filing 315 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss James Autin, Sr. claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., (ITCO) by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/fileron 7/6/2017 (ss).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDERED hat the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #310 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiffs, Warren Lester, Sr. Wanda Ann Boudreaux Lester, and Warren Lester, Jr. against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/28/2017. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #309 Motion FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiff, George Burse, against Placid Oil Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/28/2017. (Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #308 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff Michael Babineaux and against Defendants Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs.. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/28/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #307 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, nd that all claims of Plaintiff Keith Harvey, against against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/22/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
June 23, 2017 Filing 310 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Wanda Lester, and Warren Lester, Jr.'s claims against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company, OXY USA Inc., Wanda Lester, Warren Lester, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan) Modified text/filer on 6/26/2017 (ss).
June 23, 2017 Filing 309 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party George Burse's claims against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company, OXY USA Inc., Geroge Burse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan) Modified text/filer on 6/26/2017 (ss).
June 23, 2017 Filing 308 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Michael Babineaux's claims against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company, OXY USA Inc., Michael Babineaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan) Modified text/filer on 6/26/2017 (ss).
June 22, 2017 Filing 307 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Keith Harvey claims against Exxon & ITCO by Keith Harvey, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified text/filer on 6/23/2017 (ss).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Dismiss as set forth in document.. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/24/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
May 23, 2017 Filing 305 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Warren Pierce claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #303 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby Dismiss is GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Mac Knupp, and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/3/2017.(Reference: 14-1824) (cms)
May 2, 2017 Filing 303 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Mac Knupp claims against Exxon and ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #301 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and the claims of Plaintiff, Herman LeBlanc, Sr. and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/20/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 19, 2017 Filing 301 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Herman LeBlanc, Sr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #297 Motion; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Alden Lombard, Jr., Amber Ovide, Alden Lombard, III and Holden Lombard, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant #296 Motion; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiffs, Patricia Lennie, Brett Lennie and Marcella Fuselier, each individually and on behalf of their decedent, Julius Lennie, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #295 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell and Milele N. St. Julien terminated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/11/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
April 11, 2017 Filing 297 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Alden Lombard, Jr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 11, 2017 Filing 296 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Julius Lennie claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
April 10, 2017 Filing 295 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Leigh Ann Schell and Milele St. Julien as Attorney of Record by ConocoPhillips Company, Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Best, Mark)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the #291 Joint Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Juajuan Benoit ("Plaintiffs") against Defendant, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserves all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/30/2017.(Reference: 14-1840)(mmv)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER GRANTING #288 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/28/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purposes of resolving the instant #287 motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Dennis Jones, and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/28/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
March 29, 2017 Filing 291 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Juajuan Benoit claims against Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. & Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, Juajuan Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01840)(Silbert, Julie) Modified text/filers on 3/30/2017 (mmm).
March 23, 2017 Filing 290 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #288 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. ***Caption on document is formatted incorrectly. In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.*** (Reference: 14-1840)(mf)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER of Dismissal: ORDERED that the stay be lifted for limited purpose of th instant Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STayed and Administratively closed. FURTHER ORDERED that the #286 Motion to Dismiss Kerry Dixon claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiff, Kerry Dixon, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/22/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(clc)
March 22, 2017 Filing 288 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Deborah D. Kuchler, Janika D. Polk, Michele Hale DeShazo, Mark Best, Skylar Rudin, Etheldreda C. Smith and Joshua J. Doguet to be substituted in place of Mary S. Johnson, Jill T. Losch, Ingrid Kemp Laurendine, Chad Mollere and Nichole M. Gray by Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Best, Mark)
March 21, 2017 Filing 287 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Dennis Jones claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
March 21, 2017 Filing 286 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Kerry Dixon claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Dismissal with prejudice is GRANTED and all claims of Plaintiff, Melvin Camet, Jr, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/8/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(my)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Dismissal with prejudice is GRANTED and all claims of Plaintiff, Mac Knupp, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/8/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(my)
March 7, 2017 Filing 283 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of Melvin Camet, Jr. against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 282 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of Mac Knupp against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Joint Motion Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
February 6, 2017 Filing 280 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #279 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Frank Raymond, Jr.'s Claims Against ConocoPhillips Company . **1) In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. **2) Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
February 3, 2017 Filing 279 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Party Frank Raymond, Jr.'s Claims Against ConocoPhillips Company by ConocoPhillips Company, Frank Raymond, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Best, Mark) Modified text/filers on 2/6/2017 (mmv).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Dismissal with prejudice is GRANTED and all claims of Plaintiff, Joseph Solet, Jr, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/26/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
January 25, 2017 Filing 277 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Joseph Solet, Jr.'s claims against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/24/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
January 24, 2017 Filing 275 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Marvin Paugh's claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/17/2017. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
January 13, 2017 Filing 273 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ernest Aguilard claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #271 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Marathon Oil Company and Marathon Oil Company (14-1840) dismissed. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/12/2017. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
January 11, 2017 Filing 271 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party all remaining plaintiffs' claims against Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Donald Marshall and Defendant, Marathon Oil Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. ADDITIONALLY ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendant. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/10/2017. (Reference: 14-18204, 14-1840)(cms)
January 9, 2017 Filing 269 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Donald Marshall claims as to Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving theinstant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Alvin Comeaux, against Defendant, ConocoPhillips Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/6/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
