C.B. et al v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A Minor C. T. B. and C. B.
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00600
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of California. (SWE)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO)(SWE)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 CTO Final Minute Order) (SWE)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all proceedings and deadlines shall be stayed in this action pending further order of this Court, or any court to which the action is transferred, following the decision of the JPML on the pending Motion to Transfer Related Cases for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (MDL No. 2913, Dkt. No. 1). Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/01/2019. (ELW)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Dillard, Craig)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C. B.. Juul Labs, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Moore, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C. B.. Altria Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Moore, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C. B.. Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Moore, Timothy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Moore, Timothy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/20/2019 to flatten document) (SWE).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Moore, Timothy) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/20/2019 to flatten document) (SWE).
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Moore, Timothy) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/20/2019 to flatten document) (SWE).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet by C. B. re #1 Complaint (Moore, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (KAH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1999317.), filed by C. B., C. T. B..(Moore, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.B. et al v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Minor C. T. B.
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?