Doucet v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Doucet Jay and Jay Doucet
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv09048
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General)(Breuer, Wiebke)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7143374) filed by Jay Doucet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Jay Doucet(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucet v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doucet Jay
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Doucet
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?