December 5, 2016 Filing 267 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Alvin Comeaux by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1840)(Best, Mark)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint #265 Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiff, James Day, against Placid Oil Company and OXy USA Inc. are hereby dismissed w/prepj. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/22/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 21, 2016 Filing 265 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party claims of plaintiff, James Day, against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
November 18, 2016 Filing 264 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Wade Howard, Michael P. Cash, Joseph I. Giarrusso, III re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-31383. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (Reference: 14-cv-1840)(adp)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #251 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Mark Judy, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that granting #250 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Lawrence Davis, against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #249 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Rene Garcia, against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #248 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Michael Grygo, and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #247 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Henry Roussell, Jr. and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #246 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Lawrence Dorsey, Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #245 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff Theodore Stamps, III, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #244 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Louis Brown, Jr and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. FURTHER ORDERED that #243 Joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice if GRANTED, and all Claims of Plaintiff, Henry Roussell, Jr. against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #242 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff,Joseph Ruffin, III, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein.. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/15/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #240 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Terry Joseph, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/15/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #239 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Sherri Dunlavy, Jerry Lynn Dunlavy, Jr. and Casey Dunlavy, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as stated herein. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/15/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
November 15, 2016 Filing 251 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Mark Judy claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 250 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Davis claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 249 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rene Garcia claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 248 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Michael Grygo claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 247 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Henry Roussell, Jr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 246 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lawrence Dorsey claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 245 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Theodore Stamps, III claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 244 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Louis Brown claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 243 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party claims of Henry Roussell, Jr. against Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 242 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joseph Ruffin, III claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 10, 2016 Filing 240 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Terry Joseph claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
November 10, 2016 Filing 239 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Jerry Dunlavy, Sr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER: Considering the foregoing Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice;IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Keith Harvey, brought in this matter against Defendant, ConocoPhillips Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/9/16. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(clc)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER: Considering the foregoing Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #236 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiffs, Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and JuaJuan Benoit, brought in this matter against Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/9/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
November 9, 2016 Filing 237 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Keith Harvey by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1840)(Best, Mark)
November 9, 2016 Filing 236 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and JuaJuan Benoit by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1840)(Best, Mark)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: Considering the foregoing #233 Motion to Dismiss Party; IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiffs, Harold Bowie and Morris Bowie on behalf of decedent, Clarence Bowie, brought in this matter against Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
November 4, 2016 Filing 234 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Elizabeth Haecker Ryan re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-31383. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (Reference: 14-cv-1840)(adp)
November 3, 2016 Filing 233 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Clarence Bowie With Prejudice by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Best, Mark)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER: Considering the foregoing #231 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiff, Dennis Jones against ConocoPhillips Company are hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/1/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
October 31, 2016 Filing 231 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party ConocoPhillips Company with Prejudice by ConocoPhillips Company, Dennis Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Best, Mark) Modified filer on 10/31/2016 (cms).
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER: Considering the foregoing Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. FURTHER ORDERED, that #228 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is hereby GRANTED and that all claims of Plaintiffs, Shirley Bottley, et al., brought in this matter against Defendant, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to proceed against all other defendants named in this litigation.. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/26/2016. (Reference: 14-1840)(cms)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER: Considering that the claims asserted by Plaintiff, Henry Roussell, Jr. against Defendants, BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company have been compromised, settled, and resolved, all as set forth in the Joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice and finding it is made for good cause. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Henry Roussell, Jr., and any and all cross-claims, third-party demands, and/or petitions in intervention in this litigation against BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/26/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
October 25, 2016 Filing 228 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Jovane Benoit, Juajuan Benoit, Shirley Bottley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #224 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of Eula K. Pierce and Brandy D. Pierce, individually and on behalf of Plaintiff and decedent, Warren Pierce, against Defendants, ConocoPhillips Company, Marathon Oil Company, and Placid Oil Company are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff's claims against all other defendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/21/16.(Reference: Both Cases) (dno)
October 21, 2016 Filing 226 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Henry Roussell, Jr. as to BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company (incorrectly named in the Petiton as BP Exploration & Oil Inc., Amoco Oil Company, and/or Amoco BP Oil) by Amoco BP Oil, Amoco Oil Company, BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Oil Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824)(Bridges, Lauren)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER: Considering that the claims asserted by Plaintiff, Henry Roussell, Jr. against Defendant, ConocoPhillips Company, have been compromised, settled and resolved, all as set forth in the foregoing Joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice and finding it is made for good cause. ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. ORDERED that all claims of Henry Roussell, Jr. in this litigation against ConocoPhillips Company are dismissed in their entirety,with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff's claims against all otherdefendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED ANDADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
October 20, 2016 Filing 224 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by ConocoPhillips Company, Marathon Oil Company, Placid Oil Company, Eula K. Pierce, Brandy D. Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Best, Mark) Modified filers on 10/21/2016 (cms).
