Peterson v. Day et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Peterson
Defendant: Travis Day
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv02027
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Clerk of Court, 25th JDC on 12/6/2021(jeg)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Attorney General on 12/6/2021(jeg)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Plaquemines Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/1/2021.(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2021: #1 Return Receipts - Certified Mail) (sa).
December 1, 2021 Filing fee paid from Joseph Peterson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5 Receipt No. LAE070393) (jeg) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (jeg).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/5/2021. (sa)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Peterson. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (bwn)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joseph Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?