Giles v. Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Lewis Giles, Jr.
Defendant: Corporation Servicing Company, Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C., The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, David Ertel, Rodman Ward, III, Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc. and Corporation Service Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01128
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag)
May 20, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. re #24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Morris, Ashley) Modified text on 5/20/2020 (mm).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the referral to the Magistrate Judge of plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is rescinded. The motion will be decided by the District Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that memorandum in opposition, if any, to the motion shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on May 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/11/2020.(mm) (NEF: MJ 2)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: No additional motions may be filed until the Court addresses defendant's #20 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's various motions, #18 , #19 , #21 , #22 , #23 , shall be submitted as of 6/17/2020 as stated herein. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/7/2020.(mm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading)(mm)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(mm)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Morris, Ashley)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(mm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Documentation Verification by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(mm)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Declaring Mortgage Contract and Note Relatively Null and Legally Void by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Original Deficient Filing, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(mm)
April 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Demand a Trial by Jury by Lewis Giles, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(mm)
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #16 MOTION to Declare Mortgage Contract and Note Legally Void. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/15/2020. (mm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND REASONS denying #14 MOTION to Leave File in Addition to the First Objection as stated herein. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/24/2020. (mm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Declare Mortgage Contract and Note Legally Void by Lewis Giles, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(mm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Leave File in Addition to the First Objection by Lewis Giles, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading)(mm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #12 MOTION for Disqualification of Counsel. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/7/2020. (mm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: MOTION for Disqualification of Counsel by Lewis Giles, Jr. (mm)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Notice of Compliance by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, Ashley)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Lewis Giles, Jr re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #1 Notice of Removal. (pp) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/13/2020) (pp).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal as to Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.; answer due 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/9/2020. (mm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Morris, Ashley) Modified linkage on 4/9/2020 (mm).
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Bayview Financial Holdings, LP, Corporate Parent Bayview Financial Management Corp, Corporate Parent QKF Corporation, Corporate Parent BFTG Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Bayview Asset Management Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Bayview Asset Management, LLC for Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (Morris, Ashley)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #1 Notice of Removal by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morris, Ashley) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (mm).
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. By the Clerk. (mm)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th Judicial District Court, St. John The Baptist, case number 75,261 B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8250319) filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading, #3 Notice of Removal to District Court) Attorney Ashley E. Morris added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Morris, Ashley) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/7/2020) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ashley E. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodman Ward, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Giles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?