Riche v. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC

Plaintiff: Chris Riche
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00923
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 12/20/2018 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 1/10/2019. Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/21/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/20/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 11/20/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/10/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 3/20/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/7/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/28/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 9/11/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 to 10/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2018. (NLT)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Eldin Hasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for John P. Mandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eldin Hasic and John P. Mandler are hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Chris Riche. (Daquanno, Randall)
December 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for John Mandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1870834). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Eldin Hasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-1870833). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for John Mandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1870834) by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO PHV, #2 Attachment COGS, #3 Attachment CM/ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Mattappally, Jay)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Eldin Hasic to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-1870833) by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO PHV, #2 Attachment COGS, #3 Attachment CM/ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Mattappally, Jay)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Biomet Orthopedics, LLC.. (Mattappally, Jay)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC.(Mattappally, Jay)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 02:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 12/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/9/2018. (JSL)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Chris Riche (Daquanno, Randall) Modified on 10/25/2018 to edit the text (KAH).
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SGO)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biomet Orthopedics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1849027.), filed by Chris Riche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Melancon, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riche v. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: Eldin Hasic
Represented By: Jay Mathew Mattappally
Represented By: Stephen G. A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Riche
Represented By: Jason Luke Melancon
Represented By: Randall Lee Daquanno, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Brad Cranmer
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Robert C. Rimes
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?