Frickey v. Bickham
Plaintiff: Ryk Anthony Frickey
Defendant: E. Dustin Bickham
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2024cv00556
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer filed by E. Dustin Bickham. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Louis Gerard Authement added to party E. Dustin Bickham(pty:dft).(Authement, Louis)
March 18, 2024 Filing 5 Return of Service of #2 served on St. Charles Parish Clerk on 3/11/24(gla)
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 Return of Service of #2 served on St. Charles Parish District Attorney's Office on 3/11/24(gla)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 Return of #2 Service of Attorney General's Office served on Attorney General's Office Criminal Division on 03/13/2024 by Attorney General State of Louisiana.(gla)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for St. Charles Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 3/6/2024. (alm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2024: #1 Certified Mail Receipts: Clerk of Court, District Attorney, and Attorney General.) (alm).
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt No. 200005930.) filed by Ryk Anthony Frickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frickey v. Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryk Anthony Frickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Dustin Bickham
Represented By: Louis Gerard Authement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?