Crier et al v. Knight Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Crier, Tronda C Crier and Tronda Crier
Defendant: David Walker, McGuire Transportation,Inc., Knight Specialty Insurance Company and McGuire Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02288
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Status Conference set for 11/13/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 3/8/2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on September 24, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(mp)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/21/2020 at 2:00 PM. This conference shall take place VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. A Zoom for Government link will be circulated to counsel of record via email. Counsel are to share that link with any necessary participating parties. The required settlement memoranda, more fully described on Page 2, are due no later than midnight on Wednesday, 10/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/16/2020.(ajn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 9/24/2020 01:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Danielle Smith of Citation and Petition for Damages served on McGuire Transportation, Inc. on August 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Citation and Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Green Card)(Smith, Danielle)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter McGuire Trucking Company, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter KnightBrook LLC as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McGuire Transportation, Inc. identifying corporate parent McGuire Trucking Company, Inc. for McGuire Transportation, Inc. (Benjamin, Jack) Modified text/corporate parent on 8/21/2020 (jeg).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Knight Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Knight Insurance Company,Ltd; Corporate Parent KnightBrook LLC for Knight Specialty Insurance Company (Benjamin, Jack) Modified text/corporate parent on 8/21/2020 (jeg).
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Jack) Modified text/event on 8/21/2020 (jeg).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Knight Specialty Insurance Company, McGuire Transportation, Inc., David Walker.(Benjamin, Jack) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (jeg).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McGuire Transportation,Inc., Knight Specialty Insurance Company, David Walker. By the Clerk. (bm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC, case number 2020-4741 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8454576) filed by McGuire Transportation,Inc., Knight Specialty Insurance Company, David Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 List of Pleadings, #4 List of Parties, #5 Certificate, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7)Attorney Jack C. Benjamin, Jr added to party Knight Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jack C. Benjamin, Jr added to party McGuire Transportation,Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jack C. Benjamin, Jr added to party David Walker(pty:dft).(Benjamin, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crier et al v. Knight Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walker
Represented By: Jack C. Benjamin, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuire Transportation,Inc.
Represented By: Jack C. Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack C. Benjamin, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuire Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Jack C. Benjamin, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Crier
Represented By: Danielle L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tronda C Crier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tronda Crier
Represented By: Danielle L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?