Frazier v. Radio Shack Corporation

Plaintiff: David W Frazier
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00855
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Frazier's claims against RadioShack are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Judgment is entered in favor RadioShack and against Frazier. RadioShack's request "that all costs be tax ed against Plaintiff" is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, but may choose to file a schedule of reasonable costs seeking reimbursement according to the Court's Local Rules, M.D.La. LR54.3. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/10/2014. (LLH)
April 4, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pltf, David W. Frazier, shall pay to the dft, RadioShack Corporation, $1,155.00 in attorney's fees in relation to the preparation, filing, and oral argument concerning RadioShack Corporations Memora ndum in Opposition to his 53 Motion to Quash, in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/12/2012 R. Doc. 68 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pltf shall pay the attorneys fees award to RadioShack in two (2) installments, with $577.50 being paid by 5/4/2012, and the remaining $577.50 being paid by 6/4/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/4/2012. (CMM)
March 12, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER...The 47 MOTION to Quash filed by David W Frazier is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc. produce documents requested by the subpoena to defendant, Radio Shack within 10 days of receiving this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/12/2012. (LSM)
February 27, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 66 Motion to Compel Responsive Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents and Notice of Records Deposition With Prejudice, as it relates to his Notice of Records Deposition, and Denied Without Prejudice, as it relates to his First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and his Second Set of Interrogatories.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/27/2012. (CMM)
February 2, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULINGS granting 14 , 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that dfts, Julian Day and Jim Romero, are hereby Dismissed from this matter.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/2/2012. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Radio Shack Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Margaret F. Swetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?