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #221 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party ConocoPhillips Company dismissed. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/2016. (Reference: 14-1840)(cms)
October 19, 2016 Filing 222 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by ConocoPhillips Company, Plaintiff Henry Roussell, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(DeShazo, Michele) Modified text on 10/20/2016 (cms).
October 19, 2016 Filing 221 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice by ConocoPhillips Company, Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(DeShazo, Michele) Modified on 10/20/2016 (cms).
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims of Jane Paugh, individually and as representative of the estate of decedent, Marvin Russell Paugh, and any and all cross-claims, third-party demands, and/or petitions in intervention in this litigation against BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff's claims against allother defendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/19/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instantmotion; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Donald Marshall, Sr., and any and all cross-claims, third-party demands, and/or petitions in intervention in this litigation against BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs.Plaintiffs claims against all other defendants not dismissed herein are expressly reserved. FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/19/2016. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(cms)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDERED that the STAY IS LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiffs, Enrique Arguelles, Andrew Burnett, James Verret, and Claude Dupre, Jr., against Defendants, Placid Oil Company and OXY USA Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/18/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
July 18, 2016 Filing 217 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Jane Paugh, individually and as representative of the estate of decedent, Marvin Russell Paugh as to BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company (incorrectly named in the Petiton as BP Exploration & Oil Inc., Amoco Oil Company, and/or Amoco BP Oil) by Amoco BP Oil, Amoco Oil Company, BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Oil Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824, 14-01840)(Bridges, Lauren)
July 18, 2016 Filing 216 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Donald Marshall, Sr. as to BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company (incorrectly named in the Petiton as BP Exploration & Oil Inc., Amoco Oil Company, and/or Amoco BP Oil) by Amoco BP Oil, Amoco Oil Company, BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Oil Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824, 14-01840)Attorney Lauren R. Bridges added to party Amoco BP Oil(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren R. Bridges added to party Amoco Oil Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren R. Bridges added to party BP Exploration & Oil Inc.(pty:dft).(Bridges, Lauren)
July 12, 2016 Filing 215 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party claims of Enrique Arguelles, Andrew Burnett, James Verret and Claude Dupre, Jr. against Placid Oil Co. and OXY USA Inc. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Smith, Meghan)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER re #213 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that attorney Lauren R. Bridges (Bar No. 34460) of the law firm of Liskow & Lewis, One Shell Square, 701 PoydrasStreet, Suite 5000, New Orleans, Louisiana 70139, be and is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Defendant, BP America Production Company, f/k/a Amoco Production Company. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/6/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(my)
July 6, 2016 Filing 213 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Lauren R. Bridges by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Giarrusso, Joseph) Modified text on 7/7/2016 (mmv).
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #211 Joint Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Henry Roussell, Jr. claims against Defendants Marathon Oil Company is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
June 7, 2016 Filing 211 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Henry Roussell Jr claims as to Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Offshore Inc.,Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Oil Company,Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Oil Company. Attorney Aaron J. Hurd terminated; granting #209 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Offshore Inc.,Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Oil Company,Deborah DeRoche Kuchler,Janika D. Polk,Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell,Michele Hale DeShazo,Mark Edward Best,Milele N. St. Julien,Skylar B. Rudin,Etheldreda C. Smith,Joshua Doguet for Shell Oil Company. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
May 16, 2016 Filing 209 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Aaron Hurd as Attorney , MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Additional Counsel of Record Deborah Kuchler, Janika Polk, Leigh Ann Schell, Michele Hale DeShazo, Mark Best, Milele St. Julien, Skylar Rudin, Etheldreda Smith, and Joshua Duguet by Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Mollere, Chadwick)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #207 Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff, Jane Paugh, individually and as representative of the estate of decedent, Marvin Russell Paugh, and Defendants, ConocoPhillips Company is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/22/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cml)
April 21, 2016 Filing 207 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Jane Paugh, ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-01824)(Best, Mark) Modified on 4/22/2016 (cml).
