Abadie v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Plaintiff: Ayanna Abadie, Mildred Batiste, Shantell Batiste, Shanda Bell, Fannie Belliazere, Neomi Belliazere, Shawana Belliazere, Irma Beloney, Crystal Dawn Bennett, Tamara M Bennett, Larry Bernard, Marguerite Bernard, Leroy Berry, Wendy L Berry, Jerrick J Bethely, Joseph Bethely, Jr, Dinesha Billoups, Lajoy Billoups, Tracy Billoups, Ashley Bindon, Daisy Lee Bindon, Joyce Bindon, Ranell Bindon, William Bindon, Jr, William Bindon, Sr, Willie Mae Bird, Alice Marie Black, Alisha Black, Anthony Black, Anthony R Black, Antoine Black, Beulah Black, Carlon Black, Justin Black, Marilyn S Black, Brandon Blackman, Evanda Blackman, Bredonna Blake, Darnisha Blake, Donnie Blake, II, Donnie Blake, Curry Bolden, Leonard Bolden, Jr, Tandra Bolden, Myrtis Bowie, Emily Boykins, Lillian Boykins, Joseph Boykins, Beryl J Bradley, Cheryl D Bradley, Gladys Bradley, Hattie Bradley, Joseph Bradley, Joshua A. Bradley, Keisha L Bradley, Lakisha Bradley, Latasha Bradley, Shameka Bradley, Sharon Bradley, Suzanne Bradley, Woodrow Bradley, Gloria Brady, Lonnie Brand, Levorie Brandon, Dashonda Braxton, Doris Braxton, Irene W Braxton, Sam Braxton, Brandon Breaux, Debra Breaux, Elizabeth Breaux, Emma Breaux, Ivory Breaux, Laquita Breaux, Latisha T Breaux, Latoya T Breaux, Lawrence Breaux, Shasha Breaux, Yolanda Breaux, McKinley Breckenridge, Melvin Breckenridge, Darrilynn Bridges, Dianne Briley, Samuel Briley, Howard Brimmer, Otis Broadway, Jr, Reginald Broadway, Shadava Brodus, LaTonya Brook, Beverly Brooks, Diaimean Brooks, Gwenda Brooks, Ike Brooks, Ranarda Brooks, Rose Brooks, Tialonda Brooks, Malcolm X Broussard, Stephanie Browden, Anthony Browder, Deborah Browder, Gregory Browder, Marlisha Browder, Michael Browder, Jr, Michael Leroy Browder, Sr, Mika Browder, Necole Browder, Sakina Browder, Shedrick Browder, Travonya Browder, Andrae Brown, Ataylia Brown, Catherine Brown, Charles Brown, Chris Brown, Christopher Brown, Cierra Brown, Corey Brown, Curtis Brown, Sr., Cynthia Brown, Deltonies Brown, Derrick Brown, Donna Brown, Ebonie Brown, Emily Brown, Frank Brown, Georgia Brown, Geraline Brown, Graylen Brown, Jamal Brown, James Brown, Jennifer Brown, Jerry Brown, Jewell Brown, Kedra Brown, Lance Brown, Laquisha Brown, Latisha Brown, Louis Brown, Mary Brown, Michael Brown, Myra L Brown, Nathaniel Brown, Orinto Brown, Rhonda Brown, Robert Brown, Ronald Brown, Rondell Brown, Rosalie Brown, Rose Brown, Rose Levy Brown, Shaneitha Brown, Shelia Brown, Tarvaras Brown, Tasha Brown, Terrence Brown, Troy Brown, Unborn Brown, Wanda Jean Brown, Willie Brown, Alicia Brumfield, Bridgette Brumfield, Dedrick Brumfield, Denero Brumfield, Fochie Brumfield, Latisha Brumfield, Lisa Brumfield, Prentiss Brumfield, Ray Brumfield, Raymond Brumfield, Rose Marie Brumfield, Vianna Brumfield, Wilford Brumfield, Joyce Bryant, Kirby Bryant, Lizzie Bryant, Fabian Buchanan, Floyd Buchanan, Tony Buchanan, Kalyn Buchanan, Latara Buchanon, Alisha Burrell, Candis Burton, Cynthia Burton, Gwendolyn Bush, Edward Charles Butler, James Butler, Janice Butler, Leshawn Butler, Lucille Butler, Nicole Butler, Parkedra Butler, Rancheria Butler, Samuel Butler, Tandra Butler, Terhonda Butler, William Butler, Yolanda Butler, Ariel Bynum, Billie Bynum, Deon Bynum, Gabriel Bynum, Michelle Bynum, Octavia Marie Bynum, Mable Cade, Oscar Cade, Oscar Cade, Jr, Roosevelt Cade, Sr, Asia Cage, Beaula M Cage, Brittany Cage, Shondra Cage, Sondra F Cage, Trelysia Cage, George Cain, Roger Cain, Shondra Cain, Terri L Cain, Trent Calloway, Eusebio Camarillo, Charondalette Campbell, Crystala Campbell, Emmitt Campbell, Jr, Eric Campbell, Kenyatta Campbell, Kimelee Campbell, Larry Campbell, Martha Campbell, Deonte Cannon, Helen Cannon, John Cannon, Kishon Cannon, Sabrina Carey, Sylvester Carey, Eddie Carmina, Paula Carmon, Kenna Carney, Mervin Carney, Alfred Carr, Dell Marie Carr, Henry Carr, Jr, Travis Carr, Alice Carter, Andrea Carter, Brandon Carter, Diane Carter, Donald Carter, Dorothy Carter, Effie Carter, Gilda Carter, Hattie Carter, Issac Carter, Javelyn Carter, Jimmie Carter, Kawanda Carter, Kendrick Carter, Latasha Carter, Mckisha Carter, Monroe Carter, Quentin Carter, Taurean Carter, Rosalie Castille, Theodore Castille, Wayne Castille, Carlos Cato, Pamela A Cato, Diane Causey, Isiah Causey, Marcell Celestine, Nicole Celestine, David Chambers, Gayle Chambers, Jessie Chambers, Kawanda Chambers, Reginald Chambers, Elias Chaney, III, Elvin Chaney, Jamel Chaney, Jeremy Chaney, Percy Chaney, Andra Chapman, Arthur