Sewell et al v. Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sewell, George Duessing, William Sewell, James Fenner, Beth Duessing, Elsebeth Fenner, Watson Memorial Ministries, Floyd Aaron, Kim Alvarez, Alan Basik, David Bernberg, Carl Baloney, Elizabeth Berzas, Rick Boehm, Randy Boudreaux, Brian Payne, Sandra Casen, Ann Conger, Morell Crane, Mary Davies, Ann Drown, Sara Duncan, Butch Emmons, David R. Engles, David Epstein, Gary Gaethe, Edwin Geoghegan, Jr., Shaminder Gupta, Henry Haley, Larry Hameen, Donna Hamsher, Jen Harper, Robert Hudak, Cathleen Hightower, Catherine Hock, Mary Jo Irino, Jeff Irino, Julia Kingham, W.E. Kramer, III, Meg Leche, Harry Leche, Sam Leukowicz, Deborah Marx, Stephen Marx, Amy Miller, Chuck Miller, Keith Monnerjahn, Charles J. Napoli, Aline Napoli, Craig Napoli, Nancy Napoli, Charles Napoli, Richard P. O'Neill, George Owen, Vernon Pettigrew, Linnette Reed, Wayne Reed, Paul Richards, Jr., Leticia Rueb, Steven Rueb, Thomas Ryan, Virginnia Saussy, Marty Scroggins, Peter Sladovich, David St. Marie, Mitsuko Tanner, Chris Fontenot, Cory Taylor, Rick Torres, Roeland Van Opijnen, Daniel Walsh, Elaine Walsh, Anita Wood, Rebecca Worley, Iknight Worley, Jori Zlatkiss and Ian Zlatkiss
Defendant: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Third_party_plaintiff: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Third_party_defendant: B&K Construction Co., LLC, Cajun Constructors, LLC, Boh Brothers Construction Co., LLC and Linfield, Hunter, and Junius, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv03117
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER and REASONS REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/5/2017.(Reference: 15-3117, 15-6276, 16-2326, 16-2328, 16-3120, 16-4233, 16-4248, 16-12368)(cbs)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER and REASONS - Before the Court are three motions for summary judgment 241 , 246 , & 252 , filed by contractors B&K Construction Company, LLC, Boh Bros. Construction Company, LLC, and Cajun Constructors, LLC, as third-party defendants in the captioned matter. IT IS ORDERED that the Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED on the basis of federal contractor immunity. All claims pending against Boh Bros., B&K, and Cajun Constructors are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In light of this r uling, the Court has reason to question its continued maintenance of jurisdiction over the consolidated cases. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining parties brief the issue of this Court's current subject matter jurisdiction. Mem oranda not to exceed twelve (12) pages (one for Plaintiffs, another for SWB) shall be submitted within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 12/20/2016. (Reference: ALL CASES)(cbs)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER and REASONS denying 228 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 10/12/2016. (Reference: ALL CASES)(cbs)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever and Remand (Rec. Doc. 7) is hereby DENIED, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/12/2015. (cbs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell et al v. Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sewell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Duessing
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sewell
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fenner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Duessing
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsebeth Fenner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watson Memorial Ministries
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Aaron
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Alvarez
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Basik
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bernberg
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Baloney
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Berzas
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Boehm
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Boudreaux
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Payne
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Casen
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Conger
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morell Crane
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Davies
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Drown
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Duncan
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butch Emmons
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Engles
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Epstein
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gaethe
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Geoghegan, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaminder Gupta
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Haley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hameen
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hamsher
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Harper
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hudak
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Hightower
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hock
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Irino
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Irino
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Kingham
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.E. Kramer, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meg Leche
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Leche
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Leukowicz
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Marx
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Marx
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Monnerjahn
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Napoli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aline Napoli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Napoli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Napoli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Napoli
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. O'Neill
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Owen
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Pettigrew
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnette Reed
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Reed
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Richards, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Rueb
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rueb
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ryan
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginnia Saussy
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Scroggins
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sladovich
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David St. Marie
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsuko Tanner
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Fontenot
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Taylor
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Torres
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roeland Van Opijnen
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Walsh
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Walsh
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Wood
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Worley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iknight Worley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jori Zlatkiss
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Zlatkiss
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Represented By: Michael Thomas Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Represented By: Craig Bernard Mitchell
Represented By: Kiana M. Mitchell
Represented By: Anthony James Stewart
Represented By: Christopher David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Represented By: Craig Bernard Mitchell
Represented By: Kiana M. Mitchell
Represented By: Anthony James Stewart
Represented By: Christopher David Wilson
Represented By: Craig Bernard Mitchell
Represented By: Kiana M. Mitchell
Represented By: Anthony James Stewart
Represented By: Christopher David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: B&K Construction Co., LLC
Represented By: John Elliott Unsworth, III
Represented By: John Elliott Unsworth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Cajun Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Craig Wren Brewer
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Eppling
Represented By: Sara Peters Scurlock
Represented By: Craig Wren Brewer
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Eppling
Represented By: Sara Peters Scurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Boh Brothers Construction Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Linfield, Hunter, and Junius, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?