Louisiana Asset Management Pool v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc. and Louisiana Asset Management Pool
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC, BNP Paribas, RBC Capital Markets, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Bank of America Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald, JP Morgan Securities, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Capital One Bank, UBS Securities LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Mizuho Securities, LLC, Jeffries Group, LLC, HSBC Securities USA, Credit Suisse AG, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, TD Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Jefferies Group, LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Morgan Keegan, LLC, Unidentified Parties, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01095
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Ryan E.Johnson and Justin Marocco by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Mark)
May 27, 2020 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Raymond James Financial, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Jefferies Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group, LLC (Carter, Winstol)
May 27, 2020 Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Schonekas, Kyle)
May 26, 2020 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BNP Paribas Securities Corp identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp (Cunningham, Mark)
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by UBS Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC (Freeman, George)
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Chastain, James) Modified text/added Corporate Parent on 5/27/2020 (mm).
May 26, 2020 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Capital One Bank identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (Gulotta, James)
May 26, 2020 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter JPMorgan Chase & Co. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Hite, John) Modified text/added corporate parents on 5/26/2020 (mm).
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 DEFICIENT: Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BNP Paribas Securities Corp identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp (Johnson, Ryan) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (mm).
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Schwab, Thomas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the Frist-Filed Rule by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Thomas E. Schwab, #3 Exhibit 1 to Schwab Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Schwab Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Schwab Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Schwab Declaration, #7 Notice of Submission)(Schwab, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Lazerow. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/19/2020. (ko)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew D. Lazerow (Fee previously paid) by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to E-Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Lazerow (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8307379) by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (mm).
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION to Reset and Coordinate Responsive Pleading Deadlines by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Mark) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (mm).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp answer due 6/8/2020; Cantor Fitzgerald answer due 5/26/2020; Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC answer due 5/26/2020; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 5/26/2020; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/26/2020; Jefferies Group, LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 5/27/2020; Nomura Securities International, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020; RBC Capital Markets, LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020; SG Americas Securities, LLC answer due 5/29/2020; Stifel Nicolaus & Co. answer due 5/29/2020; UBS Securities LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Wells Fargo & Co. answer due 5/26/2020; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 5/26/2020.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/04/2020. (ko)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P.Morgan Securities, LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Thomas E. Schwab added to party Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC(pty:dft).(Schwab, Thomas) Modified filers on 4/30/2020 (mm).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Capital One Bank is granted an extension of time until 06/26/2020 within which to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/30/2020. (ko)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to 1 Complaint. **This was a duplicate filing of record document 5 and has been noted as such. There was no need to refile record document 5 as there was only a correction sent out, not a deficiency.** (mm)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING OF REC. DOC. 5** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to 1 Complaint by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (mm).
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Andrew Lazerow and Sarah Suwanda, for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted.** (mm)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney James C. Gulotta, Jr added to party Capital One Bank(pty:dft).(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (mm).
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet or the Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies Group, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Mizuho Securities, LLC, Morgan Keegan, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(cwa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8243922) filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)Attorney Alejandro R. Perkins added to party Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc.(pty:pla).(Perkins, Alejandro) (Attachments 1-25 replaced on 4/2/2020) (cwa). Modified text on 4/2/2020 (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Asset Management Pool v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Represented By: James G. Albertine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald
Represented By: Rachel Wendt Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: James C. Gulotta, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Lazerow
Represented By: Bryant S. York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Dressel
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Co.
Represented By: Robert J. Dressel
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffries Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Represented By: James G. Albertine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr
Represented By: James Rodney Chastain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Group, LLC
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc.
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Asset Management Pool
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?