Cockerham v. Parish of Ascension et al

Defendant: R.N. Michelle Guerin, Dr. Stephen Holmes, Tommy Martinez, Parish of Ascension, Rhonda Unknown, Unknown Insurer, Warden Bobby Weber and Sheriff Jeffrey Wiley
:
Case Number: 3:2010cv00227
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: The Court finds that the motion for summary judgment by the Parish of Ascension, Parish President Tommy Martinez, Nurse Michelle Gaudin, and Nurse Rhonda Shear is granted, dismissing pltff's claims asserted against these dfts, with prejudice. Also, pltf's action is dismissed. Judgment shall be entered accordingly.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 5/29/2012. (CMM)
May 25, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 118 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 71 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michelle Guerin, Rhonda Unknown, Tommy Martinez, Parish of Ascension, 69 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen Holmes, and 70 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Weber, Jeffrey Wiley shall be denied and this matter shall be referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 05/25/2011. (NLT)
January 13, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 75 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Stephen Holmes shall be denied, and that this matter shall be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 01/13/2011. (NLT)
November 2, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 27 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stephen Holmes. It is recommended that the Motion to Dismiss of defendant Stephen Holmes, rec.doc.no. 27 , be denied, and that this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/2/2010. (CMM)
September 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 55 MOTION for the Issuance of a Cease and Desist Order filed by Raymond Joseph Cockerham, Jr.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/1/10. (BP, )
August 5, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 8/5/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockerham v. Parish of Ascension et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Cockerham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Michelle Guerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stephen Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Ascension
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Bobby Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jeffrey Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?