Granger v. Babin et al

Plaintiff: Clevern Granger
Defendant: Percy Babin, Otto Kilbourne, Tyrone Kilbourne, Steve Radar, John Smith and Douglas Stroughter
Case Number: 3:2012cv00628
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 52 Motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of inmate witnesses. The 55 Motion in Limine to limit or exclude a number of plaintiff's exhibits is DEFERRED until trial. Therefore, should the deferred issues arise at trial, they will be handled according to the applicable Federal Rules of Evidence and governing law. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/25/2014. (LLH)
June 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/04/2014. (CGP)
May 27, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granger's excessive force claim may proceed to trial. All other claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/27/2014. (CGP)
January 14, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 27 , 28 , 29 are deferred until trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/13/2014. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granger v. Babin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Babin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otto Kilbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Kilbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Radar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Stroughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clevern Granger
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Blake S. Leger
Represented By: Marcus J. Plaisance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?