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #205 Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Michael Babineaux's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Parties)(cml)
March 8, 2016 Filing 205 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Michael Babineaux claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #203 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Keith Harvey, Louis Brown, Jr., Ronald Allen, Earl Boullion, Jr., and Dennis Jones claims against Defendants PLACID OIL COMPANY is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
March 4, 2016 Filing 203 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of Multiple Plaintiffs against Placid Oil Company by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Reginald Hadley, and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/26/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(my)
February 25, 2016 Filing 201 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Reginald Hadley claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #197 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff, Leonardus Meerman, against Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/16/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #196 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff, Julio Salmeron, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/16/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #195 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Bryan Boothe claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/16/2016. (Reference: 14-1824)(cms)
February 12, 2016 Filing 197 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Leonardus Meerman claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., Leonardus Meerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified on 2/16/2016 (gec).
February 12, 2016 Filing 196 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Julio Salmeron claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
February 12, 2016 Filing 195 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Bryan Boothe claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #187 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Calvin Plaisance's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/6/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #186 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Warren Hock's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/6/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #185 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Dennis Hock's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/6/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #184 the Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Gilber Breaux's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/6/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #183 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Murphy Gauthreaux's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/5/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #182 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Rickey Crochet's claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/5/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #181 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff James Autin, Jr.'s claims against Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against listed defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/5/16. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
January 5, 2016 Filing 187 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Calvin Plaisance against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
January 5, 2016 Filing 186 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Warren Hock against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
January 5, 2016 Filing 185 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Dennis Hock against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
January 5, 2016 Filing 184 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Gilbert Breaux against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
December 30, 2015 Filing 183 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Evelyn Gauthreaux claims against EM & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
December 30, 2015 Filing 182 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rickey Crochet claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
December 30, 2015 Filing 181 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss James Autin claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #175 the Joint Motion to Lift the Stay in this matter for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and that all claims of the 530 plaintiffs listed in Exhibit "A" (Rec. Doc. 175) against Exxon Mobil Corporation, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #176 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Bryan Boothe's claims against Placid Oil is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against Placid Oil Company are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 the Joint Motion Lift the Stay for the limited purpose of resolving this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to dismiss Plaintiff Calvin Plaisance's claims against Placid Oil is GRANTED, and all claims of said plaintiff against Placid Oil Company are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 22, 2015 Filing 177 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Calvin Plaisance claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
December 22, 2015 Filing 176 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Bryan Boothe's claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
December 21, 2015 Filing 175 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss 530 Plaintiff claims against Exxon by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Dismiss all claims of Henry Roussell, Jr. against the listed defendants as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/16/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
December 15, 2015 Filing 173 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Henry Roussell, Jr. by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01824)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified on 12/16/2015 (cml).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #170 Plaintiffs, Victor Bonilla, Bobby Bertrand, Jr., Larry Moreau, Sr., Ronald O'Donley, Ander Pellerano, Sr., Roland Perrilliat, Sr., Clyde Pike, Steve Ricard, Perry Scott, Earl Sevin, Richard Shrieves, Theodore Stamps, III, Kenneth Walker, Sr., and Thomas Willette, Jr.'s Motion to Dismiss their claims against Placid Oil Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/3/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
December 3, 2015 Filing 170 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Multiple Plaintiffs Claims against Placid Oil Company by Placid Oil Company and Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary) Modified on 12/4/2015 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #168 Motion removing Timtohy Rothberg as counsel of record and designating Blizabeth Haecker Ryan as lead counsel in this matter as to Defendant Varco L.P. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/2/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #167 Motion to Dismiss all claims of Plaintiff, Jane Paugh, individually and as representative of the estate of Marvin Russell Paugh, and Defendant, Marathon Oil Company, With Prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/1/15. (Reference: 14-1824 and 14-1840)(dno)
December 1, 2015 Filing 168 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Haecker Ryan to be substituted in place of Timothy Rothberg by Varco L.P., Varco, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)Attorney Elizabeth Haecker Ryan added to party Varco L.P.(pty:condft), Attorney Elizabeth Haecker Ryan added to party Varco, L.P(pty:dft).(Ryan, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2015 Filing 167 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Jane Paugh, individually and as representaive of the estate of Marvin Russell Paugh, and Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie) Modified on 12/1/2015 (cml).
