Leja v. Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Leja, Jr. and Thomas Davis
Defendant: Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., Monet Manor, L.L.C., Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., Brian D. Brousseau, 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C. and Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00269
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Interrogatories by Robert Leja, Jr.(Parmet, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. All Defendants. (Parmet, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Objection of Defendants' Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a) by Thomas Davis, Robert Leja, Jr (Parmet, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Leja, Jr, Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LIMITED SCHEDULING ORDER (Fair Labor Standards Act): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, the Court finds it necessary to implement a schedule tailored to meet the particular circumstances of this case which is based on the Fair Labor Standards Act. Therefore, consistent with the requirements for just, speedy and inexpensive administration of justice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26 concerning initial disclosures are hereby WAIVED in this case. Instead, the parties shall comply with the following schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/9/2019. (SGO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C., 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., Brian D. Brousseau, Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C., Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., Monet Manor, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935649.), filed by Robert Leja, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons on Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C., #4 Attachment Summons on Brousseau Properties, L.L.C., #5 Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C., #6 Attachment Summons on Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C., #7 Attachment Summons on Monet Manor, L.L.C., #8 Attachment Summons on 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C., #9 Attachment Summons on 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C., #10 Attachment Summons on 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C., #11 Attachment Summons on 964 Maximillian, L.L.C., #12 Attachment Summons on 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C., #13 Attachment Summons on Brian D. Brousseau)(Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leja v. Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brousseau - Charlestown, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monet Manor, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brousseau Management Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4484 Floynell Drive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brousseau Properties, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Brousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 669 Monet Drive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 964 Maximillian, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 402 and 406 South 21st Street, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31903 Pat's Lane, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brousseau - Georgetown, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Leja, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Davis
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?