Washington Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Washington Parish Government
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Sandoz, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp., Mallinckrodt Plc, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Smith Drug Company, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith, LLC, Walmart Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx LLC, Noramco, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Walmart, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Walgreen Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11626
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 37 Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (zmg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sbs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (my)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/6/2019. (sbs)
August 6, 2019 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crump, Richard) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs).
August 6, 2019 Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. (Crump, Richard) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Deadlines, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/5/2019. (sbs)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/5/2019. (sbs) (Main Document 30 replaced on 8/6/2019) (sbs).
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Smith Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brickman, Philip) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs).
August 2, 2019 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., shall have through and including 60 days after (1) this Court's ruling on the motion to remand, or (2) the JPML enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, whichever is later, to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Petition for Damages. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/1/2019.(sbs)
July 31, 2019 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Perry, S.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney S. Brian Perry added to party Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Perry, S.) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (sbs)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. The submission of Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Remand is continued without date. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/29/2019.(sbs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (sbs).
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVS Health Corporation (Flanagan, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are granted a sixty (60) day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after the later of: (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, should Plaintiff move to remand this action to state court. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019. (sbs)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition. Defendants are allowed an extension of time up to, through and including 60 days after the later of: (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019. (sbs)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019.(sbs)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, by CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Knight, Kathryn) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (sbs).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/22/2019. (NEF: Judge Lemmon)(ajn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants and Anda, Inc. by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Washington Parish Government. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nicole)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 **STRICKEN. SEE R. DOC. 19** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Rule 7.8 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nicole) Modified on 7/22/2019 (sbs).
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Response/Reply by Washington Parish Government to #11 Rico Standing Order (Landry, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Rico Standing Order. By Clerk. (jrc)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 15, 2019.(mp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Directive of the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (mp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Attachment #1 uploaded in improper format. Clerk took corrective action. (mp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Collateral Proceedings. (Crisler, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IVAX LLC, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Crisler, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation Supplemental Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC Parish of Washington, case number 113499 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7750479) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 List of Parties & Attorneys)Attorney Richard S. Crisler added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Crisler, Richard) (Attachment 1 re-formatted on 7/15/2019) (mp). Modified attachment description on 7/15/2019 (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Represented By: Kelly Cambre Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Plc
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Represented By: Philip C. Brickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Represented By: Kelly Cambre Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Represented By: Kelly Cambre Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: S. Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Parish Government
Represented By: Ross Forrest Lagarde
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?