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #146 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Clyde McGill, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #145 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Hector Martinez, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #143 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Allan Lepine, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #142 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Herman LeBlanc, Sr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #141 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Giles Lanasa, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #140 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Mark Judy, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #138 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Gilbert Hoffpauier, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #137 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Dennis Hoick, Jr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #136 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Warren Hock, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #139 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Raymond Hoffman, Sr., against Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #135 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Bryan Bournes, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #144 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Manuel Marshall, Jr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #134 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Darryl Elliott, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #133 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Sherman Farr, Jr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #132 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Alden Foret, Jr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #131 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Merlin Gougisha, Jr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #130 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Stanley Harris, Sr., against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #129 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, William Hebert, against Defendant, Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #128 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Aldo Hernandez, Sr., against Placid Oil Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/17/15. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
November 18, 2015 Filing 146 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Clyde McGill claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 145 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Hector Martinez claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 144 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Manuel Marshall, Jr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 143 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Allan Lepine claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 142 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Herman LeBlanc, Sr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 141 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Giles Lanasa claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 140 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Mark Judy claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 139 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Raymond Hoffman, Sr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 138 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gilbert Hoffpauir claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 137 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Dennis Hock, Jr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 18, 2015 Filing 136 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Warren Hocks claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 135 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Bryan Bournes claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 134 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Darryl Elliot claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 133 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Sherman Farr, Jr. claims against Placid Oil Co by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 132 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Alden Foret, Jr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 131 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Merlin Gougisha, Jr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 130 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stanley Harris, Sr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 129 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party William Herbert claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 17, 2015 Filing 128 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Aldo Hernandez, Sr. claims against Placid Oil Co. by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Steele, Mary)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Substitute Attorneys Mark L. McNamara, Joseph I. Giarrusso, III and Michael P. Cash for BP America Production Company. Attorneys Gavin H. Guillot, Bettye Anne Barrios and Lauren R. Bridges are withdrawn. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/13/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion 121 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff,Kenneth Lance Walker, Sr. and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion 120 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff,Paul Planche and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion 119 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Hector Martinez and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion 118 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Alfous Ferrier, Jr. and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion 117 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Randy Coleman,Sr and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
November 12, 2015 Filing 122 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael P. Cash to be substituted in place of Bettye A. Barrios by Amoco Oil Company, Amoco Production Company, BP America Production Company, BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Oil Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1824)Attorney Michael P. Cash added to party Amoco Oil Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P. Cash added to party Amoco Production Company(pty:3pd), Attorney Michael P. Cash added to party BP America Production Company(pty:condft), Attorney Michael P. Cash added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P. Cash added to party BP Exploration & Oil Inc.(pty:dft).(Cash, Michael)
November 12, 2015 Filing 121 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Kenneth Walker claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 12, 2015 Filing 120 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Paul Planche claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 12, 2015 Filing 119 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Hector Martinez claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 12, 2015 Filing 118 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Alfous Ferrier claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 12, 2015 Filing 117 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Randy Coleman claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #110 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Thomas Clarke, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/10/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion #111 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Jose Guzman, Sr., and Defendants, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/10/15. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the same be and is hereby GRANTED, and that all claims of Plaintiff, Allan Lepine, and Defendants, Exxon Mobil #112 Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Plaintiff's rights to proceed against all remaining parties not named herein are reserved. IT IS ADDITIONALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/10/15. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Dismiss all claims of Donald Marshal, Sr. against the listed defendants, in their entirety with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/10/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 9, 2015 Filing 112 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Allan Lepine claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
November 9, 2015 Filing 111 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Jose Guzman, Sr. claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
November 9, 2015 Filing 110 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomas Clarke claims against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
November 5, 2015 Filing 109 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, Donald Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01824)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified on 11/6/2015 (my).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Jane Paugh against listed parties as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/4/15. (Reference: 14-1824)(dno)
November 4, 2015 Filing 107 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Marvin Paugh, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01824)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified to add joint filer on 11/5/2015 (cml).
October 2, 2015 Filing 106 Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Attorney's of Record re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-31383. Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (Reference: 14-1840)(adp)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY BE LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #104 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and all claims of Plaintiffs, Dwayne Chauvin and Brenda Chauvin, and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. IS IS ADDITIONAL ORDERED that this Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes involving the validity, interpretation, performance, breach or enforcement of the Receipt, Release and Indemnification Agreement entered into between Plaintiffs and Defendants. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/15/15. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
September 14, 2015 Filing 104 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Exxon Mobil Corp. & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Sercovich, Valeria)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Dwayne Chauvin and any and all cross-claims, third-party demands, and/or petitions in intervention against defendants Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/20/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
August 19, 2015 Filing 102 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Dwayne Chauvin, Chevron USA Inc, OFS, Inc., Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01824)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified filers on 8/20/2015 (plh).