Chapman, Bessie Chapman, Isreal Chapman, Sr, Meosha Chapman, Monicia Chapman, Rodessa Chapman, Tabitha Chapman, Chevis Chatman, Grace Chatman, Isreal Chatman, Joycelyn Chatman, Latosha Chatman, Marcus Chatman, Shauntel Chatman, Shyrone Chatman, Brian Chavis, Brittini Chavis, Lakiesha Chavis, Tedrick Chavis, Debbie Chenevert, Karen Chenevert, Tykeisha Chenevert, Abel Chew, Debra Chew, Latasha Chews, Kenneth Christian, Rose Christian, Peggy Christopher, Reginald Christopher, Rose Christopher, Stacey Christopher, Willie Christopher, Sr, Willie James Christopher, Sr, Darier Chustz, Audrey Claiborne, Burnniette Clark, Damean Clark, Donald Clark, Jeremiah Clark, Latasha Clark, Lee Clark, Leonard Clark, Brandon Clay, Charles Clay, Jr, Kathy Clay, Ramona Clay, Sanders Clay, Brenda Clayton, Donnesha Clayton, Vivian Clipps, Aaron Cohn, April Cohn, Arties Cohn, Floyd Cohn, Angela Coleman, Ashley Coleman, Bertha Coleman, Betty Coleman, Fredrick Coleman, Gilda F Coleman, Glean Coleman, Jacqueline Coleman, Matcherson Coleman, Mattie Coleman, Nicholas Coleman, Quincy Coleman and Raif Coleman
Case Number: 3:2007cv00349
Filed: May 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Stephen C Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2009 Filing 25 MANDATE of USCA as to (1087 in 3:93-md-00002-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiffs, (20 in 3:07-cv-00350-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (22 in 3:07-cv-00348-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (20 in 3:07-cv-00349-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal: The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (NLT, )
January 5, 2009 Filing 24 Appeal Transmittal Letter Returned. (HCJ, )
December 17, 2008 Filing 23 Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals regarding (20 in 3:07-cv-00350-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (22 in 3:07-cv-00348-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (20 in 3:07-cv-00349-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal. (HCJ, )
December 17, 2008 Record on Appeal Electronically Certified regarding (22 in 3:07-cv-00348-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (20 in 3:07-cv-00350-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (20 in 3:07-cv-00349-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal. US Court of Appeals notified of certification. (HCJ, )
October 23, 2008 Filing 22 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Calvin C Fayard, Jr re #20 Notice of Appeal (Fayard, Calvin)
September 12, 2008 Record on Appeal Electronically Certified regarding #20 Notice of Appeal. US Court of Appeals notified of certification. (JDL, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 21 USCA Case Number 08-30821 for (1087 in 3:93-md-00002-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiffs, (20 in 3:07-cv-00350-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (22 in 3:07-cv-00348-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal, (20 in 3:07-cv-00349-BMGL-SCR) Notice of Appeal. (HCJ, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #19 Judgment. (JDL, )
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT : Ordered that Plas shall take nothing on their claims; costs of court are taxed against Plas. All other relief requested by any party is Denied. Signed by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/18/08.. (BP, )
July 18, 2008 Filing 18 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW : The Court determines that dft is not liable to plas for their alleged injuries under either a strict liability or negligence theory. Dft is thus entitled to judgment in its favor. The Court will enter a judgment by separate document in favor of dft.. Signed by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/18/08. (BP, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Before the Court is a Motion to Remand filed by all Plaintiffs in Andre Aaron, et al v. ExxonMobil Corporation, Ayanna Abadie, et al v. ExxonMobil Corporation, and Adlean McAlope, et al v. ExxonMobil Corporation. The Motion was referred to Magistrate Judge Riedlinger on June 21, 2007. This Court has conducted an independent review of the file, the pleadings in this case, and the Report of Judge Riedlinger, to which the Defendant has asserted objections. The Court accepts the findings contained in the Report and, accordingly, GRANTS the Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/18/2007. (NLT, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2007 (NLT, ).
