Halley, et al v. Waitr Holdings, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley, Sandy Jones, Tiffany Sonnier, Deshawn Williams, Geleesa Denton, Sydney Salvant, Derrick James, Robin Ferrier, Darian Osborne, Alicia Brossette, Brooke R. Daigle, Kalisha James, Justis W Nelsom, Alexandra Gonzales, Jacques Jackson, Samore Connor, Elizabeth Mingo, Jamie Lockmiller, Blake Christensen, Jeremy Thomas, Douglas Allen, Shandi Gautreaux, Angelica Thompson, Roxanne Toll, Jessica Boeneke, Shuntel Hayden, Brian J Jones, Sidney Ranzino, Toni Smith, Lamarcus Myles, Chelsey Green, Avaysione Jackson, Blayne G. Lewis, Jennifer Gary, Amanda Owen, Amanda Menard, Craig Vidrine, Travis Ramer, Karen M. Kelly, Andrew J Thomasson, Barbara Stewart, Todd Bidwell, Kieve Savoie, Hythem M. Elsaleh, Ashley D Collins, Gerard Adams, Robert Lowrey-Dufour, Carlo Di Donna, Jasmine Gatewood, Ronnie Alfred, Brian Webster, Stephen A. Nesbit, Londyn Ryan, Shawn Cousin, Kristina Arhart, Thomas A Kloss, Dana Dobson, Sarah Portier, Krystal Shilling, Zachary R. Hillyard, Mark A. Turner, Stephen Mayfield, Danyale Webb, Brian Henry, Brooke Dupuy, Cierra Barnett, Brian Southworth, Keith Robinson, LeeKyle Perine, Erica O. Franklin, Lori Latuso, Myieka Deandra Nesbitt, Varica M. Cotlong, Kendra Howard, Jason Hesse, Yuri Vukojevic, Latausha Levy, Mary Foss, Kenneth Calvin, James Ziegler, Christina Guillory, Llya Rizzo, Devin Alario, Jesus E. Martinez Cortes, Jordan Matthews, Chelsea Connor, Rebecca Womack, Joseph George, Beverly Brown, Antoinette Perry, Julie McKey, Amanda Crowe, Misti Johnston, Crystal Williams, Emily Bruno, Briana Smith, Leslie F Smith, Clarence Small, Umeka Jackson, Natalie Normand, Percy Vaughan, Shane Godso, Cherell McBride, Ian MacInnes, Dawn White, Taylor Delpidio, Tara Guy, Colin Duff, Brandon J. Bailey, Damian Lefort, Nicole Moise, Lori Lewis, Natalia Blanchard, Chase Metoyer, Beth H. Santisi, Jawonna Lewis, Earl Toll, Christopher Martinez, Alexus Lykes, Tayler James, Chad A. Johnson, Brittany Easley, Alyssa Khumdee, Christopher Smith, Aerielle Lee, Kayla Failla, Bennett Smith, Annette Dugas, Danielle D. Armstead, Cassini Williams, Winston Mitchell, Kelli Alfred, Erica Hill, Marsiah Conner, Tony Walker, William Hurst, David Grubb, Stephanie Oglesby, Ray Jefferson, Charles Igiebor, Lindsey Burlette, Patience January, Kisha Kana, Daniel Draughon, Brandon C Clancy, Ross Naugle, James Langley, Marcelo Elissetche, Brooke Kelley, Hugh Plaisance and Dylan J Masters
Defendant: Waitr Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Landcadia Holdings, Inc. and Waitr Incorporated, Waitr Holdings, Inc. and Waitr Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01800
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Heather Gongaware by Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit s Nos. 1-3, #3 Notice of Submission)(Pelleteri, Erin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Umeka Jackson)(Alexander, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jessica Boeneke)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (jeg).
April 23, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Dylan J. Masters)(Alexander, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kendra Howard)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (jeg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (jeg).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Waitr Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/26/2019; Waitr Incorporated answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/16/2019. (jeg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (jeg).
April 15, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-13 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (jeg).
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carlisle, Laura)
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filings Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (jeg).
April 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (jeg).
April 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/4/2019 (jeg).