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Plaintiffs Dwayne and Brenda Chauvin's Motion to Dismiss their claims against defendant ConocoPhillips Company, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve their existing claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/19/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
August 18, 2015 Filing 100 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-01824)(DeShazo, Michele)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting Plaintiffs Dwayne and Brenda Chauvin's #98 Motion to Dismiss their claims against Marathon Oil Company, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve their claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
August 17, 2015 Filing 98 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Marathon Oil Company by Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Silbert, Julie)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 the Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Oil Inc., Amoco Oil Company and Amoco BP Oil, by plaintiff Dwayne Chauvin, with prejudice, with all parties bearing their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/11/15. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
August 10, 2015 Filing 96 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dwayne Chauvin by Plaintiff and by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Bridges, Lauren)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that the STAY is LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the motion; ORDER that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; ORDER granting #93 Motion to Dismiss; all claims of plaintiffs, Jeannie Boudreaux, Albert Charles Boudreaux, and Harold Orgeron, individually and on behalf of decedents Albert Ray Boudreraux and Kimmy Boudreaux and Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation and Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2015. (Reference: 14-1824)(blg)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 IT IS ORDERED that the STAY IS LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #92 is GRANTED and all claims of Plaintiffs, Kenneth Alonzo, Marc Arcement, James Autin, Jr., Donnie Beasley, Chris Billiot, Nathaniel Bonney, Gilbert Breaux, III, Valery Burden, Dwayne Chauvin, Thomas Clarke, Richard Colar, Rickey Crochet, Mark Daniels, Calvin Daniels, Peter J. Duhon, Keith Duhon, Wade Duplanits, Sr., Michael Falcon, Alfous Ferrier, Jr., Scott Fredericks, Jose Guzman, Sr., Donald Marshall and Marvin Paugh, against PLACID OIL CoMPANY are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED ANDADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/26/15. (Reference: 14-1824) (dno)
May 5, 2015 Filing 93 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims of Albert & Kimmy Boudreaux against Exxon & ITCO by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Pilie, Glen) Modified filers on 5/6/2015 (plh).
March 25, 2015 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss certain plaintiffs' claims against defendant Placid Oil Company by Placid Oil Company, Kenneth Alonzo, Marc Arcement, James Autin, Jr., Donnie Beasley, Chris Billiot, Nathaniel Bonney, Gilbert Breaux, III, Valery Burden, Dwayne Chauvin, Thomas Clarke, Richard Colar, Rickey Crochet, Mark Daniels, Calvin Daniels, Peter J. Duhon, Keith Duhon, Wade Duplanits, Sr., Michael Falcon, Alfous Ferrier, Jr., Scott Fredericks, Jose Guzman, Sr., Donald Marshall and Marvin Paugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Steele, Mary) Modified on 3/26/2015 (plh).
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER of USCA as to #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the opposed motion for leave to appeal under 28:1453 is DENIED. USCA Judge Name: Prado, Owen, and Graves (Reference: 14-1824; 14-1840)(plh)
March 13, 2015 Filing 90 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Louis M. Grossman as Attorney by Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01840)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified on 3/16/2015 (plh).
March 13, 2015 Filing 89 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Louis M. Grossman as Attorney by Chevron USA Inc, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14cv01824)(Shelton, Shannon) Modified on 3/16/2015 (plh).
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDERED that the STAY IS LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; FURTHER ORDERED that the #87 joint motion to dismiss, is GRANTED; FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/5/2015. (Reference: 14-1824)(blg)
March 4, 2015 Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Arthur Vidonne, Chevron USA Inc, Shell oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, BP America Production Company, Marathon Oil Company, OFS, Inc., Varco L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Rudin, Skylar) Modified on 3/5/2015 (blg).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiff's #66 Motion for Reconsideration of Court's denial of remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/12/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
December 29, 2014 Filing 85 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Shirley Bottley re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Transcript is already on file) (Reference: 14-cv-1840)(Falcon, Timothy)
December 29, 2014 Filing 84 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Warren Lester re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Transcript is already on file) (Reference: 14-cv-1824)(Falcon, Timothy)
December 19, 2014 Filing 81 USCA Appeal Fee paid as to Shirley Bottley (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 053L-4693473) re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Dawn Humphries, Demetria Sterling, Alfreda Marshall, Warren Lester, David Quinn (Reference: 14-cv-1840)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
December 19, 2014 Filing 80 USCA Appeal Fee paid as to Wanda Lester (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 053L-4693455) re #79 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Dawn Humphries, Demetria Sterling, Alfreda Marshall, Warren Lester, David Quinn (Reference: 14-1824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
December 17, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824; 14-1840)(plh)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/17/14. (Reference: 14-1824; 14-1840)(plh)
December 17, 2014 Filing 78 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Stein, David)
December 16, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Dawn Humphries, Warren Lester, Alfreda Marshall, David Quinn, Demetria Sterling, et al as to #46 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(Reference: 14-1824; 14-1840)(plh)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the STAY IS LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving the instant motion; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion, #75 , is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these proceedings otherwise remain STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/10/14.(Reference: All Cases)(dno)
December 10, 2014 Filing 76 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff, Clarence Bowie, Partial Dismissal With Prejudice of Shell Oil Company and Shell Offshore Inc. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer. No further action necessary at this time. (Reference: 14-1824)(caa)
December 9, 2014 Filing 75 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party With Prejudice by Shell Offshore Inc., Shell Oil Company and Clarence Bowie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1824)(Mollere, Chadwick) Modified on 12/10/2014 (caa).