September 14, 2007 Filing 16 REPLY TO #14 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 1027 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #14 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (NLT, )
September 6, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Consolidated Objections to Magistrate Judges Report on Motion to Remand by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1)(Berteau, Alan)
August 15, 2007 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendations filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Berteau, Alan)
August 1, 2007 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., #5 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., #7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr....It is recommended that the plaintiff's Motions to Remand be granted... Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2007. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/1/2007. (NLT, )
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Exhibit filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/25/2007. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen)
July 25, 2007 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Exhibit by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(Berteau, Alan)
July 5, 2007 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Berteau, Alan)
June 26, 2007 Filing 9 Proposed Judgment. (Fayard, Calvin)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to USMJ SCR: #7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., #7 Joint MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., 9 Joint MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., #5 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., #7 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr., 9 Joint MOTION for Oral Argument on #7 Joint MOTION to Remand, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr.. Signed by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/21/07. (BP, )
June 15, 2007 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Joint MOTION to Remand by Calvin C Fayard, Jr. (Fayard, Calvin)
June 15, 2007 Filing 6 Joint MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Calvin C Fayard, Jr. (Fayard, Calvin)
June 15, 2007 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand by Calvin C Fayard, Jr. (Fayard, Calvin)
May 24, 2007 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Berteau, Alan)
May 21, 2007 Filing 3 Letter dated 5/21/2007 from Clerk of Court to Counsel of Record Re: Change of District Judge (NLT, )
May 21, 2007 Case Reassigned to Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Judge Ralph E. Tyson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT, )
May 21, 2007 Cases Associated:Create association to 3:93-md-00002-BMGL-SCR. This case is consolidated with Lead Case 93md2 and reassigned to BMGL-SCR. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT, )
May 21, 2007 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Judge Docia L Dalby, Christine Noland no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT, )
May 18, 2007 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Brent Klibert who is Co-Counsel for party All Plaintiffs. Attorney is not admitted to practice in MDLA. Admission packet mailed with this letter. (NLT, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baton Rouge City Court, Case Number 0704-02965-D. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 223464), filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet#2 Attachment City Court Suit Record)(Berteau, Alan). Modified on 5/18/2007 to correct page orientation (NLT, ).
May 17, 2007 Case Reassigned to Judge Ralph E. Tyson. Judge Frank J. Polozola no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abadie v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayanna Abadie
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Batiste
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantell Batiste
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanda Bell
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Belliazere
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neomi Belliazere
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawana Belliazere
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Beloney
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Dawn Bennett
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara M Bennett
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bernard
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Bernard
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Berry
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy L Berry
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrick J Bethely
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bethely, Jr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinesha Billoups
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lajoy Billoups
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Billoups
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Bindon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Lee Bindon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Bindon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranell Bindon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bindon, Jr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bindon, Sr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Bird
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Marie Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beulah Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlon Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn S Black
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Blackman
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanda Blackman
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bredonna Blake
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnisha Blake
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Blake, II
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Blake
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curry Bolden
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Bolden, Jr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tandra Bolden
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtis Bowie
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Boykins
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Boykins
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Boykins
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beryl J Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl D Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha L Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodrow Bradley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Brady
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Brand
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levorie Brandon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dashonda Braxton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Braxton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene W Braxton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Braxton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivory Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquita Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha T Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya T Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasha Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Breaux
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKinley Breckenridge
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Breckenridge
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrilynn Bridges
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Briley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Briley
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Brimmer
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Broadway, Jr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Broadway
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadava Brodus
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTonya Brook
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diaimean Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwenda Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ike Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranarda Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tialonda Brooks
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm X Broussard
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Browden
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlisha Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Browder, Jr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leroy Browder, Sr
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mika Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Necole Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sakina Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travonya Browder
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrae Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ataylia Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cierra Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deltonies Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebonie Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraline Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graylen Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewell Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kedra Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquisha Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra L Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orinto Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondell Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Levy Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneitha Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarvaras Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unborn Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jean Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Brown
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedrick Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denero Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fochie Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentiss Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vianna Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Brumfield
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Bryant
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Bryant
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizzie Bryant
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Buchanan
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Buchanan
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Buchanan
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyn Buchanan
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latara Buchanon
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Burrell
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candis Burton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Burton
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Bush
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Charles Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leshawn Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard
Represented By: Roy F. Amedee, Jr.
Represented By: Walter C. Dumas
Represented By: William Hugh Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Butler
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M Bruno
Represented By: Rebecca A. Cunard