Gaspard v. Unknown First Defendant et al
Plaintiff: Charles Gaspard
Defendant: Various United States Magistrate Judges, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (2 of 2), Simien & Simien, LLC, Tim Delaney, Dudley DeBosier, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (2 of 2), Alan J Robert, Spencer Calahan, Uknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (1 of 2), Various Clerks of Court, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (1 of 2), Unknown classification Officer, Barret Boeker, Darlene Landry, Unknown Franklin, Keith J. Landry, Various United States District Judges, Sherry Ackman, Michael L McConnell, Clerk of Court for the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, Al Davidson, Lt. Kevin Benjamin, Susan K. Jones, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana, Cody Aucoin, Delshadee Scott, Uknown Correctional Officer Sergeant, Lietenant Unknown Coleman, United States Attorney for the Western District of Louisiana, Registrar of Vital Records for the State of Louisiana, Southern Poverty Law Center, Unknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (2 of 2), United States Attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana, James R Coxe, Unknown First Defendant, Gerry Cvitanovich, Sonya Aucoin, Nyesha Davis, Unknown Correctional Officer Major, William Rosso, James M LeBlanc, Darrel Vannoy, Unknown Voorhies, Unknown Attorney at Law, Unknown Kelly, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (1 of 2), Crime Stoppers, Unknown EMT, United States Attorney for the Southern District of California, Unknown Correctional Officer Lieutenant/Emergency Medical Technician, John W. deGravelles, Cathy Chase, Jimmy Smith, Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., Shelly D Dick, Jeffrey Rouse, June Entertainment, Unknown Thompson, Unknown Deputy Clerk of Court, Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (1 of 2), Uknown Sanders, Murray & Murray, Burl N. Cain, Unknown Pro Se Staff Attorney, Michael Ducote, Morris Bart, Amber Vittorio, Unknown Legal Programs Department Officer or Employee, Andre Belanger, Frances Rodrigue, Unknown Investigative Services Officer, Gordon J McKernan, Unknown Jackson, Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (2 of 2), Peyton Murphy, Unknown Social Worker, Leland J. Falcon, Deputy Clerks of Court, Vital Records Registry, Investigative Services, Gauthier Amedee, Matthew Gamble and Unknown Irving
Case Number: 3:2019cv00478
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
3 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE and ORDER: The Court has already given Plaintiff leave to file one amended complaint, yet Plaintiffs pleadings at this point provide little to no facts to support any specific constitutional claim(s) Plaintiff may have against any specific defendant. Further, Plaintiffs most recently filed amended complaint does not provide any additional factual detail to support a claim. Because R. Doc. 17 does not contain any relevant factual allegations, it shall be stricken from the record. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this matter setting forth factual allegations as detailed above by no later than October 16, 2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/16/2019. (ELW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Gaspard.(ELW)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints. Plaintiff is granted leave to file R. Doc. 2 as an amended complaint. All remaining relief sought in R. Doc. 2 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/13/2019. (ELW)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2019. (KAH)
September 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Unknown First Defendant, et al MOTION for Protective Order, #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #13 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sherry Ackman, Gauthier Amedee, Cody Aucoin, Sonya Aucoin, Morris Bart, Andre Belanger, Kevin Benjamin, Barret Boeker, Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., Burl N. Cain, Cathy Chase, Clerk of Court for the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, Unknown Coleman, James R Coxe, Crime Stoppers, Gerry Cvitanovich, Al Davidson, Nyesha Davis, Tim Delaney, Deputy Clerks of Court, Shelly D Dick, Michael Ducote, Dudley DeBosier, Leland J. Falcon, Unknown Franklin, Matthew Gamble, Investigative Services, Unknown Irving, Unknown Jackson, Susan K. Jones, June Entertainment, Unknown Kelly, Darlene Landry, Keith J. Landry, James M LeBlanc, Michael L McConnell, Gordon J McKernan, Murray & Murray, Peyton Murphy, Registrar of Vital Records for the State of Louisiana, Alan J Robert, Frances Rodrigue, William Rosso, Jeffrey Rouse, Uknown Sanders, Delshadee Scott, Simien & Simien, LLC, Jimmy Smith, Southern Poverty Law Center, Spencer Calahan, Unknown Thompson, Uknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (1 of 2), Uknown Correctional Officer Sergeant, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana, United States Attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana, United States Attorney for the Southern District of California, United States Attorney for the Western District of Louisiana, Unknown Attorney at Law, Unknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (2 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (1 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (2 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Lieutenant/Emergency Medical Technician, Unknown Correctional Officer Major, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (1 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (2 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (1 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (2 of 2), Unknown Deputy Clerk of Court, Unknown EMT, Unknown First Defendant, Unknown Investigative Services Officer, Unknown Legal Programs Department Officer or Employee, Unknown Pro Se Staff Attorney, Unknown Social Worker, Unknown classification Officer, Darrel Vannoy, Various Clerks of Court, Various United States District Judges, Various United States Magistrate Judges, Vital Records Registry, Amber Vittorio, Unknown Voorhies, John W. deGravelles, filed by Charles Gaspard. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Cover Letter(s))(KMW) Modified on 9/17/2019 STRICKEN as orered by rec doc # 20 (ELW).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default.(KMW) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Unknown First Defendant, et al, MOTION for Protective Order by Charles Gaspard. (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Objection and MOTION for Request for Attorney as Co-Counsel of Record by Charles Gaspard. (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Charles Gaspard. (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Objection and Stipulation filed by Charles Gaspard. (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice by Charles Gaspard (KMW)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Declaration of Exclusive Intellectual Property Rights by Charles Gaspard (KMW)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Documents (Amended Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Objection and Motion for Request for Attorney as Co-Counsel of Record, Request for Judicial Notice, Declaration of Exclusive Intellectual Property Rights, Objection and Stipulation, Affidavits, and Motion for Entry of Judgment of Default and Motion for Protective Order) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Objection and Request for Attorney, #5 Request for Judicial Notice (1), #6 Declaration, #7 Objection and Stipulation, #8 Cover Letters, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Request for Judicidal Notice)(KMW) Modified on 9/3/2019 (NLT).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Documents (Amended Complaint, Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Motion for Request for Attorney as Co-Counsel of Record, Request for Judicial Notice, Declaration of Exclusive Intellectual Property Rights, Objection and Stipulation, and Motion for Entry of Judgment of Default and Motion for Protective Order) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS (KMW) Modified on 9/3/2019 to edit the file date (NLT).