December 2, 2014 Filing 74 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation re #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #46 Order, #45 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court ; . (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Stein, David)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - The Court has been informed that Plaintiffs have sought permission from the Fifth Circuit to appeal this Court's denial of remand to state court. #45 As the issue presents a difficult, weighty jurisdictional question which will determine the future course of this litigation and could carry adverse consequences to a party, this Court finds that a stay of proceedings is warranted until the appeal is resolved. This stay, however, shall not be construed so as to preclude any party from filing a timely reply to the pending motion to reconsider. #66 All other matters, however, are subject to the stay. The parties may move to lift the stay once the appeal is resolved. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that these proceedings are hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motions for extension of time to answer, #70 , #72 , are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the parties may re-urge the motions after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/25/14. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)
November 21, 2014 Filing 72 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-CV-01840)(Silbert, Julie)
November 21, 2014 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint by BP America Production Company.(Reference: 2:14-CV-01840)(Bridges, Lauren) Modified on 11/24/2014 (plh).
November 21, 2014 Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Petition of Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Jujuan Benoit by BP Corporation North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-CV-01840)(Bridges, Lauren) Modified on 11/24/2014 (plh).
November 21, 2014 Filing 69 Answer, Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand in Response to Plaintiffs Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit, and Jujuan Benoit's Petition for Wrongful Death and Survivial Damages by Chevron USA Inc.(Reference: 2:14cv1840)(Shelton, Shannon)
November 20, 2014 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Status Conference was held on 11/20/2014. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 19, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #46 Order, #45 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court ; by Warren Lester. Motion set for 12/17/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-01824)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
November 19, 2014 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses by Varco, L.P.(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Rothberg, Timothy)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #63 Alpha Technical Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third Party Demand and Cross Claim asserted against Kellogg, Brown & Root, without prejudice, each party to pay its own cost, reserving unto Alpha Technical Services, Inc., all rights it may have against any other party. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/14. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Attorney Steven Robert Rech to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to defendant Hydril Company and Hydril LLC. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/14/14. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
November 14, 2014 Filing 63 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. by Alpha Technical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Reference: 14-1824)(Didriksen, Caleb)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard Austin Schwartz for Hydril. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(jrc)
November 14, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Varco, L.P.(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824)(Rothberg, Timothy) Modified case reference on 11/17/2014 (plh).
November 13, 2014 Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Austin Schwartz (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-4655486) by Hydril Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Sanderson, Adam)
November 12, 2014 Filing 59 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Robert Rech (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-4653913) by Hydril Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Attorney ECF Registrarion Form)(Reference: 14-1824, 14-1840)(Sanderson, Adam)
November 6, 2014 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Intracoastal Tubular Services, Inc..(Reference: 2:14-cv-01840)(Balhoff, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to answer; answer due by 11/21/14. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/4/14. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
November 3, 2014 Filing 56 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition by Plaintiffs Bottley, Benoit & Benoit by Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-1840; 2:14-cv-01824)(Shelton, Shannon)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Defendants, Marathon Oil Company and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer due within 21 days. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/14. (Reference: 14-1840)(dno)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Defendant, BP America Production Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer due within 21 days. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/3/14. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
October 31, 2014 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ConocoPhillips Company.(Reference: 2:14-CV-01840)(Best, Mark)
October 31, 2014 Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:14-cv-01824; 2:14-cv-01840)(Bridges, Lauren) Modified on 11/3/2014 (plh).
October 31, 2014 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Petition of Shirley Bottley, Jovane Benoit and Jujuan Benoit by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-1840)(Silbert, Julie)
October 31, 2014 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(Reference: 14-1840)(Sercovich, Valeria)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 IT IS ORDERED that an in-person Status Conference is set for 11/20/2014 at 2:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/31/14.(Reference: All Cases)(dno)
October 30, 2014 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Shell Oil Company.(Reference: 2:14-CV-01840)(Mollere, Chadwick)
October 29, 2014 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 17, 2014 before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2015. (Reference: 14-1824)(rsg)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AND REASONS that the Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Juajuan Benoit, Jovane Benoit, Shirley Bottley, in C.A. 14-1840, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED WITH C.A 14-1824-EEF-JCW, for all purposes. Clerk will establish a master file and docket sheet for these consolidated cases. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/23/14.(dno)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiffs' #8 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/23/14. (dno)
September 26, 2014 Filing 44 Memorandum filed by Varco, L.P in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (dno)
September 26, 2014 Filing 43 REPLY filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (dno)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Varco, L.P.'s Motion for Leave to File a memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum in support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/25/14. (dno)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 ExxonMobil Oil Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a post-hearing supplemental memorandum in support of motion to remand. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/24/14. (dno)
September 25, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Torch Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Mary)
September 24, 2014 Filing 39 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #38 RESPONSE to Motion; **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action.** (plh)
September 24, 2014 Filing 38 EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Varco, L.P . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Rothberg, Timothy) Modified event/text on 9/24/2014 (plh).
