Cormier v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Tony Cormier
Defendant: Elizabeth Britton, John Bel Edwards, Tim Hooper, James LeBlanc and Pretty Singh
Case Number: 3:2017cv00241
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RULING : granting 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/10/2019. (ELW)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RULING denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/24/2018. (SWE)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RULING denying 61 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 61 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/31/2018. (ELW)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RULING AND ORDER ON MOTIONS TO REQUEST TRANSFER OF PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND DEPOSITION AT LOUISIANA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE: The Motions to Transfer are DENIED, however, Elayn Hunt Correctional Center is ORDERED to produce inmate plaintiffs Richard Henderso n (DOC #109504) and Tony Cormier (DOC # 278001) for the deposition of Nurse Britton which is currently scheduled for April 26, 2018 at 1:00 p.m., or at such other date and time as is mutually agreeable to all parties. The deposition of Nurse Britton will take place at Elayn Hunt Correctional Center on April 26, 2018 at 1:00 p.m., or at such other date and time as is mutually agreeable to all parties. Counsel for defendants in this matter shall provide a copy of this Ruling and Order to the appropriate officials at Elayn Hunt Correctional Center and that officials at Elayn Hunt Correctional Center shall make all appropriate arrangements to ensure compliance with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/24/2018. (EDC)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 65(a). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/27/2017. (LLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormier v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pretty Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?