Simmons v. Jefferson Parish et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Simmons, Jr
Defendant: Jefferson Parish, Paul D. Connick, Jr., Cornel Jackson and Risk Management Department, Jefferson Parish
Case Number: 2:2020cv00873
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Paul D. Connick, Jr, Cornel Jackson, Risk Management Department, Jefferson Parish. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)(Sent to Plaintiff with Pauper Letter)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 3/26/20. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2020: #1 Pauper Letter) (cg).
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING LOCAL CIVIL RULE 54.7. (cg)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on March 24, 2020.(mp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Simmons, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (pp) Modified to edit referral on 3/26/2020 (mmv).
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Paul D. Connick, Jr, Cornel Jackson, Jefferson Parish filed by Joseph Simmons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Jefferson Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Simmons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Connick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Management Department, Jefferson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?