September 24, 2014 Filing 37 Notice of Compliance Amended Notice of Compliance with 1447(b) by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation re #18 Notice of Compliance,. (Stein, David)
September 24, 2014 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Proposed reply to plaintiffs' post-hearing supplemental memo in support of remand, #2 Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
September 24, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE by OXY USA Inc. Notice of Non-Party Status. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Steele, Mary)
September 23, 2014 Filing 34 Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum filed by Warren Lester, et al, in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dno)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a post-hearing supplemental memorandum in support of their motion to remand. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/23/14. (dno)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Substitute Attorney Laura Caviness Cocus for Attorney Barbara L. Bossetta for defendant Placid Oil Company. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/22/14. (dno)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Attorney Brett P. Fenasci to Enroll as additional Counsel of Record for Chevron USA Inc. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/22/14. (dno)
September 22, 2014 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Warren Lester. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
September 19, 2014 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Laura C. Cocus to be substituted in place of Barbara L. Bossetta by Placid Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steele, Mary)
September 19, 2014 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Shannon)
September 17, 2014 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2014 re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Warren Lester, et al. Motion was taken under submission. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (dno)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record with Exhibit 5, the Case Management Order regarding the Louisiana Texas Oilfield Inspection Services Flight. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/16/14. (dno)
September 16, 2014 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(dno)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum to Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/15/14. (dno)
September 16, 2014 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION to Supplement Record; **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action. Also, Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (plh)
September 15, 2014 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation's Opposition to Motion to Remand by Warren Lester. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit (1), #5 Exhibit (2), #6 Exhibit (3))(Sprague, Jeremiah)
September 15, 2014 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 5 to Motion to Remand by Warren Lester. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text/event and removed referral on 9/16/2014 (plh).
September 12, 2014 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Varco, L.P. re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Opposition. (Rothberg, Timothy)
September 11, 2014 Filing 19 Manual Attachment Received re #18 Notice of Compliance, filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (plh)
September 11, 2014 Filing 18 Notice of Compliance by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Notice of Manual Attachment B - DVDs of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1 of Notice of Filing, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2 of Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3 of Notice of Filing)(Stein, David)
September 9, 2014 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stein, David)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Considering the Request for Oral Argument #9 filed by plaintiffs, Warren Lester, et al; IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Request is GRANTED and the #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court will be heard on 9/17/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon with oral argument. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/2/14.(dno)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Warren Lester, et al's #10 Motion for expedited consideration of its motion to remand to state court is DENIED. The Court will hear oral argument on the motion to remand on September 17, 2014, as previously scheduled. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/2/14. (dno)
September 2, 2014 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Expedited Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. **Filing attorney incorrectly attached exhibits that were 8x14 inch images. Pursuant to Local Rule 10.1E, 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' All future pleadings and forms should be filed in this manner. When scanning documents, such as attachments, please adjust settings on scanner to comply with this size requirement. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action is needed for this filing. (jtd)
September 2, 2014 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Shell Oil Company, Shell Offshore Inc. re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mollere, Chadwick) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/2/2014) (jtd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/2/2014) (jtd). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/2/2014) (jtd). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/2/2014) (jtd). Modified docket text on 9/2/2014 (jtd).
September 2, 2014 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court . (Pilie, Glen) Modified docket text on 9/2/2014 (jtd).
August 28, 2014 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand . ** It isn't necessary to select an additional motion event 'Hearing' besides the proper event 'Expedite' and it isn't necessary to link this motion to the request for oral argument. Clerk has taken corrective action by modifying docket text. No further action is needed. (jtd)
August 27, 2014 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Warren Lester. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified docket text on 8/28/2014 (jtd).
August 27, 2014 Filing 9 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sprague, Jeremiah)
August 27, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Warren Lester, et al. Motion set for 9/17/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Motion to Transfer & Consolidate, #5 Exhibit Tuboscope CMO, #6 Exhibit Baker Tubular Flight Designations, #7 Exhibit LTOIS Flight Designations, #8 Exhibit CDC Judges, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Frank Buck) Attorney Jeremiah A. Sprague added to party Warren Lester(pty:pla).(Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified docket text on 8/28/2014 (jtd).
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time until 9/11/14, to file it's Notice of Compliance with Removal Procedures. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/21/14. (dno)