Hebert v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hebert
Defendant: Charles Bridges, City of Baton Rouge, East Baton Rouge Parish, Sid Gautreaux, Warden Dennis Grimes, Terry Hines, LCS Corporation and Rani Whitfield
Case Number: 3:2015cv00850
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 RULING: The 391 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims against defendants LCS and Hines are dismissed, with prejudice. The exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims against defendants LCS and Hines is declined. There being not remaining defendants in this matter, this matter be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/27/2019. (KAH)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 378 OPINION Adopting 373 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 338 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and claims against Dr. Bridges are dismissed, with prejudice. FURTHER, the Court declines to exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims against this defendant, and this matter is referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/06/2018. (NLT)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 367 RULING Adopting the 318 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 291 Motion for Summary Judgmentis GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims against the City of Baton Rouge and the Parish of East Baton Rouge are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/19/2018. (LLH)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OPINION Adopting the 253 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 184 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, dismissing plaintiff's claims against Dr. Whitfield, with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/2/2018. (LLH)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RULING : The 187 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. The 188 or Extension of Time For Service of Charles Bridges and MOTION For Production of Complete Service Address For Charles Bridges Under Seal and MOTION to Re-Serve Charles Bridges is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons, and service shall be made upon the City, the Parish, and Dr. Bridges as requested in the attached USM-285 forms completed by the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of the attached USM-285 forms to the United States Marshals Service. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/3/2017. (LLH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OPINION: After independently reviewing the entire record in this case and for the reasons set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report dated August 16, 2017, to which an objection was filed, it is ordered that the 106 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/25/2017. (KAH)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPINION Adopting 136 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Motion to Dismiss 64 is granted in part, and the plaintiff's medical malpractice claims against defendant Dr. Whitfield are dismissed, without prejudice. In all other regards, the defendant's Motion 64 is denied. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/4/2017. (EDC)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION Adopting 47 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Motion(s) to Dismiss 21 & 29 are DENIED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/13/2017. (ELW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Gautreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rani Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?