April 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (jeg).
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (jeg).
March 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (jeg).
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/27/2019 (jeg).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Waitr Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/12/2019; Waitr Incorporated answer due 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/26/2019. (jeg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (jeg).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Motion of Lauren E. Braddy to Appear Pro Hac Vice as visiting counsel for plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/22/19. (dno) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2019: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Laura E. Carlisle added to party Waitr Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura E. Carlisle added to party Waitr Incorporated(pty:dft).(Carlisle, Laura) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (jeg).
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Consents to Join)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (jeg).
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jualeia Halley Notice of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 Consents to Join Wage Claim)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (jeg).
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents To Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (jeg).
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Lauren E. Braddy (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7491635) by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Lauren E. Braddy, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 Consent to Join)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (jeg).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Austin Winters Anderson. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Clifton Alexander. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents To Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Austin W. Anderson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7482212) by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (jeg).
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton "Clif" Alexander (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7482152) by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (jeg).
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice (Other), #6 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other). **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate 2 Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents To Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Waitr Holdings, Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Bohrer, Philip)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Only 1 Defendant should be named on each summons. Clerk has corrected summons and issued 1 for each defendant.** (mm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Waitr Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7452181) filed by Jualeia Halley, Heather Gongaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Heather Gongaware(pty:pla), Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Jualeia Halley(pty:pla).(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halley, et al v. Waitr Holdings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Gongaware
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jualeia Halley
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Jones
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Sonnier
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Williams
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geleesa Denton
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Salvant
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick James
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Ferrier
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darian Osborne
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Brossette
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke R. Daigle
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalisha James
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justis W Nelsom
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Gonzales
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Jackson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samore Connor
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mingo
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lockmiller
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Christensen
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Thomas
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Allen
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandi Gautreaux
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Thompson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Toll
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Boeneke
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuntel Hayden
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Jones
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Ranzino
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamarcus Myles
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsey Green
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avaysione Jackson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blayne G. Lewis
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gary
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Owen
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Menard
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Vidrine
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Ramer
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Kelly
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Thomasson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Stewart
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bidwell
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kieve Savoie
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hythem M. Elsaleh
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley D Collins
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Adams
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lowrey-Dufour
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Di Donna
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Gatewood
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Alfred
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Webster
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Nesbit
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Londyn Ryan
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Cousin
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Arhart
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A Kloss
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Dobson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Portier
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Shilling
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary R. Hillyard
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Turner
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Mayfield
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyale Webb
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Henry
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Dupuy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cierra Barnett
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Southworth
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Robinson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeKyle Perine
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica O. Franklin
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Latuso
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myieka Deandra Nesbitt
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varica M. Cotlong
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Howard
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hesse
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuri Vukojevic
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latausha Levy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Foss
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Calvin
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ziegler
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Guillory
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Llya Rizzo
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Alario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus E. Martinez Cortes
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Matthews
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Connor
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Womack
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph George
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Brown
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Perry
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie McKey
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Crowe
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misti Johnston
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Williams
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie F Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Small
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umeka Jackson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Normand
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Vaughan
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Godso
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherell McBride
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian MacInnes
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn White
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Delpidio
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Guy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Duff
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Bailey
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Lefort
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Moise
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lewis
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Blanchard
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Metoyer
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth H. Santisi
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawonna Lewis
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Toll
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martinez
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexus Lykes
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayler James
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad A. Johnson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Easley
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Khumdee
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aerielle Lee
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Failla
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Dugas
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle D. Armstead
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassini Williams
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Mitchell
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Hill
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsiah Conner
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Walker
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hurst
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Grubb
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Oglesby
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Jefferson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Igiebor
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Burlette
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patience January
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisha Kana
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Draughon
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon C Clancy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Naugle
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Langley
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Elissetche
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Kelley
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Plaisance
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan J Masters
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waitr Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Landcadia Holdings, Inc. and Waitr Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waitr Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Laura E. Carlisle
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Erin E. Pelleteri
Represented By: Emily Olivier Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waitr Incorporated
Represented By: Laura E. Carlisle
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Erin E. Pelleteri
Represented By: Emily Olivier Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?