August 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION Free Docket Sheet MOTION or to Issue Subpoena So Inmate May Subpoena a Free Docket Sheet. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to the Clerk of Court Regarding a Free Docket Sheet by Charles Gaspard. (KMW) Modified on 9/18/2019 to edit text per chamber's request (KMW).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter dated August 12, 2019 from Charles Gaspard to Clerk of Court Re: Illegally Fored Electronic Filings in the Matter of Charles Gaspard v. Unknown Defendant et al. 19-cv-478-BAJ-EWD; and request (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter) (KMW)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019. Filing Fee due by 9/3/2019. Statement of Account due by 9/3/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction; Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. by Charles Gaspard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(KMW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Documents (Affidavit) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS. (Attachments: #1 local rule, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(EDC)
July 22, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Judge John W. deGravelles, Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
July 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 22, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Objections and MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints by Charles Gaspard. (KMW)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherry Ackman, Gauthier Amedee, Cody Aucoin, Sonya Aucoin, Morris Bart, Andre Belanger, Kevin Benjamin, Barret Boeker, Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., Burl N. Cain, Cathy Chase, Clerk of Court for the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, Unknown Coleman, Crime Stoppers, Gerry Cvitanovich, Al Davidson, Nyesha Davis, Tim Delaney, Deputy Clerks of Court, Shelly D Dick, Michael Ducote, Dudley DeBosier, Leland J. Falcon, Unknown Franklin, Matthew Gamble, Investigative Services, Unknown Irving, Unknown Jackson, James R. Coxe, III and Associates, Susan K. Jones, June Entertainment, Unknown Kelly, Darlene Landry, Keith J. Landry, James M LeBlanc, Michael L McConnell, Gordon J McKernan, Murray & Murray, Peyton Murphy, Registrar of Vital Records for the State of Louisiana, Alan J Robert, Francis Rodrigue, William Rosso, Jeffrey Rouse, Uknown Sanders, Delshadee Scott, Simien & Simien, LLC, Jimmy Smith, Southern Poverty Law Center, Spencer Calahan, Unknown Thompson, Uknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (1 of 2), Uknown Correctional Officer Sergeant, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana, United States Attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana, United States Attorney for the Southern District of California, United States Attorney for the Western District of Louisiana, Unknown Attorney at Law, Unknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (2 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (1 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (2 of 2), Unknown Correctional Officer Lieutenant/Emergency Medical Technician, Unknown Correctional Officer Major, Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (1 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (2 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/I.C.S. (2 of 2), Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute, Unknown Deputy Clerk of Court, Unknown EMT, Unknown First Defendant, Unknown Investigative Services Officer, Unknown Legal Programs Department Officer or Employee, Unknown Pro Se Staff Attorney, Unknown Social Worker, Unknown classification Officer, Darrel Vannoy, Various Clerks of Court, Various United States District Judges, Various United States Magistrate Judges, Vital Records Registry, Amber Vittorio, Unknown Voorhies, John W. deGravelles, filed by Charles Gaspard.(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaspard v. Unknown First Defendant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various United States Magistrate Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (2 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simien & Simien, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley DeBosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (2 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Calahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (1 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Clerks of Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Offender/Inmate Counsel Substitute (1 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown classification Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barret Boeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various United States District Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Ackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Court for the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delshadee Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Correctional Officer Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lietenant Unknown Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Western District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar of Vital Records for the State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Poverty Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer Assistant Warden (2 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Coxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown First Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Cvitanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyesha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Voorhies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Attorney at Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Offender (1 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crime Stoppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown EMT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Southern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer Lieutenant/Emergency Medical Technician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly D Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deputy Clerk of Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (1 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray & Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl N. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pro Se Staff Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Bart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Vittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Legal Programs Department Officer or Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Investigative Services Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon J McKernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officer Captain (2 of 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Social Worker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland J. Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Clerks of Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Records Registry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigative Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gauthier Amedee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?